|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 30/08/1926 | 13/11/1926 | 76 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1927 | 21/01/1927 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1927 | 23/12/1927 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1928 | 15/03/1928 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1928 | 17/11/1928 | 79 days | General | Diamond soot blower Boiler number 7698 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1929 | 28/05/1929 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1930 | 20/12/1930 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/03/1931 | 16/04/1931 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1931 | 06/11/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1932 | 23/07/1932 | 45 days | Heavy | Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1933 | 14/08/1933 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1934 | 16/06/1934 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1935 | 21/06/1935 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 7770 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1937 | 26/06/1937 | 36 days | General | Tender number 5645 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1938 | 26/04/1938 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1938 | 19/09/1938 | 7 days | Light Repair | Speed recorder for G.C. line |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1939 | 11/11/1939 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1940 | 11/12/1940 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5281 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/06/1942 | 25/07/1942 | 36 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1942 | 29/12/1942 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1943 | 28/01/1944 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1945 | 16/10/1945 | 65 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1946 | 14/12/1946 | 41 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1947 | 26/11/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1948 | 08/07/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60059 |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 9986 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1950 | 15/12/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5284 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1952 | 08/08/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/06/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 4 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1954 | 15/07/1954 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1956 | 19/01/1957 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1958 | 17/07/1958 | 11 days | Light Casual | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1958 | 02/01/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1959 | 22/07/1959 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1960 | 30/04/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1960 | 01/12/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/07/1961 | 29/09/1961 | 64 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1962 | 10/10/1962 | 38 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed : D2398, D3446, 60059, 60132, 61098, 61196, 63922. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/02/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5268 | ||
25/03/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2558, name: TRACERY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1614 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
17/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
30/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1926. Dep: 13/11/1926. | ||
18/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/01/1927. Dep: 21/01/1927. | ||
17/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1927. Dep: 23/12/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7701 (Diagram 94) |
||
27/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1928. Dep: 15/03/1928. | ||
31/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1928. Dep: 17/11/1928. Work undertaken: Diamond soot blower Boiler number 7698 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
27/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1929. Dep: 28/05/1929. | ||
05/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. | ||
31/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1930. Dep: 20/12/1930. | ||
26/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1931. Dep: 16/04/1931. | ||
18/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1931. Dep: 06/11/1931. | ||
09/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/06/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7777 (Diagram 94) |
||
30/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1933. Dep: 14/08/1933. | ||
25/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934. | ||
15/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1935. Dep: 21/06/1935. | ||
23/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7770 (Diagram 94) |
||
22/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5645 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
26/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1938. Dep: 26/04/1938. | ||
02/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
13/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1938. Dep: 19/09/1938. Work undertaken: Speed recorder for G.C. line |
||
19/09/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 11/11/1939. | ||
05/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1940. Dep: 11/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7772 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5281 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
20/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
25/07/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 29/12/1942. | ||
29/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
29/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1943. Dep: 28/01/1944. | ||
16/04/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
24/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
13/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 16/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 527 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 59 | ||
04/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
12/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1947. Dep: 26/11/1947. | ||
24/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1948. Dep: 08/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60059 |
||
26/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9986 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 15/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27018 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5284 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
03/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1952. Dep: 08/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
30/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/06/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. | ||
21/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1954. Dep: 15/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
13/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
18/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1956. Dep: 19/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27073 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
07/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/07/1958. Dep: 17/07/1958. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
12/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1958. Dep: 02/01/1959. | ||
08/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1959. Dep: 22/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27075 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1960. Dep: 30/04/1960. | ||
09/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1960. Dep: 01/12/1960. | ||
28/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1961. Dep: 29/09/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
03/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 10/10/1962. | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60059 from Kings Cross (34A) |