|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1925 | 30/01/1925 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1925 | 13/03/1925 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1926 | 21/01/1926 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/11/1926 | 29/01/1927 | 72 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1927 | 03/11/1927 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1928 | 08/06/1928 | 89 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1929 | 16/07/1929 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1930 | 14/06/1930 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7780 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1931 | 31/12/1931 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1932 | 22/07/1932 | 61 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1933 | 25/10/1933 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1934 | 24/11/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7792 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1935 | 15/11/1935 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1936 | 06/06/1936 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1936 | 14/12/1936 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1938 | 23/04/1938 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1938 | 16/02/1939 | 49 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1940 | 05/06/1940 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/02/1941 | 01/03/1941 | 17 days | Light Repair | After collision in Marylebone tunnel |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1942 | 03/06/1942 | 42 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1943 | 06/05/1943 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1944 | 23/02/1944 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 41 days | General | Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1947 | 25/07/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9574 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1947 | 14/11/1947 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1948 | 04/06/1948 | 20 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60055 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1949 | 21/04/1949 | 50 days | General | Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1949 | 17/01/1950 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1950 | 04/08/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1950 | 10/08/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1951 | 05/04/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1951 | 28/11/1951 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/08/1953 | 06/10/1953 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1955 | 22/06/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1956 | 26/01/1957 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1959 | 28/10/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/04/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1960 | 25/11/1960 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted in Works during April included Nos. 13, 17, 60033/34, 56, 69, 91, 60527, 802/07/96, 911/28/34/54, while those ex the Paint Shop included Nos. 60004/10/27/28/55 an 60100. As yet there is not any sign of either the new blue or green paint being used. | SLS/194906 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/12/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2554, name: WOOLWINDER Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1610 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
19/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1925. Dep: 30/01/1925. | ||
05/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1925. Dep: 13/03/1925. | ||
04/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 21/01/1926. | ||
19/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1926. Dep: 29/01/1927. | ||
29/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
12/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1927. Dep: 03/11/1927. | ||
12/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1928. Dep: 08/06/1928. | ||
31/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1929. Dep: 16/07/1929. | ||
15/07/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
06/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
10/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
25/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
27/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7780 (Diagram 94) |
||
03/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 03/12/1931. Dep: 31/12/1931. | ||
27/03/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5258 | ||
23/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1932. Dep: 22/07/1932. | ||
07/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1933. Dep: 25/10/1933. | ||
17/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1934. Dep: 24/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7792 (Diagram 94) |
||
01/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1935. Dep: 15/11/1935. | ||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 06/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) |
||
02/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/12/1936. Dep: 14/12/1936. | ||
02/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
12/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1938. Dep: 23/04/1938. | ||
30/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1938. Dep: 16/02/1939. | ||
18/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/12/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. | ||
29/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1940. Dep: 05/06/1940. | ||
13/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941. Work undertaken: After collision in Marylebone tunnel |
||
23/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/04/1942. Dep: 03/06/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
22/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
08/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/04/1943. Dep: 06/05/1943. | ||
02/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
25/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1944. Dep: 23/02/1944. | ||
16/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. Work undertaken: Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 523 but not taken up | ||
28/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 55 | ||
04/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1947. Dep: 25/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9574 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
25/07/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
24/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947. | ||
16/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1948. Dep: 04/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60055 |
||
03/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 21/04/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
25/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/12/1949. Dep: 17/01/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1950. Dep: 04/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10544 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
04/08/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
06/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1950. Dep: 10/08/1950. | ||
04/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1951. Dep: 05/04/1951. | ||
21/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1951. Dep: 28/11/1951. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
28/11/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
17/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1953. Dep: 06/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
30/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
22/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1955. Dep: 22/06/1955. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
11/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1956. Dep: 26/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) |
||
05/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29281 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
24/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1959. Dep: 28/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107) |
||
12/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. | ||
31/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1960. Dep: 25/11/1960. | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
04/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60055 from Kings Cross (34A) |