|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1923 | 09/08/1923 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1923 | 25/09/1923 | 33 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1477N |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1923 | 22/12/1923 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1924 | 07/06/1924 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 103 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4477 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1926 | 23/02/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | Valve gear modifications |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1927 | 03/11/1927 | 8 days | Light Repair | "Diamond" soot blower fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1928 | 30/01/1928 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1928 | 10/02/1928 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1928 | 13/06/1928 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 7704 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1928 | 23/10/1928 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1930 | 12/07/1930 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1930 | 14/02/1931 | 76 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1932 | 11/06/1932 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1933 | 27/09/1933 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1933 | 19/12/1933 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1935 | 07/03/1935 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/04/1935 | 11/04/1935 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1936 | 05/03/1936 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1936 | 08/04/1936 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1936 | 28/11/1936 | 9 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1937 | 23/06/1937 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1937 | 04/11/1937 | 1 day | Light Repair | Blow-down apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1938 | 22/07/1938 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1942 | 30/01/1943 | 40 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1943 | 01/01/1944 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1944 | 18/11/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1946 | 28/03/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 507 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1947 | 22/08/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9124 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1949 | 25/03/1949 | 47 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60108 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1952 | 21/02/1952 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1953 | 30/10/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1954 | 01/11/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1955 | 04/07/1955 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1957 | 18/07/1957 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1958 | 15/07/1958 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1959 | 21/05/1959 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1960 | 21/09/1960 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1961 | 17/11/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1962 | 06/04/1962 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1963 | 01/03/1963 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/06/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1477, name: GAY CRUSADER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1569 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
08/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1923. Dep: 09/08/1923. | ||
24/08/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1923. Dep: 25/09/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1477N |
||
19/12/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/12/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923. | ||
05/06/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924. | ||
10/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4477 |
||
18/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1926. Dep: 23/02/1926. Work undertaken: Valve gear modifications |
||
19/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. | ||
27/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1927. Dep: 03/11/1927. Work undertaken: "Diamond" soot blower fitted |
||
30/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/01/1928. Dep: 30/01/1928. | ||
06/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1928. Dep: 10/02/1928. | ||
17/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1928. Dep: 13/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7704 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
19/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1928. Dep: 23/10/1928. | ||
07/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
19/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930. | ||
01/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1930. Dep: 14/02/1931. | ||
20/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1932. Dep: 11/06/1932. | ||
12/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 27/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
01/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1933. Dep: 19/12/1933. | ||
12/11/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1935. Dep: 07/03/1935. | ||
09/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1935. Dep: 11/04/1935. | ||
11/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1936. Dep: 05/03/1936. | ||
07/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/04/1936. Dep: 08/04/1936. | ||
20/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/11/1936. Dep: 28/11/1936. | ||
14/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1937. Dep: 23/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
04/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1937. Dep: 04/11/1937. Work undertaken: Blow-down apparatus |
||
09/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1938. Dep: 22/07/1938. | ||
25/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. | ||
01/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. | ||
07/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9213 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
30/01/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
30/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
20/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944. | ||
13/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944. | ||
21/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1946. Dep: 28/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 507 |
||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 108 | ||
05/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1947. Dep: 22/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9124 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
22/08/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR 60108 |
||
30/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
07/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1952. Dep: 21/02/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
21/02/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
22/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
28/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
29/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. | ||
29/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
23/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1953. Dep: 30/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
29/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
11/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1954. Dep: 01/11/1954. | ||
16/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1955. Dep: 04/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27010 (Diagram 94A) |
||
06/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. | ||
10/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
27/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
30/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 18/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1958. Dep: 15/07/1958. | ||
19/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
04/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1959. Dep: 21/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
07/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. | ||
13/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961. | ||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
24/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1961. Dep: 17/11/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
15/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1962. Dep: 06/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
04/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1963. Dep: 01/03/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60108 from Doncaster (36A) |