|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1923 | 14/12/1923 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1474N |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1924 | 15/11/1924 | 61 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4474 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1926 | 19/06/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1927 | 01/03/1927 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1927 | 27/06/1927 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1928 | 19/05/1928 | 131 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1929 | 30/09/1929 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 7700 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1930 | 09/01/1931 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1932 | 05/03/1932 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1932 | 13/05/1932 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1932 | 13/01/1933 | 50 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1933 | 06/02/1934 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1937 | 10/11/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | Blow-down Apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1938 | 16/12/1938 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1940 | 19/12/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1942 | 01/10/1942 | 53 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1943 | 30/03/1943 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 33 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1944 | 07/10/1944 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1945 | 07/12/1945 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 9572 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1948 | 18/08/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9212 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60105 |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1950 | 17/03/1950 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1950 | 07/12/1950 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1951 | 03/07/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1951 | 17/07/1951 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1953 | 20/02/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1954 | 13/08/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1955 | 09/12/1955 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1956 | 17/08/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 27048 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1960 | 05/03/1960 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1960 | 09/12/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1962 | 18/10/1962 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1963 | 08/03/1963 | 31 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/03/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1474, name: VICTOR WILD Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1566 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
04/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1923. Dep: 14/12/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1474N |
||
16/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1924. Dep: 15/11/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4474 |
||
13/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 19/06/1926. | ||
21/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1927. Dep: 01/03/1927. | ||
09/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1927. Dep: 27/06/1927. | ||
10/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928. | ||
14/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1929. Dep: 30/09/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7700 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
11/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1930. Dep: 09/01/1931. | ||
14/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932. | ||
13/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1932. Dep: 13/05/1932. | ||
25/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1932. Dep: 13/01/1933. | ||
10/07/1933 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5327 | ||
11/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1933. Dep: 06/02/1934. | ||
24/08/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5225 | ||
04/09/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
15/09/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5225 | ||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) |
||
25/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. | ||
05/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) |
||
09/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1937. Dep: 10/11/1937. Work undertaken: Blow-down Apparatus |
||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 16/12/1938. | ||
25/02/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 19/12/1940. | ||
10/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/08/1942. Dep: 01/10/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
22/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 30/03/1943. | ||
19/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. | ||
06/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. | ||
07/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/09/1944. Dep: 07/10/1944. | ||
01/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1945. Dep: 07/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 504 but not taken up | ||
12/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 105 | ||
18/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9572 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
31/05/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
02/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1948. Dep: 18/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9212 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60105 |
||
15/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1950. Dep: 17/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
17/03/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. | ||
21/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1950. Dep: 07/12/1950. | ||
21/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1951. Dep: 03/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27050 (Diagram 94A) |
||
11/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 17/07/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
18/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1953. Dep: 20/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
20/02/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
06/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1954. Dep: 13/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27056 (Diagram 94A) |
||
12/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1955. Dep: 09/12/1955. | ||
19/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1956. Dep: 17/08/1956. | ||
11/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27048 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
22/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960. | ||
01/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1960. Dep: 09/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. | ||
17/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1962. Dep: 18/10/1962. | ||
06/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1963. Dep: 08/03/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60105 from Grantham (34F) |