|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1922 | 21/08/1922 | 8 days | Unclassified | Indicator gear fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1922 | 04/11/1922 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1922 | 10/11/1922 | 2 days | Special | Naming Named SIR FREDERICK BANBURY |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1923 | 10/03/1923 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1923 | 10/08/1923 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1923 | 14/12/1923 | 64 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1471N |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1924 | 31/01/1924 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1924 | 07/07/1924 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1924 | 06/11/1924 | 18 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1925 | 01/08/1925 | 107 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4471 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1926 | 06/02/1926 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1926 | 20/03/1926 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1926 | 19/06/1926 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1927 | 18/06/1927 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1927 | 13/03/1928 | 84 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1928 | 28/11/1928 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1929 | 17/07/1929 | 70 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1930 | 27/11/1930 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1931 | 20/11/1931 | 53 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1933 | 01/04/1933 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1934 | 02/11/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1936 | 20/03/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1937 | 25/11/1937 | 3 days | Light Repair | Blow-down Apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1938 | 27/05/1938 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1938 | 20/09/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | Water Scoop Altered |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1939 | 12/08/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1942 | 16/10/1942 | 39 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5292 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1943 | 05/09/1943 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1947 | 20/05/1947 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9571 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1947 | 08/10/1947 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1949 | 13/05/1949 | 47 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60102 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1951 | 10/08/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1953 | 30/09/1953 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1955 | 16/06/1955 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1956 | 13/06/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1956 | 14/12/1956 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1959 | 21/04/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1959 | 08/10/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1961 | 24/03/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1961 | 09/08/1961 | 22 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
10/05/1947 | Doncaster Works | Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). | SLS/194708 |
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/07/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1471 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1539 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Lined passenger green Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
14/08/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/08/1922. Dep: 21/08/1922. Work undertaken: Indicator gear fitted |
||
30/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1922. Dep: 04/11/1922. | ||
09/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Special) - Arr: 09/11/1922. Dep: 10/11/1922. Work undertaken: Naming Named SIR FREDERICK BANBURY |
||
03/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1923. Dep: 10/03/1923. | ||
10/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1923. Dep: 10/08/1923. | ||
12/10/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1923. Dep: 14/12/1923. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1471N |
||
14/12/1923 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
23/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1924. Dep: 31/01/1924. | ||
07/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1924. Dep: 07/07/1924. | ||
20/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/10/1924. Dep: 06/11/1924. | ||
17/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4471 |
||
22/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1926. Dep: 06/02/1926. | ||
25/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1926. Dep: 20/03/1926. | ||
19/05/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/05/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. | ||
22/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1927. Dep: 18/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
26/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
21/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/12/1927. Dep: 13/03/1928. | ||
02/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1928. Dep: 28/11/1928. | ||
09/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/05/1929. Dep: 17/07/1929. | ||
24/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1930. Dep: 27/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
29/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/09/1931. Dep: 20/11/1931. | ||
12/12/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
03/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/02/1933. Dep: 01/04/1933. | ||
05/05/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1934. Dep: 02/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
31/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1936. Dep: 20/03/1936. | ||
02/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
23/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1937. Dep: 25/11/1937. Work undertaken: Blow-down Apparatus |
||
13/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1938. Dep: 27/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
12/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1938. Dep: 20/09/1938. Work undertaken: Water Scoop Altered |
||
26/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1939. Dep: 12/08/1939. | ||
18/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. | ||
08/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/09/1942. Dep: 16/10/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5292 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
16/10/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
01/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
15/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1943. Dep: 05/09/1943. | ||
30/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
11/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 501 but not taken up | ||
24/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 102 | ||
11/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1947. Dep: 20/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9571 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
20/05/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
26/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/09/1947. Dep: 08/10/1947. | ||
28/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1949. Dep: 13/05/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60102 |
||
16/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 10/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
25/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
14/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1953. Dep: 30/09/1953. | ||
04/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
21/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 16/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
13/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/06/1956. Dep: 13/06/1956. | ||
01/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/11/1956. Dep: 14/12/1956. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
01/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1959. Dep: 21/04/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
28/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 08/10/1959. | ||
05/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
14/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/11/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960. | ||
06/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1961. Dep: 24/03/1961. | ||
19/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1961. Dep: 09/08/1961. | ||
14/11/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60102 from Kings Cross (34A) |