Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 796 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5397 Week
» 16944 Month
» 416626 Year
» 493213 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1472   24/02/1923
LNER (1924) 4472   02/03/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 502   21/01/1946
LNER (1946 2nd) 103   05/05/1946
BR (Tmp) E103   15/03/1948
BR 60103   30/12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
24/02/1923 FLYING SCOTSMAN

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 24/02/1923
LNER Black Unlined 03/04/1943
LNER Apple Green Black and White 04/01/1947
BR Blue Black and White 16/12/1949
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 14/03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Gresley
Class A3
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 297
Works Number 1564
Brakes (when built) Vacuum Brake
To Service Tue 24/02/1923 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Tue 15/01/1963 off Kings Cross (34A)
Service Life 39 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
GNR 5,000g 5223 24/02/1923 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER 4,200g Group Standard 5378 19/04/1925 LNER 4,200g 7t 10cwt
GNR 5,000g 5223 16/11/1925 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5323 05/04/1928 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5324 08/06/1929 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt
GNR 5,000g 5290 20/10/1936 GNR 5,000g 8t 0cwt
Streamlined Non-Corridor 5640 02/07/1938 LNER 5,000g 8t 0cwt
LNER Corridor 5325 02/1963 LNER 5,000g 9t 0cwt

Notes
Notes Sold for preservation to A F Pegler

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) 24/02/1923
KX Kings Cross 11/04/1928
DON Doncaster 06/03/1939
NWE New England 12/03/1944
GOR Gorton 07/07/1944
KX Kings Cross 29/10/1944
NWE New England 11/11/1944
DON Doncaster 05/12/1944
38C Leicester (G.C.) 04/06/1950
35B Grantham 15/11/1953
34A Kings Cross 20/06/1954
35B Grantham 29/08/1954
34A Kings Cross 07/04/1957
   Withdrawn 15/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 38C Leicester (G.C.) m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 35B Grantham 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   15/01/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/02/1923 Diagram 94 boiler fitted (number 7693)
05/04/1928 Long Travel Valves fitted
05/04/1928 Diagram 94 boiler fitted (number 7878)
27/04/1933 Diagram 94 boiler fitted (number 7804)
18/05/1935 Diagram 94 boiler fitted (number 7772)
03/11/1939 Diagram 94 boiler fitted (number 7785)
04/01/1947 Diagram 94HP boiler fitted (number 8078)
15/03/1948 To 75% Cut-off
16/12/1949 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 9448)
14/03/1952 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27015)
06/04/1954 Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive
06/04/1954 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27074)
08/10/1955 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27007)
13/07/1957 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27011)
24/01/1959 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27044)
24/01/1959 Double Chimney fitted
09/08/1960 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27047)
16/12/1961 Trough deflectors fitted
02/06/1962 Diagram 94A boiler fitted (number 27058)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 27/12/1923 02/03/1924 67 days General
Prepared for Wembley Exhibition
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4472
 
Doncaster Works 23/03/1925 19/04/1925 28 days Heavy
K3 tender coupled
Tender number 5378 (LNER 4,200g Group Standard) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 16/11/1925 28/11/1925 13 days Light Repair
Own tender replaced
Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 18/02/1927 28/04/1927 70 days General
Variable blastpipe fitted
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1928 05/04/1928 52 days General
Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94)
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Long Travel Valves fitted
 
Doncaster Works 23/04/1929 08/06/1929 47 days General
Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 17/01/1930 15/03/1930 58 days General  
Doncaster Works 10/02/1931 02/04/1931 52 days General  
Doncaster Works 06/04/1932 20/05/1932 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 23/02/1933 27/04/1933 64 days General
Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94)
 
Doncaster Works 19/04/1934 30/05/1934 42 days General  
Doncaster Works 26/11/1934 27/11/1934 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/03/1935 18/05/1935 53 days General
Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94)
 
Doncaster Works 25/03/1936 14/06/1936 82 days Heavy  
Doncaster Works 19/10/1936 20/10/1936 2 days Unclassified
Corridor tender removed
Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 25/06/1937 24/07/1937 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 12/04/1938 13/04/1938 2 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 27/05/1938 02/07/1938 37 days General
Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
 
Doncaster Works 18/09/1939 03/11/1939 47 days General
Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94)
 
Doncaster Works 20/11/1939 23/11/1939 4 days Light Repair
Blow-down Apparatus
 
Doncaster Works 10/05/1941 11/06/1941 33 days General  
Doncaster Works 27/02/1943 03/04/1943 36 days General
Painted Wartime unlined black
 
Doncaster Works 05/02/1944 23/02/1944 19 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 03/02/1945 10/03/1945 36 days General  
Doncaster Works 18/05/1946 18/05/1946 1 day Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 18/11/1946 04/01/1947 48 days Heavy
Rebuilt to class A3
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
 
Doncaster Works 02/02/1948 15/03/1948 43 days General
Boiler number 9119 (Diagram 94A)
To 75% Cut-off
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E103
 
Doncaster Works 17/12/1948 30/12/1948 14 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60103
 
Doncaster Works 04/11/1949 16/12/1949 43 days General
Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
 
Doncaster Works 05/02/1952 14/03/1952 39 days General
Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 08/03/1954 06/04/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A)
Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive
 
Doncaster Works 13/04/1954 22/04/1954 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 26/08/1955 08/10/1955 44 days General
Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 06/05/1957 13/07/1957 69 days General
Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 10/12/1958 24/01/1959 46 days General
Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A)
Double Chimney fitted
 
Doncaster Works 08/03/1960 24/03/1960 17 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/07/1960 09/08/1960 35 days General
Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A)
 
Doncaster Works 14/02/1961 04/03/1961 19 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/11/1961 16/12/1961 26 days Light Casual
Trough deflectors fitted
 
Doncaster Works 25/04/1962 02/06/1962 39 days General
Boiler number 9116 (Diagram 94A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/02/1923 To Service To service as GNR Number 1472, name: FLYING SCOTSMAN
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1564
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g
Diagram 94 boiler fitted
   
27/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1923. Dep: 02/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Prepared for Wembley Exhibition
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4472
   
23/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/03/1925. Dep: 19/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
K3 tender coupled
Tender number 5378 (LNER 4,200g Group Standard) attached.
   
16/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Own tender replaced
Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
   
18/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1927. Dep: 28/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Variable blastpipe fitted
   
14/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1928. Dep: 05/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94)
Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached.
Long Travel Valves fitted
   
11/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
23/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached.
   
17/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930.    
10/02/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1931. Dep: 02/04/1931.    
06/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1932. Dep: 20/05/1932.    
23/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1933. Dep: 27/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94)
   
19/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 30/05/1934.    
26/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1934. Dep: 27/11/1934.    
27/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1935. Dep: 18/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94)
   
25/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/03/1936. Dep: 14/06/1936.    
19/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1936. Dep: 20/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Corridor tender removed
Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached.
   
25/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937.    
12/04/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 13/04/1938.    
27/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 5640 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached.
   
06/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1939. Dep: 03/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94)
   
20/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/11/1939. Dep: 23/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Blow-down Apparatus
   
10/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1941. Dep: 11/06/1941.    
27/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Painted Wartime unlined black
   
05/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1944. Dep: 23/02/1944.    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
07/07/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
11/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
05/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 502    
05/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 103    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 18/05/1946.    
18/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/11/1946. Dep: 04/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class A3
Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP)
Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
   
02/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1948. Dep: 15/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9119 (Diagram 94A)
To 75% Cut-off
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E103
   
17/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1948. Dep: 30/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60103
   
04/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1949. Dep: 16/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9448 (Diagram 94A)
Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining.
   
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C)    
05/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 14/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A)
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
15/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
08/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1954. Dep: 06/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A)
Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive
   
13/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954.    
20/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
29/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (35B)    
26/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A)
   
07/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A)    
06/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 13/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27011 (Diagram 94A)
   
10/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A)
Double Chimney fitted
   
08/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960.    
06/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1960. Dep: 09/08/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A)
   
14/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1961. Dep: 04/03/1961.    
21/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 16/12/1961.
Work undertaken:
Trough deflectors fitted
   
02/12/1961 Sightings Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Outside Crimpsall. SLS 1/1962 Link
25/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1962. Dep: 02/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9116 (Diagram 94A)
   
15/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60103 from Kings Cross (34A)    
02/1963 Tender Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325    
01/05/1968 Sightings Ran a non-stop run from Kings Cross to Edinburgh Waverley RCTS 6/1968  

prev prev