|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1925 | 29/08/1925 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1926 | 25/02/1926 | 52 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/02/1927 | 06/05/1927 | 71 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1927 | 29/09/1927 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/05/1928 | 19/06/1928 | 50 days | General | Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/02/1929 | 26/02/1929 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1929 | 10/07/1929 | 30 days | General | Variable F S A fitted Boiler number 7788 (Diagram 94) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/08/1930 | 11/09/1930 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1931 | 18/02/1931 | 45 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1931 | 16/05/1931 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1931 | 02/11/1931 | 53 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1932 | 29/07/1932 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1932 | 02/01/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Named KNIGHT OF THISTLE |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1933 | 30/11/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/08/1934 | 23/08/1934 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1934 | 08/01/1935 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1936 | 03/04/1936 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1937 | 25/06/1937 | 39 days | Heavy | Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1937 | 25/11/1937 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 7781 (Diagram 94) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1938 | 28/04/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1939 | 05/08/1939 | 68 days | General | Hudd A T C fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/01/1940 | 09/01/1940 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/05/1940 | 25/05/1940 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1941 | 07/06/1941 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1942 | 08/07/1942 | 33 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 38 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1945 | 20/12/1945 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1947 | 23/03/1947 | 40 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1948 | 23/07/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60065 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1949 | 18/11/1949 | 37 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1951 | 29/03/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1952 | 24/12/1952 | 38 days | General | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1956 | 11/07/1956 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1957 | 16/05/1957 | 51 days | General | Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1958 | 31/10/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1960 | 19/02/1960 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1960 | 26/10/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1961 | 10/06/1961 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1961 | 25/11/1961 | 46 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1962 | 25/07/1962 | 51 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1962 | 23/11/1962 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1963 | 16/09/1963 | 36 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsall) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsall Steam Bay) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/07/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2564, name: KNIGHT OF THE THISTLE Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23102 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
11/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/08/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925. | ||
05/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1926. Dep: 25/02/1926. | ||
25/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1927. Dep: 06/05/1927. | ||
27/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1927. Dep: 29/09/1927. | ||
01/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1928. Dep: 19/06/1928. Work undertaken: Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
02/07/1928 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5325 | ||
25/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1929. Dep: 26/02/1929. | ||
11/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1929. Dep: 10/07/1929. Work undertaken: Variable F S A fitted Boiler number 7788 (Diagram 94) |
||
04/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
06/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/08/1930. Dep: 11/09/1930. | ||
05/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1931. Dep: 18/02/1931. | ||
22/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931. | ||
11/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1931. Dep: 02/11/1931. | ||
20/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/07/1932. Dep: 29/07/1932. | ||
09/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1932. Dep: 02/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Named KNIGHT OF THISTLE |
||
19/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1933. Dep: 30/11/1933. | ||
14/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/08/1934. Dep: 23/08/1934. | ||
21/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1934. Dep: 08/01/1935. | ||
17/10/1935 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5581 | ||
12/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1936. Dep: 03/04/1936. | ||
15/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
18/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1937. Dep: 25/06/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5268 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
29/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1937. Dep: 25/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7781 (Diagram 94) |
||
20/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1938. Dep: 28/04/1938. | ||
30/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1939. Dep: 05/08/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd A T C fitted |
||
05/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1940. Dep: 09/01/1940. | ||
23/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940. | ||
20/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
01/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1941. Dep: 07/06/1941. | ||
01/12/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
06/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/06/1942. Dep: 08/07/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 5283 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
23/01/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5276 | ||
27/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
04/03/1944 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
05/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1945. Dep: 20/12/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 533 but not taken up | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 65 | ||
12/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/02/1947. Dep: 23/03/1947. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9211 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
23/03/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
04/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1948. Dep: 23/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27037 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60065 |
||
13/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1949. Dep: 18/11/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
27/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1951. Dep: 29/03/1951. | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
19/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27041 (Diagram 94A) |
||
16/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. | ||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 11/07/1956. | ||
27/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1957. Dep: 16/05/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 5285 (GNR 5,000g) attached. To 75% Cut-off |
||
23/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 31/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27027 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
19/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1960. Dep: 19/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
05/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1960. Dep: 26/10/1960. | ||
17/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1961. Dep: 10/06/1961. | ||
11/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
05/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/06/1962. Dep: 25/07/1962. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
30/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/10/1962. Dep: 23/11/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
12/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/08/1963. Dep: 16/09/1963. | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
20/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
28/06/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60065 from New England (34E) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |