|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1923 | 26/09/1923 | 2 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1478N |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1923 | 15/11/1923 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1924 | 17/11/1924 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1924 | 05/03/1925 | 88 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4478 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1926 | 23/07/1926 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1926 | 19/01/1927 | 79 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1927 | 16/07/1927 | 13 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1927 | 05/03/1928 | 118 days | General | Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1928 | 04/07/1928 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1928 | 23/02/1929 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1931 | 09/06/1931 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1931 | 17/02/1932 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1933 | 07/03/1933 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1934 | 27/07/1934 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1935 | 19/07/1935 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1936 | 21/08/1936 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1936 | 16/01/1937 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1937 | 26/01/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7791 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1938 | 24/09/1938 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1940 | 05/04/1940 | 47 days | General | Tender number 5289 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1942 | 07/03/1942 | 45 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1943 | 16/11/1943 | 44 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1945 | 13/07/1945 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1947 | 14/05/1947 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1948 | 02/05/1948 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60109 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1948 | 11/01/1949 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1949 | 08/11/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1951 | 05/04/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1952 | 24/04/1952 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1952 | 27/11/1952 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/12/1953 | 08/01/1954 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1954 | 26/11/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1956 | 10/01/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1957 | 16/01/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1958 | 14/03/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1960 | 05/04/1960 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1960 | 27/01/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27973 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1961 | 12/12/1961 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1962 | 08/06/1962 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1962 | 29/10/1962 | 56 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in the Paint Shop at the beginning of November included: Nos. 60030/91, 60109/11, 60891, 60900/38/40, 61208, 61819/91, 61906/53/87, 67379, 69527/47. No. 67387 has been fitted for 'Pull and Push' working. | SLS/194912 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Boiler Park) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/06/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1478, name: HERMIT Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1570 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
25/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1923. Dep: 26/09/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 1478N |
||
14/11/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1923. Dep: 15/11/1923. | ||
08/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1924. Dep: 17/11/1924. | ||
08/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1924. Dep: 05/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4478 |
||
21/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. | ||
17/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/07/1926. Dep: 23/07/1926. | ||
02/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1926. Dep: 19/01/1927. | ||
04/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/07/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927. | ||
09/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1927. Dep: 05/03/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7765 (Diagram 94) |
||
18/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/06/1928. Dep: 04/07/1928. | ||
16/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
03/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1928. Dep: 23/02/1929. | ||
13/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7646 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
09/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. | ||
27/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1931. Dep: 09/06/1931. | ||
18/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1931. Dep: 17/02/1932. | ||
27/03/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5259 | ||
05/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1933. Dep: 07/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 27/07/1934. | ||
13/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935. | ||
06/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1936. Dep: 21/08/1936. | ||
07/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937. | ||
29/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1937. Dep: 26/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7791 (Diagram 94) |
||
26/04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938. | ||
04/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1940. Dep: 05/04/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 5289 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
22/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
07/03/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
22/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
28/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/10/1943. Dep: 16/11/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) |
||
03/12/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
29/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
22/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1945. Dep: 13/07/1945. | ||
20/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 508 | ||
22/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 109 | ||
09/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
15/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
09/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/05/1947. Dep: 14/05/1947. | ||
05/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1948. Dep: 02/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60109 |
||
30/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1948. Dep: 11/01/1949. | ||
02/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1949. Dep: 08/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
06/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1951. Dep: 05/04/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
23/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1952. Dep: 24/04/1952. | ||
16/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 27/11/1952. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/12/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5271 | ||
27/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/12/1953. Dep: 08/01/1954. | ||
16/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1954. Dep: 26/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
03/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1956. Dep: 10/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27052 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1957. Dep: 16/01/1957. | ||
25/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/02/1958. Dep: 14/03/1958. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
19/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1960. Dep: 05/04/1960. | ||
10/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1960. Dep: 27/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27973 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Trough deflectors fitted |
||
15/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 12/12/1961. | ||
22/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1962. Dep: 08/06/1962. | ||
04/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1962. Dep: 29/10/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60109 from Kings Cross (34A) |