|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1925 | 19/03/1925 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1925 | 17/10/1925 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1926 | 17/04/1926 | 101 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 58 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1928 | 27/10/1928 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1929 | 01/03/1929 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1929 | 24/04/1929 | 20 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1931 | 21/03/1931 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1932 | 27/02/1932 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1932 | 25/01/1933 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1933 | 02/06/1933 | 26 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1934 | 13/06/1934 | 55 days | General | Tender number 5289 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1935 | 21/06/1935 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1936 | 28/05/1936 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1936 | 21/08/1936 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1937 | 13/05/1937 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7698 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1938 | 20/04/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1939 | 25/03/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1940 | 19/08/1940 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1940 | 14/10/1940 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1942 | 19/03/1942 | 49 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1942 | 10/06/1942 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1943 | 15/12/1943 | 30 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9446 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1945 | 13/09/1945 | 71 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1947 | 03/04/1947 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 9115 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1948 | 03/02/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E50 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1948 | 18/08/1948 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60050 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1949 | 27/07/1949 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1951 | 04/05/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1952 | 26/09/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27081 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1953 | 08/05/1953 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1954 | 05/08/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1954 | 15/10/1954 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1956 | 08/03/1956 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1956 | 21/09/1956 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1957 | 29/11/1957 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1958 | 24/10/1958 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1959 | 20/04/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1959 | 17/06/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1959 | 15/10/1959 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1960 | 02/06/1960 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1960 | 31/12/1960 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1961 | 19/10/1961 | 66 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1962 | 29/09/1962 | 30 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) | Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
25/10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2549, name: PERSIMMON Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1605 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
16/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1925. Dep: 19/03/1925. | ||
01/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/07/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. | ||
03/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925. | ||
07/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1926. Dep: 17/04/1926. | ||
27/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
16/07/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
30/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
22/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1929. Dep: 01/03/1929. | ||
05/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 05/04/1929. Dep: 24/04/1929. | ||
07/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
07/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1931. Dep: 21/03/1931. | ||
11/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1932. Dep: 27/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
27/03/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5264 | ||
05/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1932. Dep: 25/01/1933. | ||
08/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/05/1933. Dep: 02/06/1933. | ||
20/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1934. Dep: 13/06/1934. Work undertaken: Tender number 5289 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
13/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. | ||
05/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1935. Dep: 21/06/1935. | ||
20/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1936. Dep: 28/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7789 (Diagram 94) |
||
10/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1936. Dep: 21/08/1936. | ||
08/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1937. Dep: 13/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7698 (Diagram 94) |
||
03/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. | ||
20/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1938. Dep: 20/04/1938. | ||
18/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 25/03/1939. | ||
28/02/1940 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5259 | ||
19/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. | ||
12/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1940. Dep: 19/08/1940. | ||
23/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1940. Dep: 14/10/1940. | ||
05/01/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
30/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1942. Dep: 19/03/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
19/03/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
30/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1942. Dep: 10/06/1942. | ||
10/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/11/1943. Dep: 15/12/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9446 (Diagram 94A) |
||
05/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1945. Dep: 13/09/1945. | ||
19/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 518 | ||
08/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 50 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
09/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1947. Dep: 03/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9115 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
03/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 03/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E50 |
||
27/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
16/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
22/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1948. Dep: 18/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60050 |
||
13/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. | ||
03/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
05/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
29/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1949. Dep: 27/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
27/07/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 04/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27045 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27081 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 08/05/1953. | ||
02/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1954. Dep: 05/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) |
||
23/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1954. Dep: 15/10/1954. | ||
03/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
09/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
26/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1956. Dep: 08/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27084 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
24/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
23/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1956. Dep: 21/09/1956. | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 29/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
10/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/03/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. | ||
08/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/10/1958. Dep: 24/10/1958. | ||
07/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/04/1959. Dep: 20/04/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
06/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/06/1959. Dep: 17/06/1959. | ||
28/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1959. Dep: 15/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29272 (Diagram 107) |
||
10/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1960. Dep: 02/06/1960. | ||
13/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/12/1960. Dep: 31/12/1960. | ||
15/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1961. Dep: 19/10/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
31/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/08/1962. Dep: 29/09/1962. | ||
11/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60050 from New England (34E) |