|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1923 | 02/03/1924 | 67 days | General | Prepared for Wembley Exhibition Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4472 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1925 | 19/04/1925 | 28 days | Heavy | K3 tender coupled Tender number 5378 (LNER 4,200g Group Standard) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | Own tender replaced Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1927 | 28/04/1927 | 70 days | General | Variable blastpipe fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1928 | 05/04/1928 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1929 | 08/06/1929 | 47 days | General | Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1931 | 02/04/1931 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1932 | 20/05/1932 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1933 | 27/04/1933 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1934 | 30/05/1934 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1934 | 27/11/1934 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1935 | 18/05/1935 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1936 | 14/06/1936 | 82 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1936 | 20/10/1936 | 2 days | Unclassified | Corridor tender removed Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1938 | 13/04/1938 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 37 days | General | Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1939 | 03/11/1939 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1939 | 23/11/1939 | 4 days | Light Repair | Blow-down Apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1941 | 11/06/1941 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1943 | 03/04/1943 | 36 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1944 | 23/02/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1945 | 10/03/1945 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1946 | 18/05/1946 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/11/1946 | 04/01/1947 | 48 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1948 | 15/03/1948 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E103 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1948 | 30/12/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60103 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1949 | 16/12/1949 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1952 | 14/03/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1954 | 06/04/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1954 | 22/04/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1957 | 13/07/1957 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1960 | 09/08/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1961 | 04/03/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1961 | 16/12/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1962 | 02/06/1962 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
02/09/1947 | St Rollox Works | Ex. Highland 4-6-0 No. 103 was taken into the Erecting Shop on 2/9 presumably for reconditioning; the coupling and connecting rods, boiler mountings, etc., have been in the works for some considerable time but this was the first movement of the actual loco. No. 6656 (27C) arrived on 20/8. This is the first L. & N.W. loco. to be repaired here. | SLS/194710 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
26/01/1952 | Scottish Miscellany | Five of the 'Clan' Class are now at Polmadie and work through to Manchester, going out from Glasgow (Central) at 1.45 p.m. and 4.5 p.m., returning on 9.30 a.m. and 2.0 p.m. from Manchester. The spare engine is utilised on relieving duties. Of the new B.R. 2-6-4T working from Corkerhill, one is going through to Girvan on passenger turns but reports of regular late arrivals are made by local people. The two preserved engines at St. Rollox (C.R. 4-2-2 No. 123 and H.R. 4-6-0 No. 103) were recently re-varnished. After threatening withdrawal of passenger service, B.R. have now stated that the Lockerbie-Dumfries service is to be continued. It is rumoured locally that the Kinross Jct.-Alloa passenger service is to be discontinued shortly. B.R. 4-6-2, No. 72005 (68A) appeared in mid-March at Stranraer on the 8.55 a.m. train from Glasgow. It is stated locally that the class may appear regularly during the summer when traffic is heavier. A 2-6-4T of the 80000 series has also been seen working (test?) trains on the Girvan and Newton Stewart roads. No. 55262 ex C.R. 0-4-4T has been noted after overhaul with standard cast chimney in place of the shorter one for this series. W.D. No. 90464 noted at Eastfield on 15th March with red L.M.S. corridor tender, presumably for dynamometer tests in the area. | SLS/195204 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
18/04/1959 | Branch Lines | The following have been approved for closure by the T.U.C.C. and it is expected that some of the passenger services thereon will lapse with the end of Winter t.t.- Kettering to Cambridge (as far as St. Ives), Penistone-Barnsley-Mexborough, South-well branch, Stamford-Essendine, Wallingford branch and Wellingborough-Higham Ferrers; in connection with the Barnsley (C.H.) branch, note that the 1-25 a.m. Manchester (L. Rd.)-Doncaster is still to travel this way calling at Barnsley. The T.U.C.C. have not approved the closure of the Grimsby and Immingham Ty. or the local stations between Sheffield and Penistone; C.I.E. is to close the former G.N.R. (I) Hill of Howth Ty. as from 1st June. In connection with the quotations which the Press made from the N.U.R. Review of the list of branches 'under consideration' on the L.M.R., it should be noted that the operative word is 'consideration.' Any concrete proposals have to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. concerned, together with the alternative facilities arranged. It is understood that the Churnet Valley, Northampton-Bedford and Bedford-Hitchin branches are to be submitted to the T.U.C.C. for closure together with the local stations between Northampton and Rugby and Roade station. On the W.R., it is understood that it is proposed to withdraw the passenger services from Hartlebury and Kidderminster to Bridgnorth and between Bewdley and Woofferton if the B.T.C. Parliamentary bill is approved. During the early part of May A5 69808 worked the Southwell branch whilst 58065 was under repair. During May, the Penistone-Barnsley branch was worked by J11s or 67445 (C14); the other C14 (67448) was out of use at Mexborough shed. It is expected that this will be the last sununer that it will be possible to travel by passenger train between Tebay or Penrith and Barnard Castle (goods traffic has already been diverted); the last summer too that it will be possible to travel by steam train on the Oban and Fort William branches. Locomotive Information H.R. 103 is at present in St. Rollox Works undergoing heavy repair. N.B.R. Glen Douglas is in Cowlairs Works being ' restored ' and work on the M.R. Compound proceeds at Derby-on 22nd May the number 1000 was affixed to the smokebox (see Derby Works list). |
SLS/195906 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
16/04/1962 | Highland section | Dismantling of the Fortrose and Dornoch branches commenced on 16th April and a diesel works as required from Inverness to Muir of Ord in connection with work on the former branch. The Dornoch branch is worked as a private siding. The down side sidings and branch water tank at The Mound have been removed already. Helmsdale shed has lost its roof and Blair Atholl shed is now disconnected (a Standard tank works the Aberfeldy branch). Inverness shed is now closed from public road and work is performed at Loch Gorm; the only steam engines on shed at end of April were 1646, 44784, 54466, 54482, 54495, 55269 and HR 103. The only steam loco. north thereof was 1649 at Dingwall. | SLS/196206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/02/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1472, name: FLYING SCOTSMAN Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1564 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
27/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1923. Dep: 02/03/1924. Work undertaken: Prepared for Wembley Exhibition Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4472 |
||
23/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/03/1925. Dep: 19/04/1925. Work undertaken: K3 tender coupled Tender number 5378 (LNER 4,200g Group Standard) attached. |
||
16/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. Work undertaken: Own tender replaced Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
18/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1927. Dep: 28/04/1927. Work undertaken: Variable blastpipe fitted |
||
14/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1928. Dep: 05/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
11/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
23/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
17/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. | ||
10/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1931. Dep: 02/04/1931. | ||
06/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1932. Dep: 20/05/1932. | ||
23/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1933. Dep: 27/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) |
||
19/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 30/05/1934. | ||
26/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1934. Dep: 27/11/1934. | ||
27/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) |
||
25/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/03/1936. Dep: 14/06/1936. | ||
19/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1936. Dep: 20/10/1936. Work undertaken: Corridor tender removed Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
25/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. | ||
12/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 13/04/1938. | ||
27/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
06/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1939. Dep: 03/11/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) |
||
20/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1939. Dep: 23/11/1939. Work undertaken: Blow-down Apparatus |
||
10/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 11/06/1941. | ||
27/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
03/04/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
05/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 23/02/1944. | ||
12/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/11/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
05/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945. | ||
21/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 502 | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 103 | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946. | ||
18/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
02/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1948. Dep: 15/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E103 |
||
17/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 30/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60103 |
||
04/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
16/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
08/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
13/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954. | ||
20/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
26/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
06/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. | ||
06/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 09/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961. | ||
21/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
25/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1962. Dep: 02/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
15/01/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60103 from Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325 |