|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1921 | 04/1921 | General | Boiler number G947 (Diagram 55Sat) |
|||
Darlington Works | 09/06/1923 | 15/08/1923 | 68 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 15/01/1925 | 29/04/1925 | 105 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 25/07/1927 | 21/10/1927 | 89 days | General | Boiler number D1978 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1930 | 06/02/1931 | 121 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 01/09/1933 | 10/10/1933 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/08/1934 | 25/09/1934 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 47 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/05/1940 | 10/06/1940 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 33 days | General | Boiler number D1976 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/08/1943 | 20/09/1943 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 24/07/1944 | 15/08/1944 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1945 | 30/01/1945 | 28 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 03/01/1946 | 08/02/1946 | 37 days | General | Boiler number D1977 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/06/1946 | 06/08/1946 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 28/08/1947 | 24/09/1947 | 28 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 16/05/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/07/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 41 days | General | Rebuilt To Part 1 (saturated) Boiler number 24753 (Diagram 63BSat) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1951 | 04/09/1951 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1954 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August | SLS/194810 |
01/11/1948 | Darlington Works | The new Class 'A.1' locomotives, Nos. 60130-33, ex North Road bear Works Nos. 2049-52, in order. A minor change will be noticed in the new Darlington and Doncaster Works plates on the new 'A.1's,' they give the date, Works No. and origin, but no area is given. No. 68051 has been fitted with a modified bunker (and new cab windows), for increased coal capacity. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 827, 1601/29/30/42/51/55/72, 2992 (to scrap yard), 3007, 3344, 4916, 5710, 7307, 8089, 8400, 8686, 9099, 9392, 69841, 'Austerity' 77329 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60507, 60980. 62366, 62711/23/75, 63398, 65028, 65118, 65752/85, 65803/83, 67256/65, 68051, 68395, 68437, 68533, 68675, 69372/92, 69787, 69882/91/93 and- 'Austerity' 77215. Locomotives broken up:-Nos. 1360/78, 5641, 8285, 8400 an 9399. It will be noticed that two of these were ex G.C.R. 'B.7' 4-6-0's. It is pleasing to note that the N.E. Area locomotives. especially Gateshead stock, are approaching their pre-grouping splendour for cleanliness. Some of the 'A.4's' are spotless, while the rest are creditable. |
SLS/194812 |
20/08/1954 | Darlington Works | The 2MT engines are completed up to No, 78029 and the first two Diesel shunters on order are ready for traffic. D20 No. 2352 has arrived at Works marked ? She is in good condition externally. The diesels from North Road are out up to No. 13131 and A7 No. 69787, J71 68234 are in the scrap yard. | SLS/195410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1192 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1921. Dep: ?/04/1921. Work undertaken: Boiler number G947 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
09/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 15/08/1923. | ||
15/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1925. Dep: 29/04/1925. | ||
25/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1927. Dep: 21/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1978 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
09/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1930. Dep: 06/02/1931. | ||
01/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1933. Dep: 10/10/1933. | ||
22/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1934. Dep: 25/09/1934. | ||
18/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. | ||
02/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
01/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
08/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1940. Dep: 10/06/1940. | ||
15/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1976 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
18/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1943. Dep: 20/09/1943. | ||
24/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1944. Dep: 15/08/1944. | ||
03/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1945. Dep: 30/01/1945. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
03/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1946. Dep: 08/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number D1977 (Diagram 55Sat) |
||
19/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9787 | ||
25/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1946. Dep: 06/08/1946. | ||
28/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947. | ||
24/09/1948 | Modification | Diagram 55Sat number D1978 boiler fitted | ||
24/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69787 | ||
16/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/05/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. | ||
09/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Rebuilt To Part 1 (saturated) Boiler number 24753 (Diagram 63BSat) Rebuilt with 63B Superheated Boiler and reclassified A7 to A7/1 |
||
04/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 04/09/1951. | ||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
10/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
08/1954 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
07/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/08/1954. | ||
09/08/1954 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69787 from Hull Springhead (53C) |