|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1925 | 08/01/1925 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1925 | 03/06/1925 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1925 | 27/03/1926 | 108 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1926 | 18/09/1926 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1927 | 29/01/1927 | 18 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 111 days | General | Boiler number 7784 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1928 | 26/04/1928 | 24 days | Light Repair | Corridor tender put on Tender number 5327 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1929 | 14/04/1929 | 56 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1930 | 18/07/1930 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 7694 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1933 | 22/07/1933 | 38 days | General | Tender type change Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1934 | 19/07/1934 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1935 | 31/10/1935 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1936 | 14/01/1937 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1938 | 25/02/1938 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1939 | 08/07/1939 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1941 | 08/02/1941 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1941 | 13/12/1941 | 13 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1942 | 19/09/1942 | 43 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1944 | 13/05/1944 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1945 | 26/07/1945 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1946 | 16/05/1946 | 58 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9123 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 48 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1947 | 23/06/1947 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 9573 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1948 | 11/11/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60048 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1950 | 15/09/1950 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 10542 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1953 | 19/02/1953 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1954 | 21/09/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1955 | 24/05/1955 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1956 | 17/08/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1957 | 17/04/1957 | 21 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1958 | 09/05/1958 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1959 | 10/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1959 | 29/05/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1960 | 02/07/1960 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1961 | 18/03/1961 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1961 | 15/12/1961 | 31 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1962 | 14/04/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1963 | 15/02/1963 | 33 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Boiler Park) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/08/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2547, name: DONCASTER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1603 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
02/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/01/1925. Dep: 08/01/1925. | ||
22/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1925. Dep: 03/06/1925. | ||
10/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1925. Dep: 27/03/1926. | ||
23/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/07/1926. Dep: 18/09/1926. | ||
12/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/01/1927. Dep: 29/01/1927. | ||
11/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
27/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
07/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7784 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
03/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1928. Dep: 26/04/1928. Work undertaken: Corridor tender put on Tender number 5327 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
26/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
02/05/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5256 | ||
06/05/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5327 | ||
18/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1929. Dep: 14/04/1929. | ||
03/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1930. Dep: 18/07/1930. | ||
27/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. | ||
11/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7694 (Diagram 94) |
||
15/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933. Work undertaken: Tender type change Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
08/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1934. Dep: 19/07/1934. | ||
10/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1935. Dep: 31/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
31/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1936. Dep: 14/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
25/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1938. Dep: 25/02/1938. | ||
19/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
08/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941. | ||
01/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/12/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 5566 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
08/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1942. Dep: 19/09/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
19/09/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
03/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1944. Dep: 13/05/1944. | ||
05/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1945. Dep: 26/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 516 but not taken up | ||
20/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/03/1946. Dep: 16/05/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9123 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 48 |
||
16/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1947. Dep: 23/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9573 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
02/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 11/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60048 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
06/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1950. Dep: 15/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10542 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
15/09/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
07/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
19/09/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
17/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1953. Dep: 19/02/1953. | ||
15/11/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1954. Dep: 21/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27047 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/04/1955. Dep: 24/05/1955. | ||
04/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1956. Dep: 17/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957. | ||
03/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. | ||
12/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1958. Dep: 09/05/1958. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 10/02/1959. | ||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 29/05/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
26/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 02/07/1960. | ||
28/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/02/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. | ||
15/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 15/12/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
06/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1962. Dep: 14/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27083 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
14/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/01/1963. Dep: 15/02/1963. | ||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60048 from Grantham (34F) |