|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1922 | 29/09/1922 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1922 | 26/10/1922 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1922 | 06/12/1922 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1923 | 02/01/1923 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1923 | 29/01/1923 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1923 | 08/02/1923 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1923 | 26/05/1923 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1923 | 09/10/1923 | 49 days | Heavy | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1470N |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1924 | 09/04/1924 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1924 | 21/03/1925 | 111 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4470 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1925 | 18/04/1925 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1926 | 06/02/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1926 | 08/06/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1928 | 08/06/1928 | 72 days | General | Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1928 | 30/10/1928 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1929 | 29/06/1929 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1930 | 02/08/1930 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1930 | 12/11/1930 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1933 | 25/05/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1933 | 08/02/1934 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1934 | 16/01/1935 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1936 | 22/04/1936 | 49 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1937 | 02/12/1937 | 4 days | Light Repair | Blow-down Apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1942 | 14/02/1942 | 38 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1943 | 24/12/1943 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1945 | 25/09/1945 | 148 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A1/1 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 5 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 29294 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1945 | 13/12/1945 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1946 | 21/01/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1946 | 06/03/1946 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1946 | 21/05/1946 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1946 | 11/07/1946 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1946 | 25/09/1946 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1947 | 16/05/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1948 | 01/10/1948 | 52 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60113 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1949 | 06/01/1950 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 29288 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1950 | 11/05/1950 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1950 | 21/06/1950 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1951 | 18/05/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1951 | 04/12/1951 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1952 | 21/08/1952 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1953 | 13/01/1954 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1954 | 26/01/1955 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1955 | 18/04/1955 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1955 | 22/04/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1956 | 01/02/1956 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1956 | 20/09/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1957 | 18/01/1957 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/04/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29329 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1957 | 08/10/1957 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1958 | 05/03/1958 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1958 | 08/10/1958 | 24 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1959 | 17/06/1959 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1960 | 21/03/1960 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1960 | 14/07/1960 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1960 | 02/02/1961 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29332 (Diagram 107) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/09/1945 | G.N. Section | The rebuilt A.1, 4470, is working regular trial runs from King's Cross shed on day and night expresses to Grantham and back, apparently in comparison with A.4 4466, also recently off Plant, and with the same crews. | SLS/194601 |
31/01/1946 | Doncaster Works | 3696 recently left Plant after its first general repair. A number of modifications have been incorporated, including the replacement of the new pattern regulator valve and hurdle by the Gresley type (it is understood that the new pattern had shown a tendency to stick), the substitution of the usual Pacific type screw reverse for the steam reverse originally fitted, and the removal of the hinged discs over the headlamps and the substitution of normal headlamp brackets. The loco now has-the eight-wheeled tender formerly attached to 4469. 4470 has also been On Plant, and has had a number of alterations made. The smoke deflectors previously mentioned have now been fitted, and the nameplates are attached to them. They are slightly sloped at the front, and turned in at the top. The cab floor of this loco was originally 6' higher than is standard on the Pacifics, but this was found to involve additional strain on the fireman. The floor has now been lowered to the usual height, and at the same time the outside of the cab and the rear portion of the running plate have been altered to the usual Pacific pattern. The external modifications to the loco have been very beneficial to its appearance. The loco has also had headlamp brackets fitted in addition to the discs. Owing to difficulties experienced with breakages of the outside exhaust pipes on the Thompson Pacifics, these pipes have now been fitted with a sliding joint. The trouble has thereby been cured. Ten O6's, 3148-57, have been turned out without Works' numbers to allow for the numbers 1554-63, which were left blank following the cancellation of a batch of J50's to which they were allotted. ln those days the Works' numbers were allotted in-advance by the Drawing Office, but they are now allotted by 'the Foreman of the New Erecting Shop to ensure that the correct sequence is maintained if two-or more orders are being executed simultaneously. It is likely that the first of the new batch of A2's will be Doncaster No. 2000. On 29/12, O6's 3156-61 were under construction. Two more conversions to A3 have been made, using the boilers off the Pl.'s. 2548 has the boiler with ordinary dome off 2393 (converted in October), whilst 2572 received the banjo-dome poiler off 2394 in November. It is Understood that conversion of the K3's to K5 is likely to be proceeded with rapidly. |
SLS/194602 |
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1470, name: GREAT NORTHERN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1536 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Lined passenger green Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
27/09/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1922. Dep: 29/09/1922. | ||
24/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1922. Dep: 26/10/1922. | ||
04/12/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1922. Dep: 06/12/1922. | ||
01/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1923. Dep: 02/01/1923. | ||
23/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1923. Dep: 29/01/1923. | ||
03/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1923. Dep: 08/02/1923. | ||
23/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1923. Dep: 26/05/1923. | ||
22/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/08/1923. Dep: 09/10/1923. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1470N |
||
09/10/1923 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
28/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/02/1924. Dep: 09/04/1924. | ||
01/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1924. Dep: 21/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4470 |
||
16/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/04/1925. Dep: 18/04/1925. | ||
01/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1926. Dep: 06/02/1926. | ||
03/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1926. Dep: 08/06/1926. | ||
04/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1928. Dep: 08/06/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
25/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1928. Dep: 30/10/1928. | ||
07/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929. | ||
10/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1930. Dep: 02/08/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
24/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1930. Dep: 12/11/1930. | ||
23/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. | ||
06/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1933. Dep: 25/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/12/1933. Dep: 08/02/1934. | ||
29/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1934. Dep: 16/01/1935. | ||
05/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/03/1936. Dep: 22/04/1936. | ||
15/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1937. Dep: 02/12/1937. Work undertaken: Blow-down Apparatus |
||
02/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. | ||
17/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. | ||
05/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
08/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1942. Dep: 14/02/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
14/02/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
20/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1943. Dep: 24/12/1943. | ||
08/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/05/1945. Dep: 25/09/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A1/1 |
||
02/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29294 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/10/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
02/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1945. Dep: 13/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 500 but not taken up | ||
20/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1946. Dep: 21/01/1946. | ||
26/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1946. Dep: 06/03/1946. | ||
16/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1946. Dep: 21/05/1946. | ||
05/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1946. Dep: 11/07/1946. | ||
19/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/09/1946. Dep: 25/09/1946. | ||
09/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 113 | ||
28/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1947. Dep: 16/05/1947. | ||
18/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. | ||
24/07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
02/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
13/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1948. Dep: 01/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60113 |
||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 06/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29288 (Diagram 107) |
||
03/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/05/1950. Dep: 11/05/1950. | ||
02/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/06/1950. Dep: 21/06/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
19/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/04/1951. Dep: 18/05/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
20/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1951. Dep: 04/12/1951. | ||
20/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1952. Dep: 21/08/1952. | ||
25/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 13/01/1954. | ||
15/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 26/01/1955. | ||
24/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1955. Dep: 18/04/1955. | ||
20/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/04/1955. Dep: 22/04/1955. | ||
11/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1956. Dep: 01/02/1956. | ||
07/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. | ||
18/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 20/09/1956. | ||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 18/01/1957. | ||
15/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29329 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
24/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 08/10/1957. | ||
13/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1958. Dep: 05/03/1958. | ||
02/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958. | ||
15/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1958. Dep: 08/10/1958. | ||
04/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1959. Dep: 17/06/1959. | ||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 21/03/1960. | ||
05/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1960. Dep: 14/07/1960. | ||
07/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1960. Dep: 02/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29332 (Diagram 107) |
||
19/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60113 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |