|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1926 | 21/08/1926 | 65 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1927 | 12/03/1927 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1927 | 25/02/1928 | 107 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 59 days | General | Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1929 | 06/09/1929 | 22 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1930 | 06/06/1930 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1930 | 20/12/1930 | 30 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1931 | 24/09/1931 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1932 | 09/12/1932 | 56 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/11/1933 | 15/12/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/09/1934 | 20/09/1934 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1935 | 12/02/1935 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1936 | 23/06/1936 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1938 | 29/04/1938 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1939 | 02/06/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1940 | 31/08/1940 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1942 | 27/06/1942 | 22 days | Heavy Intermediate | Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1944 | 08/11/1944 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1945 | 17/02/1945 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1945 | 11/05/1945 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1946 | 16/03/1946 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 521 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1947 | 17/10/1947 | 55 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/04/1950 | 12/04/1950 | 7 days | No repairs | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9569 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1951 | 06/03/1951 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1952 | 12/05/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1955 | 24/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1955 | 04/07/1955 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1957 | 20/02/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1957 | 29/03/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1957 | 15/10/1957 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1958 | 12/11/1958 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1959 | 21/10/1959 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1961 | 07/04/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1961 | 15/09/1961 | 4 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Names for 'A.2' Class: 518 Tehran, 519 Honeyway, 520 Owen. Tudor, 521 Watling Street, and probably Straight Deal, Sun Castle, Herring Bone, Sugar Palm and Sun Chariot on 522-526. No. 525 will be Mr. Peppercorn's first 'A.2/3.' | SLS/194704 |
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/11/1924 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5262 | ||
11/12/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2552, name: SANSOVINO Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1608 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
18/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1926. Dep: 21/08/1926. | ||
03/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1927. Dep: 12/03/1927. | ||
11/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1927. Dep: 25/02/1928. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
07/06/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5329 | ||
10/08/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5228 | ||
07/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
30/06/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5265 | ||
16/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1929. Dep: 06/09/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5274 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
27/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1930. Dep: 06/06/1930. | ||
21/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/11/1930. Dep: 20/12/1930. | ||
30/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1931. Dep: 24/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
15/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 09/12/1932. | ||
03/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1933. Dep: 15/12/1933. | ||
05/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/09/1934. Dep: 20/09/1934. | ||
04/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1935. Dep: 12/02/1935. | ||
29/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1936. Dep: 23/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7647 (Diagram 94) |
||
25/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. | ||
17/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1938. Dep: 29/04/1938. | ||
20/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1939. Dep: 02/06/1939. | ||
14/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
20/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 31/08/1940. | ||
06/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
02/09/1943 | Modification | Diagram b94HP number 8079 boiler fitted | ||
02/09/1943 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5570 | ||
27/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1944. Dep: 08/11/1944. | ||
26/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1945. Dep: 17/02/1945. | ||
10/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1945. Dep: 11/05/1945. | ||
05/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 16/03/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 1st) number 521 |
||
30/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 53 | ||
24/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1947. Dep: 17/10/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
17/10/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
05/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60053 | ||
07/02/1949 | Modification | Diagram 94A number 9121 boiler fitted | ||
07/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
22/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
31/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
04/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 06/04/1950. Dep: 12/04/1950. | ||
01/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9569 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
16/06/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
20/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 06/03/1951. | ||
07/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1952. Dep: 12/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27077 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
12/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
01/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
02/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
21/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 24/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) |
||
16/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 04/07/1955. | ||
05/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1957. Dep: 20/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
27/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1957. Dep: 29/03/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
27/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1957. Dep: 15/10/1957. | ||
04/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 12/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27076 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
07/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
18/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1959. Dep: 21/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1961. Dep: 07/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27049 (Diagram 94A) |
||
18/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 15/09/1961. | ||
17/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
21/04/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
16/05/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
27/05/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60053 from Heaton (52B) |