|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1919 | 11/1919 | General | Boiler number G933 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 09/11/1922 | 28/03/1923 | 140 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G940 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1924 | 08/10/1924 | 86 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1927 | 20/04/1927 | 105 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1930 | 27/10/1930 | 61 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1933 | 05/01/1934 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1936 | 03/02/1937 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1938 | 04/08/1938 | 74 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 28/11/1940 | 03/01/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1943 | 27/07/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/01/1946 | 21/02/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9782 |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1948 | 16/07/1948 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69782 |
||
Gateshead Works | 14/12/1949 | 06/02/1950 | 55 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 24360 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 28 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 28/02/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/12/1953 | 22/01/1954 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 24361 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1954 | 08/02/1954 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/07/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order. Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year. No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751. Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420. |
SLS/194808 |
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1182 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Starbeck (SBK) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1919. Dep: ?/11/1919. Work undertaken: Boiler number G933 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
09/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1922. Dep: 28/03/1923. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G940 (Diagram 55Sat) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
15/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1924. Dep: 08/10/1924. | ||
06/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1927. Dep: 20/04/1927. | ||
28/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1930. Dep: 27/10/1930. | ||
27/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1933. Dep: 05/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
12/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 03/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2204 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
23/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/05/1938. Dep: 04/08/1938. | ||
28/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
08/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
28/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1940. Dep: 03/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 27/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2379 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
17/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1946. Dep: 21/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2380 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 9782 |
||
23/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1948. Dep: 16/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2495 (Diagram 55Sup) Renumbered to BR 69782 |
||
14/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1949. Dep: 06/02/1950. | ||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24360 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
25/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. | ||
28/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
21/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1953. Dep: 22/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 24361 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
27/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1954. Dep: 08/02/1954. | ||
06/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
16/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
16/12/1957 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69782 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
04/1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped |