|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1924 | 14/02/1925 | 80 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4475 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1925 | 06/02/1926 | 92 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1927 | 13/06/1927 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1928 | 24/07/1928 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 7699 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5228 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1929 | 13/04/1929 | 61 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1930 | 17/05/1930 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1930 | 31/01/1931 | 65 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1931 | 06/07/1931 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1932 | 27/05/1932 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1933 | 01/07/1933 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1934 | 08/06/1934 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1935 | 13/06/1935 | 50 days | General | Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1935 | 19/10/1935 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1936 | 10/06/1936 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1936 | 29/10/1936 | 7 days | Light Repair | Corridor tender removed Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1937 | 18/03/1937 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1937 | 29/01/1938 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1939 | 01/04/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 7779 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5278 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1941 | 06/02/1942 | 40 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1943 | 05/11/1943 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1945 | 21/07/1945 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 47 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9569 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60106 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1950 | 24/05/1950 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9208 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1952 | 20/04/1952 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1953 | 10/12/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1955 | 26/07/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5212 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1955 | 06/10/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1956 | 06/07/1956 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1957 | 22/02/1957 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1958 | 26/03/1958 | 16 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1958 | 21/11/1958 | 54 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1960 | 12/04/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1960 | 01/12/1960 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1962 | 16/06/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1963 | 18/07/1963 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/01/1943 | LNER Notes | On 11/1/1943, the 8 a.m. Perth-Edinburgh was hauled by 3401 Bantam Cock, with 9418 Dumbie-dykes as pilot up Glenfarg to Kincross Jc. Two days later 'J.39' 2980 (EFD) worked several locals on the Dundee-Tayport branch. 'K.3's' 1121 and 1106 were noted at Dundee on 30/12 and 3/1 respectively, while a most unusual visitor on 30/12 was 4475 Flying Fox on the 12.40 Aberdeen to Dundee. | SLS/194302 |
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/04/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1475, name: FLYING FOX Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1567 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
27/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1924. Dep: 14/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4475 |
||
07/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1925. Dep: 06/02/1926. | ||
21/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. | ||
11/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 13/06/1927. | ||
02/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1928. Dep: 24/07/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7699 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5228 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
10/08/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
12/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/02/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929. | ||
01/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. | ||
13/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/05/1930. Dep: 17/05/1930. | ||
28/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1930. Dep: 31/01/1931. | ||
12/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1931. Dep: 06/07/1931. | ||
21/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1932. Dep: 27/05/1932. | ||
11/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7878 (Diagram 94) |
||
23/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1934. Dep: 08/06/1934. | ||
04/09/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5225 | ||
15/09/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
25/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1935. Dep: 13/06/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
17/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935. | ||
22/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1936. Dep: 10/06/1936. | ||
23/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1936. Dep: 29/10/1936. Work undertaken: Corridor tender removed Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
02/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1937. Dep: 18/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
29/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1937. Dep: 29/01/1938. | ||
17/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939. | ||
06/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7779 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5278 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
26/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
29/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1941. Dep: 06/02/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
06/02/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
13/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1943. Dep: 05/11/1943. | ||
04/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
09/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
22/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 505 but not taken up | ||
29/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 106 | ||
28/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9569 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
15/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60106 |
||
08/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1950. Dep: 24/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9208 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
24/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. | ||
13/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1952. Dep: 20/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
20/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
03/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 10/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
02/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 26/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5212 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 06/10/1955. | ||
05/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1956. Dep: 06/07/1956. | ||
19/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1957. Dep: 22/02/1957. | ||
05/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
11/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1958. Dep: 26/03/1958. | ||
29/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1958. Dep: 21/11/1958. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1960. Dep: 12/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/11/1960. Dep: 01/12/1960. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
03/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1962. Dep: 16/06/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/06/1963. Dep: 18/07/1963. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60106 from New England (34E) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |