|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 09/06/1925 | 25/06/1925 | 17 days | Light Repair | Painted for Centenary Procession |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/10/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 46 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1926 | 08/04/1926 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/08/1926 | 04/09/1926 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1926 | 18/02/1927 | 103 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1928 | 27/04/1928 | 39 days | Light Repair | Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1928 | 17/05/1928 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1929 | 18/01/1929 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/04/1929 | 31/05/1929 | 59 days | General | Variable F S A fitted Boiler number 7702 (Diagram 94) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/06/1929 | 21/06/1929 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/01/1930 | 08/02/1930 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1930 | 02/06/1930 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1930 | 17/06/1930 | 2 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5479 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/07/1930 | 11/07/1930 | 8 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/07/1930 | 01/08/1930 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/10/1930 | 02/12/1930 | 34 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1931 | 12/02/1931 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/07/1931 | 03/07/1931 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1931 | 28/08/1931 | 54 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1932 | 28/06/1932 | 49 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/08/1932 | 29/08/1932 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1933 | 27/04/1933 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 7788 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1934 | 19/01/1935 | 45 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1935 | 19/07/1935 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1936 | 10/10/1936 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1939 | 29/04/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/04/1940 | 04/05/1940 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1941 | 20/05/1941 | 44 days | General | Hudd A T C fitted Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1941 | 02/08/1941 | 13 days | Unclassified | Change of name Named TAGALIE |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1942 | 13/11/1942 | 44 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1943 | 05/02/1943 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1944 | 07/04/1944 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/12/1944 | 19/12/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/09/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/01/1947 | 11/02/1947 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/12/1947 | 30/01/1948 | 44 days | General | To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E64 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1949 | 09/07/1949 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9981 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60064 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1950 | 04/01/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27022 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1951 | 20/06/1951 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1953 | 06/02/1953 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27085 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1954 | 01/10/1954 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1956 | 20/06/1956 | 56 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27043 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1958 | 28/05/1958 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1959 | 07/03/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1959 | 24/03/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1959 | 02/06/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1959 | 25/09/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/01/1960 | 10/02/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1960 | 14/10/1960 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1961 | 12/05/1961 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/07/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2563, name: WILLIAM WHITELAW Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23101 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
09/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1925. Dep: 25/06/1925. Work undertaken: Painted for Centenary Procession |
||
14/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. | ||
06/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/04/1926. Dep: 08/04/1926. | ||
18/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/08/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. | ||
08/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1926. Dep: 18/02/1927. | ||
20/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1928. Dep: 27/04/1928. Work undertaken: Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
16/05/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5328 | ||
17/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/05/1928. Dep: 17/05/1928. | ||
10/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 18/01/1929. | ||
03/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1929. Dep: 31/05/1929. Work undertaken: Variable F S A fitted Boiler number 7702 (Diagram 94) |
||
17/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1929. Dep: 21/06/1929. | ||
20/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1930. Dep: 08/02/1930. | ||
25/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1930. Dep: 02/06/1930. | ||
16/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1930. Dep: 17/06/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 5479 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
04/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/07/1930. Dep: 11/07/1930. Work undertaken: Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
29/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1930. Dep: 01/08/1930. | ||
30/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1930. Dep: 02/12/1930. | ||
02/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1931. Dep: 12/02/1931. | ||
02/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/07/1931. Dep: 03/07/1931. | ||
06/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1931. Dep: 28/08/1931. | ||
11/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1932. Dep: 28/06/1932. | ||
19/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1932. Dep: 29/08/1932. | ||
09/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1933. Dep: 27/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7788 (Diagram 94) |
||
16/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. | ||
06/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/12/1934. Dep: 19/01/1935. | ||
05/04/1935 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5584 | ||
27/04/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
06/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1935. Dep: 19/07/1935. | ||
27/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936. | ||
02/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. | ||
27/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
19/07/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
17/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 29/04/1939. | ||
12/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
26/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940. | ||
11/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
04/12/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
07/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1941. Dep: 20/05/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A T C fitted Boiler number 7795 (Diagram 94) |
||
21/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941. Work undertaken: Change of name Named TAGALIE |
||
01/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/10/1942. Dep: 13/11/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27058 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
13/11/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
02/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1943. Dep: 05/02/1943. | ||
03/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 07/04/1944. | ||
17/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1944. Dep: 19/12/1944. | ||
19/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 532 but not taken up | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 64 | ||
08/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1947. Dep: 11/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9122 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
11/02/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
18/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1947. Dep: 30/01/1948. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E64 |
||
24/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1949. Dep: 09/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9981 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60064 |
||
09/07/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 04/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27022 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
14/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951. | ||
27/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. | ||
04/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1953. Dep: 06/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27085 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/02/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
14/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1954. Dep: 01/10/1954. | ||
26/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1956. Dep: 20/06/1956. | ||
06/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27043 (Diagram 94A) |
||
14/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 28/05/1958. | ||
26/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/02/1959. Dep: 07/03/1959. | ||
14/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/03/1959. Dep: 24/03/1959. | ||
19/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1959. Dep: 02/06/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
22/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1959. Dep: 25/09/1959. | ||
04/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 10/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) |
||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 14/10/1960. | ||
11/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/04/1961. Dep: 12/05/1961. | ||
09/1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
04/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60064 from Grantham (34F) |