|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 1922 | 11/1922 | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G939(ex (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
|||
Darlington Works | 25/02/1926 | 22/06/1926 | 118 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 60 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/04/1929 | 30/05/1929 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/08/1931 | 22/09/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1935 | 22/08/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/09/1939 | 21/10/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1943 | 08/01/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1911 | To Service | To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1195 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Shildon (SHI) Diagram 55Sat boiler fitted |
||
1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: ?/1922. Dep: ?/11/1922. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number G939(ex (Diagram 55Sup) Superheated boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
30/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
22/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
25/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1926. Dep: 22/06/1926. | ||
01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. | ||
09/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1929. Dep: 30/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2198 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
11/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1931. Dep: 22/09/1931. | ||
12/09/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1935. Dep: 22/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2048 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
06/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939. | ||
06/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD) | ||
10/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number D2054 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
14/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9789 | ||
07/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 2195 (Diagram 55Sup) |
||
1949 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 69789 but not taken up | ||
16/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
28/05/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9789 from Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
06/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped |