|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1926 | 29/05/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1927 | 29/04/1927 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1927 | 07/07/1927 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1928 | 06/06/1928 | 87 days | General | Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1929 | 17/07/1929 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1930 | 15/03/1930 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1931 | 09/05/1931 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 58 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1933 | 23/03/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1933 | 31/10/1933 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1934 | 07/07/1934 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1936 | 23/07/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1937 | 12/06/1937 | 47 days | General | Tender number 5644 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1939 | 06/01/1939 | 4 days | Light Repair | Blow-down apparatus and rubber fairing put on |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1941 | 23/08/1941 | 52 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1943 | 14/03/1943 | 33 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1945 | 29/05/1945 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1946 | 13/07/1946 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9510 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 46 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1946 | 15/11/1946 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1947 | 13/11/1947 | 43 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1949 | 05/08/1949 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 9983 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60046 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1950 | 22/09/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1951 | 01/06/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1952 | 29/10/1952 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1954 | 20/08/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1954 | 30/08/1954 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1955 | 08/02/1955 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1956 | 21/12/1956 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1958 | 08/08/1958 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1959 | 06/01/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1960 | 29/09/1960 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1961 | 04/02/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1961 | 07/12/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1962 | 22/11/1962 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/08/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2545, name: DIAMOND JUBILEE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1601 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
03/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
20/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 29/05/1926. | ||
14/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1927. Dep: 29/04/1927. | ||
02/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 07/07/1927. | ||
12/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1928. Dep: 06/06/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
07/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
24/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1929. Dep: 17/07/1929. | ||
30/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1930. Dep: 15/03/1930. | ||
06/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
01/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. | ||
02/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1933. Dep: 23/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
05/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1933. Dep: 31/10/1933. | ||
28/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1934. Dep: 07/07/1934. | ||
28/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. | ||
11/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1936. Dep: 23/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7703 (Diagram 94) |
||
27/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5644 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
19/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. | ||
03/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1939. Dep: 06/01/1939. Work undertaken: Blow-down apparatus and rubber fairing put on |
||
08/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. | ||
03/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/07/1941. Dep: 23/08/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 14/03/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
30/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
08/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1945. Dep: 29/05/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 514 but not taken up | ||
27/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1946. Dep: 13/07/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9510 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 46 |
||
28/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 15/11/1946. | ||
02/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
05/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1949. Dep: 05/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9983 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60046 |
||
18/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1950. Dep: 22/09/1950. | ||
29/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1951. Dep: 01/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
23/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/09/1952. Dep: 29/10/1952. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
29/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
21/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) |
||
23/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/08/1954. Dep: 30/08/1954. | ||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 08/02/1955. | ||
03/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1956. Dep: 21/12/1956. | ||
03/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1958. Dep: 08/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
01/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1959. Dep: 06/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29306 (Diagram 107) |
||
30/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1960. Dep: 29/09/1960. | ||
17/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/01/1961. Dep: 04/02/1961. | ||
20/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 07/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
29/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/10/1962. Dep: 22/11/1962. | ||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60046 from Grantham (34F) |