|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1924 | 02/01/1925 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1925 | 12/01/1925 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1925 | 16/03/1925 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1926 | 25/09/1926 | 88 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1927 | 02/02/1928 | 106 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1928 | 20/12/1928 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/09/1929 | 23/11/1929 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1930 | 23/10/1930 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1930 | 14/01/1931 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1931 | 04/07/1931 | 48 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1932 | 16/06/1932 | 66 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1933 | 12/07/1933 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1934 | 16/11/1934 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1935 | 09/11/1935 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1936 | 04/11/1936 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1936 | 17/11/1936 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1938 | 03/05/1938 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1938 | 30/11/1938 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 37 days | General | Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1943 | 22/04/1943 | 52 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1946 | 05/04/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9484 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 520 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1946 | 15/10/1946 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1947 | 07/03/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1947 | 24/06/1947 | 53 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1948 | 07/10/1948 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 60052 |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1949 | 22/03/1949 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1949 | 18/05/1949 | 38 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1950 | 21/07/1950 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 10543 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1952 | 09/04/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1953 | 03/09/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5288 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1955 | 13/04/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1957 | 03/05/1957 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1958 | 08/07/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1958 | 20/11/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1960 | 11/03/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1962 | 12/10/1962 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 29294 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 19/03/1965 | 11/05/1965 | 54 days | Light Casual | |||
Inverurie Works | 03/08/1965 | 26/08/1965 | 24 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Names for 'A.2' Class: 518 Tehran, 519 Honeyway, 520 Owen. Tudor, 521 Watling Street, and probably Straight Deal, Sun Castle, Herring Bone, Sugar Palm and Sun Chariot on 522-526. No. 525 will be Mr. Peppercorn's first 'A.2/3.' | SLS/194704 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2551, name: PRINCE PALATINE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1607 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
29/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1924. Dep: 02/01/1925. | ||
09/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1925. Dep: 12/01/1925. | ||
09/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
11/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1925. Dep: 16/03/1925. | ||
30/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1926. Dep: 25/09/1926. | ||
20/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1927. Dep: 02/02/1928. | ||
08/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1928. Dep: 20/12/1928. | ||
30/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1929. Dep: 23/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
21/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1930. Dep: 23/10/1930. | ||
29/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1930. Dep: 14/01/1931. | ||
18/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931. | ||
12/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/04/1932. Dep: 16/06/1932. | ||
10/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1933. Dep: 12/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7774 (Diagram 94) |
||
10/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1934. Dep: 16/11/1934. | ||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. | ||
01/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1936. Dep: 04/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
12/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1936. Dep: 17/11/1936. | ||
27/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. | ||
06/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1938. Dep: 03/05/1938. | ||
25/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1938. Dep: 30/11/1938. | ||
02/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
08/08/1941 | Modification | Diagram 94HP number 8084 boiler fitted | ||
08/08/1941 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5229 | ||
02/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 22/04/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
22/04/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
29/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. | ||
05/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1946. Dep: 05/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9484 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 520 |
||
11/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 52 | ||
18/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/09/1946. Dep: 15/10/1946. | ||
10/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/02/1947. Dep: 07/03/1947. | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 24/06/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
26/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/08/1948. Dep: 07/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60052 |
||
12/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 22/03/1949. | ||
11/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1949. Dep: 18/05/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
22/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
08/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 21/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10543 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/04/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 03/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27064 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5288 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
04/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
05/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 13/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
22/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1957. Dep: 03/05/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
05/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
30/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 08/07/1958. | ||
20/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 20/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
30/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 11/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) |
||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
18/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1962. Dep: 12/10/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29294 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
09/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
02/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
25/08/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
19/03/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/03/1965. Dep: 11/05/1965. | ||
03/08/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1965. Dep: 26/08/1965. | ||
17/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60052 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
20/06/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |