|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1924 | 09/08/1924 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1925 | 20/02/1926 | 109 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1927 | 25/06/1927 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1928 | 31/05/1928 | 99 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1929 | 01/06/1929 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 7693 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5224 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1930 | 29/12/1930 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1932 | 15/03/1932 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1932 | 12/07/1932 | 1 day | Light Repair | Wheel spoke welding |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1933 | 21/02/1933 | 1 day | Light Repair | Wheel spoke welding |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1933 | 21/06/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1934 | 13/10/1934 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1935 | 01/11/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7766 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1937 | 27/10/1937 | 2 days | Light Repair | Blow-down apparatus |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1938 | 05/08/1938 | 29 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1939 | 21/07/1939 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1940 | 15/02/1941 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1942 | 09/12/1942 | 35 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1944 | 16/01/1944 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1944 | 14/06/1944 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1946 | 16/02/1946 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7797 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1947 | 18/09/1947 | 59 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1949 | 11/08/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9984 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60044 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1950 | 30/08/1950 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1951 | 08/03/1951 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1952 | 01/02/1952 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1952 | 04/12/1952 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1954 | 26/04/1954 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1954 | 31/12/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1956 | 27/04/1956 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1956 | 10/05/1956 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1956 | 06/12/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1958 | 07/05/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1959 | 10/06/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1960 | 11/03/1960 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1960 | 05/11/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1961 | 30/08/1961 | 19 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1962 | 21/04/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1962 | 28/09/1962 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1963 | 12/03/1963 | 23 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196109 |
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/06/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2543, name: MELTON Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1598 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
04/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/08/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924. | ||
21/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
08/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926. | ||
04/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
20/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927. | ||
23/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/02/1928. Dep: 31/05/1928. | ||
26/03/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5269 | ||
17/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1929. Dep: 01/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7693 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5224 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
19/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
12/06/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
30/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1930. Dep: 29/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
28/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1932. Dep: 15/03/1932. | ||
12/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/07/1932. Dep: 12/07/1932. Work undertaken: Wheel spoke welding |
||
21/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1933. Dep: 21/02/1933. Work undertaken: Wheel spoke welding |
||
28/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1933. Dep: 21/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
06/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934. | ||
18/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1935. Dep: 01/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7766 (Diagram 94) |
||
08/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. | ||
26/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1937. Dep: 27/10/1937. Work undertaken: Blow-down apparatus |
||
08/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/07/1938. Dep: 05/08/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 5580 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
09/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1939. Dep: 21/07/1939. | ||
30/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1940. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
05/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1942. Dep: 09/12/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
09/12/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
01/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1944. Dep: 16/01/1944. | ||
12/03/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 14/06/1944. | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
22/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 512 but not taken up | ||
09/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7797 (Diagram 94) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 44 | ||
22/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/07/1947. Dep: 18/09/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
09/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1949. Dep: 11/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9984 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60044 |
||
23/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
22/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1950. Dep: 30/08/1950. | ||
05/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1951. Dep: 08/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1952. Dep: 01/02/1952. | ||
12/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 04/12/1952. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
04/12/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
18/12/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5274 | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 26/04/1954. | ||
21/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1954. Dep: 31/12/1954. | ||
27/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
25/03/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
03/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1956. Dep: 27/04/1956. | ||
04/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1956. Dep: 10/05/1956. | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
29/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1956. Dep: 06/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
28/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1958. Dep: 07/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
01/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
15/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10541 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/02/1960. Dep: 11/03/1960. | ||
05/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1960. Dep: 05/11/1960. | ||
12/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1961. Dep: 30/08/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
03/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1962. Dep: 21/04/1962. | ||
28/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1962. Dep: 28/09/1962. | ||
18/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1963. Dep: 12/03/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60044 from Kings Cross (34A) |