|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/11/1926 | 05/02/1927 | 68 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1928 | 11/07/1928 | 62 days | General | Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 59 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1931 | 03/03/1931 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 7781 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1931 | 22/05/1931 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/02/1932 | 09/04/1932 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1932 | 10/06/1932 | 2 days | Light Repair | New tyres |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1933 | 25/03/1933 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 7695 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1933 | 23/12/1933 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1935 | 02/03/1935 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1936 | 19/03/1936 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/02/1937 | 25/03/1937 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5477 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1938 | 07/05/1938 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5643 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1939 | 30/01/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1941 | 15/02/1941 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 7773 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1942 | 26/09/1942 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 41 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1945 | 05/04/1945 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 42 days | General | Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1947 | 18/01/1947 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1947 | 05/11/1947 | 45 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1948 | 04/03/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E62 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1949 | 06/07/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9979 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60062 |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1950 | 19/09/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1951 | 13/04/1951 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1952 | 09/10/1952 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1953 | 27/01/1953 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1954 | 12/05/1954 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1955 | 11/01/1955 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1956 | 12/06/1956 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1957 | 15/10/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1958 | 28/08/1958 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1958 | 04/02/1959 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27005 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1960 | 07/04/1960 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1960 | 12/10/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1961 | 11/07/1961 | 37 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1962 | 15/02/1962 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1962 | 22/09/1962 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/06/1963 | 25/07/1963 | 39 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
20/07/1949 | Newcastle Station | On 20/7 'A.1' No. 60152 was noted painted in the new standard blue, with the crest on the tender, while on 21/7 'A.4' No. 60031 and 'A.3' 60062 were both seen painted in the same style, but without the crest. 'A.2' No. 60531 was observed on 21/7, painted in the new dark green livery, with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194909 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/05/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 256l, name: MINORU Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1617 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. | ||
09/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
30/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1926. Dep: 05/02/1927. | ||
27/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
11/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 11/07/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
03/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
02/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1931. Dep: 03/03/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7781 (Diagram 94) |
||
18/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1931. Dep: 22/05/1931. | ||
24/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1932. Dep: 09/04/1932. | ||
09/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1932. Dep: 10/06/1932. Work undertaken: New tyres |
||
01/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7695 (Diagram 94) |
||
06/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933. | ||
28/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935. | ||
06/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1936. Dep: 19/03/1936. | ||
09/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1937. Dep: 25/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5477 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
25/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1938. Dep: 07/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7771 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5643 (Streamlined Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 30/01/1939. | ||
03/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. | ||
25/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
08/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1941. Dep: 15/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7773 (Diagram 94) |
||
20/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
26/09/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
15/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27039 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/07/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
23/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1945. Dep: 05/04/1945. | ||
11/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
22/05/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 530 but not taken up | ||
13/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 5483 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
15/03/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Streamlined Non-Corridor number 5643 | ||
18/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 62 | ||
01/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1947. Dep: 18/01/1947. | ||
22/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1947. Dep: 05/11/1947. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
23/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1948. Dep: 04/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E62 |
||
30/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
05/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 06/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9979 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60062 |
||
06/07/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
12/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1950. Dep: 19/09/1950. | ||
09/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27040 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1952. Dep: 09/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27031 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/10/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
05/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1953. Dep: 27/01/1953. | ||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1954. Dep: 12/05/1954. | ||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 11/01/1955. | ||
16/02/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5289 | ||
02/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/03/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. | ||
03/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/05/1956. Dep: 12/06/1956. | ||
20/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
07/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/10/1957. Dep: 15/10/1957. | ||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 28/08/1958. | ||
23/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1958. Dep: 04/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27005 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. | ||
21/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1960. Dep: 07/04/1960. | ||
29/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1960. Dep: 12/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27021 (Diagram 94A) |
||
05/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1961. Dep: 11/07/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
15/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1962. Dep: 15/02/1962. | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 22/09/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29301 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
17/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/06/1963. Dep: 25/07/1963. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60062 from New England (34E) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |