|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1925 | 23/03/1925 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1926 | 31/12/1926 | 66 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1928 | 08/05/1928 | 113 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1928 | 03/11/1928 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1929 | 11/05/1929 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 7773 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5269 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1929 | 11/01/1930 | 41 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1930 | 15/05/1930 | 58 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1931 | 04/05/1931 | 47 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1932 | 21/05/1932 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1933 | 21/06/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7769 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5270 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1934 | 14/07/1934 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1935 | 14/06/1935 | 46 days | General | Tender repair only |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1936 | 18/07/1936 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1936 | 27/08/1936 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/05/1937 | 17/06/1937 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1938 | 08/06/1938 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/05/1939 | 15/07/1939 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1940 | 31/07/1940 | 31 days | General | Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1942 | 23/04/1942 | 35 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1944 | 13/04/1944 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1945 | 08/12/1945 | 46 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1947 | 20/04/1947 | 49 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1947 | 13/11/1947 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1949 | 10/03/1949 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60058 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1949 | 17/03/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1951 | 14/02/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1953 | 30/03/1953 | 62 days | General | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/08/1954 | 21/09/1954 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1956 | 03/05/1956 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1957 | 17/04/1957 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1958 | 03/10/1958 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1960 | 12/08/1960 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1960 | 30/12/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
19/03/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2388/9, E3059-64. Stripping Road: D2402, D3489, 13252, 60040, 61144, 61227, 61828, 62013, 63954, 68522, 68869/90, 68916, 69572; Scrap Yard: 64729/87, with 64746, 68875, 68979, 69586 being cut-up. Crimpsall: 60047/90, 61066, 62061. Outside Crimpsall: 60026, 60532, 61971. Erecting Shop: 13326, D3452, D5564, D8214, D9002, 43092, 43151, 60014/28/53/8, 60102/33/8, 61066/73, 61819/32/43/89, 61939, 62009, 63949/68, 70039, 76032. Outside Erecting Shop: D2400, 60128, 68925. Weigh House: D336. Outside Weigh House: 61950. Paint Shop: D320/37, D2387, D5690/1, D6712, D9000, E3058, 60041, 60118/36, 60529, 61835, 73096. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196105 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/02/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2557, name: BLAIR ATHOL Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1613 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
17/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1925. Dep: 23/03/1925. | ||
25/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
27/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926. | ||
17/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 08/05/1928. | ||
22/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1928. Dep: 03/11/1928. | ||
22/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7773 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5269 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
02/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/12/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930. | ||
19/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/03/1930. Dep: 15/05/1930. | ||
19/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1931. Dep: 04/05/1931. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
11/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/04/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932. | ||
28/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1933. Dep: 21/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7769 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5270 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
08/04/1934 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5269 | ||
23/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934. | ||
30/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1935. Dep: 14/06/1935. Work undertaken: Tender repair only |
||
10/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
20/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/08/1936. Dep: 27/08/1936. | ||
05/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1937. Dep: 17/06/1937. | ||
27/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7767 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
25/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
01/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1940. Dep: 31/07/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 5279 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
18/08/1941 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5271 | ||
20/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1942. Dep: 23/04/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
23/04/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
15/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
16/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. | ||
29/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
07/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1944. Dep: 13/04/1944. | ||
24/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/10/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8251 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 526 but not taken up | ||
07/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 58 | ||
03/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1947. Dep: 20/04/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
20/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
19/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1947. Dep: 13/11/1947. | ||
26/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1949. Dep: 10/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8250 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60058 |
||
14/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949. | ||
01/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1951. Dep: 14/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27029 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
28/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 30/03/1953. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
30/03/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
19/12/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5289 | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
10/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1954. Dep: 21/09/1954. | ||
16/02/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5643 | ||
10/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1956. Dep: 03/05/1956. | ||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) |
||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
21/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1958. Dep: 03/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
16/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960. | ||
16/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 30/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
||
17/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
24/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
19/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60058 from Heaton (52B) |