|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 11/10/1922 | 07/03/1923 | 148 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1927 | 13/04/1928 | 108 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1928 | 14/06/1928 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/09/1930 | 12/12/1930 | 74 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 01/05/1933 | 13/06/1933 | 44 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1935 | 17/10/1935 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 29 days | General | Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/06/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1946 | 13/03/1946 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1947 | 30/01/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9780 |
||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1949 | 18/01/1950 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69780 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1953 | 07/08/1953 | 46 days | Heavy Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/02/1948 | Darlington Works | New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) | SLS/194804 |
31/10/1954 | York Area | October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1180 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
11/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1922. Dep: 07/03/1923. | ||
08/03/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Percy Main (PMN) | ||
12/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shildon (SHI) | ||
20/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1927. Dep: 13/04/1928. | ||
07/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/05/1928. Dep: 14/06/1928. | ||
30/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1930. Dep: 12/12/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
01/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1933. Dep: 13/06/1933. | ||
17/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1935. Dep: 17/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
18/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Starbeck (SBK) | ||
28/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
10/04/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
08/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2197 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
19/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2050 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
28/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2492 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
03/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9780 | ||
07/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1946. Dep: 13/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
28/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
29/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1947. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2382 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E9780 |
||
07/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1949. Dep: 18/01/1950. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 Boiler number 3358 (Diagram 63BSup) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 Renumbered to BR 69780 |
||
17/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
23/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
23/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 07/08/1953. | ||
15/11/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69780 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
06/1955 | Scrapped | Scrapped |