|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 27/02/1925 | 16/03/1925 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1926 | 25/05/1926 | 84 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/08/1926 | 13/08/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1927 | 13/07/1927 | 58 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1927 | 06/09/1927 | 35 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1928 | 06/03/1928 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/06/1928 | 13/07/1928 | 39 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/09/1928 | 13/09/1928 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1929 | 19/06/1929 | 56 days | General | Variable F S A fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1929 | 01/07/1929 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1929 | 27/11/1929 | 19 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/06/1930 | 10/07/1930 | 35 days | General | Tablet apparatus fitted Tender number 5479 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/03/1931 | 28/04/1931 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1931 | 12/01/1932 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1933 | 24/03/1933 | 57 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1933 | 18/01/1934 | 56 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1934 | 10/01/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/06/1935 | 04/07/1935 | 9 days | Light Repair | Flaman Speed Recorder attached |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/10/1935 | 23/10/1935 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1935 | 01/11/1935 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1936 | 28/02/1936 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1936 | 05/02/1937 | 49 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1938 | 09/07/1938 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1938 | 25/08/1938 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/07/1939 | 28/07/1939 | 8 days | Light Repair | Left leading hot-box |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/09/1939 | 04/11/1939 | 46 days | Heavy | Hudd A T C fitted Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1941 | 27/02/1941 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1942 | 16/05/1942 | 43 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/07/1943 | 14/07/1943 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/09/1943 | 12/10/1943 | 36 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1944 | 02/12/1944 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/12/1944 | 23/12/1944 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1945 | 23/08/1945 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/07/1946 | 19/08/1946 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1947 | 24/10/1947 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1948 | 30/07/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60067 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1950 | 16/02/1950 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1950 | 09/10/1950 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1951 | 19/02/1951 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1951 | 27/09/1951 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/06/1952 | 20/06/1952 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1953 | 14/08/1953 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1954 | 01/09/1954 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1955 | 31/03/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1955 | 03/04/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1956 | 12/03/1956 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1956 | 18/06/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1957 | 06/03/1957 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/08/1958 | 06/09/1958 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1958 | 08/12/1958 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1959 | 10/04/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1960 | 29/07/1960 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1961 | 26/04/1961 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1962 | 19/03/1962 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1962 | 25/07/1962 | 21 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works on 26/6 included; Nos. 1, 29, 30/6/9, 65/7, 104, 518, 818/83, 1083, 1128, 1800/24, 2821, 60042/49/97, 60515, 60870, 61830. The first of the new 'A.1' 4-6-2's No. 60114, was nearing completion here in early July and was being proceeded with faster than No. 60539. | SLS/194808 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
31/07/1961 | Modified class A3\'s outshopped | Further Class A3 Pacifics out-shopped ex-Doncaster Works with Dia. 107 boilers have been 60067 Ladas during April, followed by 60075 St. Frusquin in May, whilst trough-pattern smoke deflectors were fitted to 60088 Book Law during June, and 60077 The White Knight and 60099 Call Boy in July. | SLS/196109 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Works Yard) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/08/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2566, name: LADAS Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23104 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g |
||
27/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1925. Dep: 16/03/1925. | ||
03/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1926. Dep: 25/05/1926. | ||
05/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1926. Dep: 13/08/1926. | ||
17/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1927. Dep: 13/07/1927. | ||
03/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1927. Dep: 06/09/1927. | ||
22/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/02/1928. Dep: 06/03/1928. | ||
05/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1928. Dep: 13/07/1928. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
06/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1928. Dep: 13/09/1928. | ||
25/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1929. Dep: 19/06/1929. Work undertaken: Variable F S A fitted |
||
26/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1929. Dep: 01/07/1929. | ||
04/07/1929 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Corridor number 5330 | ||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 27/11/1929. | ||
06/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1930. Dep: 10/07/1930. Work undertaken: Tablet apparatus fitted Tender number 5479 (LNER Non-Corridor) attached. |
||
18/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
26/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1931. Dep: 28/04/1931. | ||
12/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1931. Dep: 12/01/1932. | ||
27/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1933. Dep: 24/03/1933. | ||
24/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 18/01/1934. | ||
29/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1934. Dep: 10/01/1935. | ||
26/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/06/1935. Dep: 04/07/1935. Work undertaken: Flaman Speed Recorder attached |
||
22/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1935. Dep: 23/10/1935. | ||
29/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/10/1935. Dep: 01/11/1935. | ||
21/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1936. Dep: 28/02/1936. | ||
19/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 05/02/1937. | ||
07/02/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
09/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1938. Dep: 09/07/1938. | ||
23/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1938. Dep: 25/08/1938. | ||
21/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/07/1939. Dep: 28/07/1939. Work undertaken: Left leading hot-box |
||
20/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 20/09/1939. Dep: 04/11/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd A T C fitted Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
26/11/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
21/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1941. Dep: 27/02/1941. | ||
04/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1942. Dep: 16/05/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
16/05/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
13/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/07/1943. Dep: 14/07/1943. | ||
07/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1943. Dep: 12/10/1943. | ||
29/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944. | ||
22/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. | ||
11/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1945. Dep: 23/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 535 but not taken up | ||
30/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/07/1946. Dep: 19/08/1946. | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 67 | ||
10/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27066 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
19/04/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
13/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1947. Dep: 24/10/1947. | ||
08/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1948. Dep: 30/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9568 (Diagram 94HP) Renumbered to BR 60067 |
||
10/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1950. Dep: 16/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
16/02/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
01/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1950. Dep: 09/10/1950. | ||
31/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1951. Dep: 19/02/1951. | ||
20/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 27/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
27/09/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
16/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/06/1952. Dep: 20/06/1952. | ||
22/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
07/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1953. Dep: 14/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27013 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
18/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1954. Dep: 01/09/1954. | ||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27059 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
01/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/04/1955. Dep: 03/04/1955. | ||
29/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/02/1956. Dep: 12/03/1956. | ||
09/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/06/1956. Dep: 18/06/1956. | ||
30/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/01/1957. Dep: 06/03/1957. | ||
15/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/08/1958. Dep: 06/09/1958. | ||
28/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/11/1958. Dep: 08/12/1958. | ||
03/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
13/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
05/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1960. Dep: 29/07/1960. | ||
08/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1961. Dep: 26/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29277 (Diagram 107) |
||
07/1961 | Modification | Modification: Trough deflectors fitted | ||
20/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1962. Dep: 19/03/1962. | ||
05/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/07/1962. Dep: 25/07/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60067 from Kings Cross (34A) |