|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1925 | 01/08/1925 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1927 | 27/05/1927 | 74 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/09/1928 | 05/12/1928 | 73 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1929 | 25/01/1930 | 51 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1930 | 29/01/1931 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1931 | 11/12/1931 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1932 | 21/01/1933 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1933 | 25/01/1934 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1934 | 06/11/1934 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1935 | 31/01/1935 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1935 | 07/11/1935 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1935 | 10/12/1935 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1936 | 01/08/1936 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1937 | 03/07/1937 | 37 days | General | Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1939 | 15/07/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1939 | 20/12/1939 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1940 | 13/04/1940 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1940 | 28/12/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1942 | 23/08/1942 | 40 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1943 | 19/08/1943 | 27 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1944 | 06/05/1944 | 41 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8781 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/07/1945 | 03/08/1945 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/12/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1945 | 30/12/1945 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1947 | 27/04/1947 | 42 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1948 | 20/11/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 8779 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60061 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1950 | 02/11/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27008 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1952 | 26/08/1952 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1953 | 30/01/1953 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1954 | 26/03/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27005 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1955 | 14/01/1955 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1955 | 29/07/1955 | 69 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1955 | 11/08/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1957 | 01/03/1957 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1957 | 09/03/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/12/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 20 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1958 | 23/10/1958 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1958 | 03/01/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1959 | 07/11/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1960 | 23/01/1960 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1960 | 27/09/1960 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1962 | 03/02/1962 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1962 | 19/05/1962 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1962 | 17/10/1962 | 31 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/03/1925 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5270 | ||
17/04/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2560, name: PRETTY POLLY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1616 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
23/05/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
24/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1925. Dep: 01/08/1925. | ||
15/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1927. Dep: 27/05/1927. | ||
24/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1928. Dep: 05/12/1928. | ||
25/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
06/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1929. Dep: 25/01/1930. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
25/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1930. Dep: 29/01/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7879 (Diagram 94) |
||
30/09/1931 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5258 | ||
27/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1931. Dep: 11/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) |
||
27/03/1932 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5229 | ||
24/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933. | ||
27/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1933. Dep: 25/01/1934. | ||
10/10/1934 | Modification | Diagram 94 number 7764 boiler fitted | ||
31/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/10/1934. Dep: 06/11/1934. | ||
25/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1935. Dep: 31/01/1935. | ||
18/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1935. Dep: 07/11/1935. | ||
03/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1935. Dep: 10/12/1935. | ||
24/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936. | ||
28/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7783 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
02/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. | ||
09/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1939. Dep: 20/12/1939. | ||
20/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940. | ||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. | ||
15/07/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1942. Dep: 23/08/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
23/08/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
10/10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
24/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1943. Dep: 19/08/1943. | ||
27/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 27/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8781 (Diagram 94A) |
||
01/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1945. Dep: 03/08/1945. | ||
15/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
10/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. | ||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 30/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 529 but not taken up | ||
17/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. | ||
18/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61 | ||
17/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1947. Dep: 27/04/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
27/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
11/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 20/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8779 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60061 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1950. Dep: 02/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27008 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
18/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
15/07/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
20/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1952. Dep: 26/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27024 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
26/08/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
22/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1953. Dep: 30/01/1953. | ||
22/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27005 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/08/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
17/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
09/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/01/1955. Dep: 14/01/1955. | ||
22/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1955. Dep: 29/07/1955. | ||
03/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955. | ||
07/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) |
||
04/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/03/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957. | ||
02/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/12/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) |
||
02/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 23/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
31/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 03/01/1959. | ||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
23/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1959. Dep: 07/11/1959. | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
07/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1960. Dep: 23/01/1960. | ||
12/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27012 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1960. Dep: 27/09/1960. | ||
03/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1962. Dep: 03/02/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27026 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
07/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962. | ||
17/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1962. Dep: 17/10/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60061 from Grantham (34F) |