|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 13 days | Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/11/1926 | 02/02/1927 | 75 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 114 days | General | Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1929 | 21/06/1929 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1929 | 31/01/1930 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/03/1930 | 19/03/1930 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1930 | 06/11/1930 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7776 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1931 | 02/11/1931 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1932 | 04/06/1932 | 59 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1932 | 21/02/1933 | 64 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1934 | 17/02/1934 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1935 | 15/02/1935 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1935 | 10/07/1935 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1936 | 22/02/1936 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1936 | 03/12/1936 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1937 | 22/12/1937 | 37 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1938 | 11/05/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1938 | 19/01/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1940 | 17/05/1940 | 2 days | Light Repair | Bogie springs |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1940 | 09/08/1940 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1941 | 12/12/1941 | 29 days | General | Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/12/1942 | 31/12/1942 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1943 | 13/08/1943 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1945 | 21/06/1945 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 45 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1948 | 16/06/1948 | 43 days | General | Tender number 5284 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60057 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1949 | 28/07/1949 | 49 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 31 days | General | Tender number 5281 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1952 | 10/10/1952 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
R & W Hawthorn | 25/01/1954 | 05/02/1954 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1954 | 22/04/1954 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1955 | 17/09/1955 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1957 | 02/04/1957 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1957 | 25/10/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/03/1958 | 23/04/1958 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/07/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 72 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1959 | 27/01/1960 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/12/1960 | 15/12/1960 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1961 | 21/09/1961 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1963 | 09/05/1963 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1963 | 01/08/1963 | 28 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/02/1963 | Glasgow - Aberdeen Pacific workings | The last regular workings of L.N.E.R Pacifics - during December and January, Ferryhill usually used 60009 an 60011 on the 7-10 a.m. to Glasgow (back with the 5-30 p.m.) but 60002/4/57/97/522/37 also appeared, whilst the standbies were 60527 or 60955 (rarely required). 60537 appeared on 25th January-one month after its 'withdrawal'! ' St. Rollox usually used 60027* on the 8-25 a.m. to Aberdeen (back with the 5-15 p.m.) with as standby 60031 or 60090, whilst 60012 was borrowed from Haymarket for most of November and December; other locomotives to appear were 60004/512/955/72 an 73153. * 60027 was in Grangemouth shed for repair on 11th February. | SLS/196303 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Crimpsall) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/01/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5266 | ||
18/02/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2556, name: ORMONDE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1612 Allocated to Grantham (GRA) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. | ||
20/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 02/02/1927. | ||
03/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5329 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
01/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
07/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
07/06/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5262 | ||
08/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1929. Dep: 21/06/1929. | ||
10/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1929. Dep: 31/01/1930. | ||
12/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/03/1930. Dep: 19/03/1930. | ||
17/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1930. Dep: 06/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7776 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
24/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1931. Dep: 02/11/1931. | ||
07/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/04/1932. Dep: 04/06/1932. | ||
20/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1932. Dep: 21/02/1933. | ||
04/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1934. Dep: 17/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) |
||
10/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1935. Dep: 15/02/1935. | ||
28/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1935. Dep: 10/07/1935. | ||
08/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. | ||
19/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1936. Dep: 03/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
16/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1937. Dep: 22/12/1937. | ||
11/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/05/1938. Dep: 11/05/1938. | ||
15/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1938. Dep: 19/01/1939. | ||
09/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
15/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
02/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
16/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1940. Dep: 17/05/1940. Work undertaken: Bogie springs |
||
08/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1940. Dep: 09/08/1940. | ||
04/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
14/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 12/12/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
12/12/1941 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
21/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/12/1942. Dep: 31/12/1942. | ||
07/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
24/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
29/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1943. Dep: 13/08/1943. | ||
04/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1945. Dep: 21/06/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 525 but not taken up | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 57 | ||
28/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/11/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27019 (Diagram 94HP) To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
11/01/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
05/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1948. Dep: 16/06/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 5284 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60057 |
||
10/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1949. Dep: 28/07/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 5281 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 10/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
10/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
25/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - R & W Hawthorn (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1954. Dep: 05/02/1954. | ||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 22/04/1954. | ||
02/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1955. Dep: 17/09/1955. | ||
22/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 02/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) |
||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 25/10/1957. | ||
18/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/03/1958. Dep: 23/04/1958. | ||
10/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
09/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1959. Dep: 27/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) |
||
13/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1960. Dep: 15/12/1960. | ||
23/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
15/05/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
27/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1961. Dep: 21/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29323 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
13/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
08/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1963. Dep: 09/05/1963. | ||
05/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1963. Dep: 01/08/1963. | ||
28/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60057 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Carmyle |