|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 17/04/1925 | 11/05/1925 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/11/1925 | 22/01/1926 | 81 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 10/03/1926 | 11/03/1926 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1927 | 20/12/1927 | 81 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 15/02/1929 | 26/04/1929 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/09/1929 | 23/09/1929 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1929 | 12/02/1930 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 7798 (Diagram 94) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/03/1931 | 23/03/1931 | 13 days | Light Repair | Valves re-set |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/05/1931 | 16/06/1931 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/06/1932 | 06/08/1932 | 39 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/10/1932 | 07/11/1932 | 14 days | Light Repair | Valves re-set |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1933 | 04/02/1933 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1933 | 19/10/1933 | 44 days | General | Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1934 | 17/11/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 16 days | Light Repair | Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/04/1936 | 21/04/1936 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/03/1941 | 12/04/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1942 | 16/01/1943 | 27 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1944 | 28/10/1944 | 53 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1946 | 17/05/1946 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 52 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/05/1948 | 18/05/1948 | 9 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 60071 |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1948 | 24/12/1948 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1950 | 20/07/1950 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1951 | 01/11/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1952 | 02/04/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 30 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1954 | 20/08/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1955 | 09/02/1955 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1956 | 01/05/1956 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/11/1956 | 15/11/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1958 | 04/07/1958 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1959 | 04/02/1959 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1959 | 07/10/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29329 (Diagram 107) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/09/1961 | 04/11/1961 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1962 | 05/01/1962 | -319 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1963 | 29/05/1963 | 13 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/09/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2570, name: TRANQUIL Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23108 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
17/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1925. Dep: 11/05/1925. | ||
03/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1925. Dep: 22/01/1926. | ||
10/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/03/1926. Dep: 11/03/1926. | ||
01/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 20/12/1927. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
15/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1929. Dep: 26/04/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
23/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1929. Dep: 23/09/1929. | ||
16/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1929. Dep: 12/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7798 (Diagram 94) |
||
11/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1931. Dep: 23/03/1931. Work undertaken: Valves re-set |
||
11/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1931. Dep: 16/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932. | ||
25/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1932. Dep: 07/11/1932. Work undertaken: Valves re-set |
||
31/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933. | ||
06/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1933. Dep: 19/10/1933. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
12/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1934. Dep: 17/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7778 (Diagram 94) |
||
22/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. Work undertaken: Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
03/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
21/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/04/1936. Dep: 21/04/1936. | ||
18/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
11/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
17/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
23/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. | ||
15/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1941. Dep: 12/04/1941. | ||
21/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1942. Dep: 16/01/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
16/01/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
17/01/1943 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5291 | ||
06/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/09/1944. Dep: 28/10/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 27020 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 539 but not taken up | ||
04/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1946. Dep: 17/05/1946. | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
27/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 71 | ||
30/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
19/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
09/10/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
10/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1948. Dep: 18/05/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60071 |
||
24/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1948. Dep: 24/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8782 (Diagram 94A) |
||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 20/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8720 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
20/07/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
04/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1951. Dep: 01/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27061 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
01/11/1951 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/03/1952. Dep: 02/04/1952. | ||
16/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
03/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
12/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1954. Dep: 20/08/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) |
||
05/09/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
02/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1955. Dep: 09/02/1955. | ||
13/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
17/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 01/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
01/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1956. Dep: 15/11/1956. | ||
11/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
26/05/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 04/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
19/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1959. Dep: 04/02/1959. | ||
18/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 07/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29329 (Diagram 107) |
||
06/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
26/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1961. Dep: 04/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29290 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
21/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1962. Dep: 05/01/1962. | ||
15/05/1963 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5263 | ||
17/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/05/1963. Dep: 29/05/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60071 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |