|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1925 | 21/01/1926 | 46 days | General | Named |
||
Darlington Works | 08/06/1926 | 15/09/1926 | 100 days | Light Repair | Cramlington derailment. Also had the legend CLASS 4.6.2. applied to buffer beam at same shopping |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1926 | 27/09/1926 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/10/1926 | 05/11/1926 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1927 | 19/08/1927 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/01/1928 | 04/04/1928 | 79 days | General | Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/01/1929 | 20/03/1929 | 72 days | General | Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/07/1929 | 10/08/1929 | 17 days | Light Repair | Variable F S A fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/04/1930 | 25/06/1930 | 73 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/07/1930 | 10/07/1930 | 4 days | Light Repair | Tablet apparatus ftted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1930 | 22/12/1930 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/02/1931 | 03/03/1931 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1931 | 12/06/1931 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1931 | 25/06/1931 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1932 | 12/04/1932 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/09/1932 | 15/11/1932 | 48 days | Heavy | Broken frame |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1934 | 19/04/1934 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/12/1934 | 27/01/1935 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/11/1935 | 14/11/1935 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1935 | 09/01/1936 | 55 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/12/1936 | 13/02/1937 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 7797 (Diagram 94) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/05/1937 | 08/05/1937 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1938 | 23/05/1938 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/03/1939 | 06/04/1939 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 41 days | General | Hudd A T C fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/10/1941 | 14/12/1941 | 49 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1943 | 13/10/1943 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1944 | 26/12/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1945 | 09/12/1945 | 52 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8783 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1946 | 28/02/1946 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1946 | 21/12/1946 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1947 | 02/01/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/02/1948 | 09/02/1948 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1948 | 17/03/1948 | 12 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60066 |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1949 | 06/10/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1951 | 02/04/1951 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1952 | 14/01/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1953 | 22/04/1953 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1954 | 27/01/1955 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1955 | 11/02/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/03/1957 | 24/05/1957 | 55 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1958 | 05/06/1958 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1958 | 15/10/1958 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1959 | 22/01/1959 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1959 | 28/02/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1960 | 29/01/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/05/1960 | 06/07/1960 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1960 | 21/12/1960 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1961 | 13/10/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1963 | 11/02/1963 | 34 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/10/1947 | Goswick | The locomotive concerned in the recent derailment here was A.3 No. 66 Merry Hampton. | SLS/194711 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
31/07/1962 | A3 trough-pattern smoke deflectors | The number of Class A3 Pacifics fitted with trough-pattern smoke deflectors is forty-three. A further six locos have since been modified at Doncaster Works and includes an additional example, not previously recorded, bringing the total equipped at the time of writing to exactly fifty. 60036 Colombo 7/62, 60066 Merry Hampton 10/61, 60037 Hyperion 5/62, 60075 St. Frusquin 4/62, 60051 Blink Bonny 3/62, 60111 Enterprise 4/62. 60054 Prince of Wales 5/62. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/07/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2565, name: MERRY HAMPTON Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23103 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
07/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1925. Dep: 21/01/1926. Work undertaken: Named |
||
08/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1926. Dep: 15/09/1926. Work undertaken: Cramlington derailment. Also had the legend CLASS 4.6.2. applied to buffer beam at same shopping |
||
20/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1926. Dep: 27/09/1926. | ||
20/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/10/1926. Dep: 05/11/1926. | ||
16/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/08/1927. Dep: 19/08/1927. | ||
17/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1928. Dep: 04/04/1928. Work undertaken: Modified valve gear Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
05/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
05/07/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
08/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1929. Dep: 20/03/1929. Work undertaken: Tender number 5330 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
04/07/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5276 | ||
25/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/07/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929. Work undertaken: Variable F S A fitted |
||
14/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1930. Dep: 25/06/1930. | ||
07/07/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1930. Dep: 10/07/1930. Work undertaken: Tablet apparatus ftted |
||
06/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
04/12/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/12/1930. Dep: 22/12/1930. | ||
25/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/02/1931. Dep: 03/03/1931. | ||
15/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/05/1931. Dep: 12/06/1931. | ||
24/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1931. Dep: 25/06/1931. | ||
17/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
01/12/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
29/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1932. Dep: 12/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7785 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/09/1932. Dep: 15/11/1932. Work undertaken: Broken frame |
||
02/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1934. Dep: 19/04/1934. | ||
25/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/12/1934. Dep: 27/01/1935. | ||
10/08/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
13/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1935. Dep: 14/11/1935. | ||
16/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1935. Dep: 09/01/1936. | ||
04/05/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
09/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
28/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1936. Dep: 13/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7797 (Diagram 94) |
||
28/03/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
04/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937. | ||
13/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1938. Dep: 23/05/1938. | ||
13/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 06/04/1939. | ||
29/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. Work undertaken: Hudd A T C fitted |
||
19/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
12/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
27/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 14/12/1941. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
14/12/1941 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
31/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1943. Dep: 13/10/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5283 | ||
24/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/12/1944. Dep: 26/12/1944. | ||
19/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/10/1945. Dep: 09/12/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8783 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5211 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 534 but not taken up | ||
22/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1946. Dep: 28/02/1946. | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 66 | ||
09/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 21/12/1946. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
16/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1947. Dep: 02/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9216 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5223 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
08/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/02/1948. Dep: 09/02/1948. | ||
06/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1948. Dep: 17/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60066 |
||
18/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1949. Dep: 06/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27038 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
06/10/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
06/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 02/04/1951. | ||
07/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1952. Dep: 14/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27044 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/01/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
23/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1953. Dep: 22/04/1953. | ||
17/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1954. Dep: 27/01/1955. | ||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 11/02/1955. | ||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
05/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
31/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1957. Dep: 24/05/1957. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
06/1957 | Report | Report: With the introduction of the summer timetable there are, Mondays to Thursdays, no fewer than five daily non—stop trains between Kings Cross and Newcastle—an all-time record. These are the 7.45, 10.0 a.m., 4.0, 7.45 and 10.15 p.m. from Kings Cross, and the corresponding return trains from Newcastle leaving at 12.19, 1.4, 9.45 a.m., 12.24 and 6.15 p.m. The number is reduced from five to four down on Fridays, when` the "Car-Sleeper" does not run, although there are still five up. As a result of these alterations there are now eight through engine workings between Kings Cross and Newcastle. Kings Cross engines and men work down on the 7.45 a.m. "Morning Talisman," 10.0 a.m. "Flying Scotsman," 3.15 p.m. Niddrie goods, 4.50 p.m. "Tees-Tyne Pullman" and the 7.45 p.m. "Car-Sleeper," which has had the engine-changing stops at Grantham and York withdrawn. The engines and crews return from Newcastle on the following day in this order : 12.19 a.m. "Car-Sleeper," 8.0 a.m., 12.24 p.m., 9.20 a.m. "Tees-Tyne Pullman" and 9.45 a.m. "Morning Talisman." As the 3.15 p.m. down goods arrives at Newcastle after the 4.0 and 4.50 p.m. the crew start their rest period later and so return out of sequence. The Gateshead workings to London are unchanged (1.4 a.m. and 6.15 p.m. up and 10.10 a.m. and 10.15 p.m. down). As a result of these developments, "A1s" Nos. 60125/58 and "A3s" Nos. 60066 and 60110 have been sent to Kings Cross and have been used on Newcastle duties in company with other "A1s," "A3s" and "A4s" ; the "A3s" do not appear to have any difficulty keeping the timings of the faster trains. (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) | ||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
17/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958. | ||
26/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1958. Dep: 15/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29322 (Diagram 107) Double Chimney fitted |
||
02/11/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
12/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1959. Dep: 22/01/1959. | ||
07/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1959. Dep: 28/02/1959. | ||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
07/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1960. Dep: 29/01/1960. | ||
19/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1960. Dep: 06/07/1960. | ||
28/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1960. Dep: 21/12/1960. | ||
18/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/09/1961. Dep: 13/10/1961. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
01/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29314 (Diagram 107) Tender number 5266 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
09/01/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1963. Dep: 11/02/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
08/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60066 from Grantham (34F) |