|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1924 | 14/06/1924 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 73 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4476 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1926 | 22/07/1926 | 97 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1927 | 09/02/1927 | 27 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1927 | 05/04/1928 | 105 days | General | Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1929 | 25/05/1929 | 39 days | General | Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1930 | 16/05/1930 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1931 | 09/05/1931 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1931 | 04/02/1932 | 60 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 16 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1933 | 05/07/1933 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1935 | 27/06/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 7702 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1936 | 14/03/1936 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1936 | 19/06/1936 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1937 | 10/07/1937 | 32 days | General | Tender number 5481 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1938 | 16/05/1938 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1938 | 05/12/1938 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1939 | 19/08/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1940 | 13/03/1940 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1940 | 03/06/1940 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1941 | 06/06/1941 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 29 days | General | Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1945 | 30/12/1945 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1946 | 04/10/1946 | 56 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27043 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 107 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1948 | 23/04/1948 | 47 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60107 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1949 | 30/03/1949 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1949 | 10/10/1949 | 52 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/10/1949 | 19/10/1949 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1950 | 01/03/1950 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1951 | 27/04/1951 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1952 | 03/12/1952 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1954 | 20/10/1954 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1955 | 16/08/1955 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1956 | 29/02/1956 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1956 | 24/08/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1957 | 27/02/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1957 | 16/08/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1957 | 06/09/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1957 | 08/01/1958 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1958 | 21/05/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1959 | 02/06/1959 | 27 days | Light Casual | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1959 | 14/11/1959 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1960 | 18/06/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1960 | 05/08/1960 | 37 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1961 | 24/01/1961 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1962 | 22/02/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1962 | 02/01/1963 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | General | Amongst locomotives carrying cast smokebox numberplates, the following have been noted: Nos. 60007/33/54, 60107, 60511 an 60866. | SLS/194806 |
01/10/1949 | Inverurie Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61513/43, 62281, 4476/87, 5218/59, 65274, 5276, 65321, 68467, 69129, ex L.M.S. 4189/94, 15268, 16352, 17288, 57306. | SLS/194911 |
31/10/1957 | Leicester (G.C.) MPD | This shed is expected to close and the work shared between Neasden and Darnall (41A). At start of winter time tables the A3's (60049/102/4/6/7/11) were exchanged for V2's 60831/42/54/63/911. This leaves no A3's on the G.C. at all. A5 69800 has replaced L1 67786. | SLS/195711 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/05/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1476, name: ROYAL LANCER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1568 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
26/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1924. Dep: 14/06/1924. | ||
27/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4476 |
||
17/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 22/07/1926. | ||
14/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/01/1927. Dep: 09/02/1927. | ||
23/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1927. Dep: 05/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5324 (LNER Corridor) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
11/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
17/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1929. Dep: 25/05/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5323 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
18/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1930. Dep: 16/05/1930. | ||
20/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
07/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/12/1931. Dep: 04/02/1932. | ||
03/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/06/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. | ||
28/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1933. Dep: 05/07/1933. | ||
25/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. | ||
18/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. | ||
15/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1935. Dep: 27/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7702 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
09/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936. | ||
07/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1936. Dep: 19/06/1936. | ||
09/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1937. Dep: 10/07/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5481 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
13/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1938. Dep: 16/05/1938. | ||
25/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1938. Dep: 05/12/1938. | ||
30/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
27/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1940. Dep: 13/03/1940. | ||
17/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1940. Dep: 03/06/1940. | ||
26/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
02/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1941. Dep: 06/06/1941. | ||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 5267 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
20/02/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
27/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. | ||
11/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/06/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
01/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. | ||
16/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
29/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1945. Dep: 30/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 506 but not taken up | ||
19/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
10/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 04/10/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27043 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 107 |
||
08/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1948. Dep: 23/04/1948. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60107 |
||
20/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1949. Dep: 30/03/1949. | ||
20/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1949. Dep: 10/10/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
14/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1949. Dep: 19/10/1949. | ||
25/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1950. Dep: 01/03/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
02/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. | ||
27/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
10/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 03/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
03/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
11/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1954. Dep: 20/10/1954. | ||
21/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. | ||
07/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/08/1955. Dep: 16/08/1955. | ||
29/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/02/1956. Dep: 29/02/1956. | ||
17/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1956. Dep: 24/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
04/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1957. Dep: 27/02/1957. | ||
25/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 16/08/1957. | ||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 06/09/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 08/01/1958. | ||
10/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 21/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 02/06/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
28/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 14/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1960. Dep: 18/06/1960. | ||
30/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1960. Dep: 05/08/1960. | ||
09/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
07/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1961. Dep: 24/01/1961. | ||
17/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1962. Dep: 22/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
04/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1962. Dep: 02/01/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
01/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60107 from Grantham (34F) |