|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1925 | 15/08/1925 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1925 | 31/12/1925 | 81 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1926 | 09/10/1926 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1927 | 17/08/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/09/1927 | 03/12/1927 | 87 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1928 | 19/01/1928 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1928 | 24/01/1928 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1928 | 09/02/1928 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1928 | 16/08/1928 | 36 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1928 | 08/04/1929 | 109 days | General | Tender number 5228 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1929 | 12/10/1929 | 40 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1930 | 31/01/1931 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1931 | 05/03/1931 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1932 | 16/04/1932 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1932 | 17/06/1932 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1933 | 04/05/1933 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 8224 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1934 | 18/01/1935 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1935 | 15/08/1935 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1936 | 14/05/1936 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1937 | 14/05/1937 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1938 | 10/05/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1939 | 13/06/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1940 | 11/04/1940 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1940 | 26/10/1940 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1942 | 20/05/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1942 | 28/05/1942 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1943 | 16/09/1943 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1944 | 11/03/1944 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1944 | 08/09/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1945 | 28/11/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1946 | 28/09/1946 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1947 | 18/06/1947 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 13 days | Light Repair | Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60045 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9450 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/12/1949 | 19/01/1950 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1950 | 08/11/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1952 | 18/04/1952 | 33 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/10/1952 | 27/10/1952 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1953 | 28/10/1953 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1955 | 03/11/1955 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1957 | 02/08/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1957 | 17/01/1958 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1958 | 22/04/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1959 | 17/10/1959 | 20 days | Light Casual | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/12/1959 | 24/12/1959 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1960 | 05/03/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1960 | 03/06/1960 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1962 | 01/11/1962 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
19/09/1964 | Darlington MPD (Shed) | On shed-diesel bays: D5170/2, dead line: 69020, 90444/9; Roundhouse: D3228, D2706/31/2, D2318/36/40, D3229, DEPT87, 68011/37/43/7/50/3/60. Shed: 60024 ex works, 60036/45/808/84/5, 62001, 62002 ex works, 62003/43/4/8/64; 61030, 62368, 68010/4/46,151/4, 90011/4/98, 90361/556 ex works, 90688, 42405/77, 43050/6/7, 43102/29/40 and 63460 awaiting move to Stratford. | SLS/196410 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/07/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2544, name: LEMBERG Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1600 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
27/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1925. Dep: 15/08/1925. | ||
12/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1925. Dep: 31/12/1925. | ||
04/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1926. Dep: 09/10/1926. | ||
08/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1927. Dep: 17/08/1927. | ||
08/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/09/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8028 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
17/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 19/01/1928. | ||
20/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1928. Dep: 24/01/1928. | ||
06/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1928. Dep: 09/02/1928. | ||
12/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/07/1928. Dep: 16/08/1928. | ||
21/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1928. Dep: 08/04/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5228 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
03/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/09/1929. Dep: 12/10/1929. | ||
18/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1930. Dep: 31/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1931. Dep: 05/03/1931. | ||
17/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. | ||
13/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1932. Dep: 17/06/1932. | ||
02/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/03/1933. Dep: 04/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8224 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
05/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1934. Dep: 18/01/1935. | ||
08/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1935. Dep: 15/08/1935. | ||
13/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. | ||
28/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1936. Dep: 14/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
06/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
08/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 14/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
22/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8248 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1938. Dep: 10/05/1938. | ||
17/05/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
01/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1939. Dep: 13/06/1939. | ||
22/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 11/04/1940. | ||
16/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1940. Dep: 26/10/1940. | ||
23/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. | ||
08/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1942. Dep: 20/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8031 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
20/05/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
26/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1942. Dep: 28/05/1942. | ||
30/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1943. Dep: 16/09/1943. | ||
14/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944. | ||
21/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/08/1944. Dep: 08/09/1944. | ||
16/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1945. Dep: 28/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 513 but not taken up | ||
31/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 28/09/1946. | ||
03/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 45 | ||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 18/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Painted Experimental Blue/Purple with Red and Cream lining Renumbered to BR 60045 |
||
13/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9450 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1949. Dep: 19/01/1950. | ||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 08/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
08/11/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 18/04/1952. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1952. Dep: 27/10/1952. | ||
22/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 28/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
28/02/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
21/03/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 03/11/1955. | ||
13/11/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
27/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
22/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957. | ||
04/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1957. Dep: 17/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
14/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1958. Dep: 22/04/1958. | ||
04/05/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
16/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
28/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 17/10/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959. | ||
13/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960. | ||
02/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1960. Dep: 03/06/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1962. Dep: 01/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
02/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
15/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60045 from Darlington (51A) | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |