|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 04/01/1926 | 14/04/1926 | 101 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1926 | 11/06/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gateshead Works | 07/03/1927 | 09/03/1927 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 07/12/1927 | 09/03/1928 | 94 days | General | Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1928 | 12/06/1928 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1929 | 12/06/1929 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/10/1929 | 28/11/1929 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1930 | 10/04/1930 | 32 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1931 | 17/07/1931 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1931 | 18/11/1931 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 7763 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1934 | 22/08/1934 | 56 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/05/1935 | 28/06/1935 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7787 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1936 | 02/02/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 16/02/1937 | 16/02/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1937 | 19/12/1937 | 25 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/11/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/08/1940 | 15/08/1940 | 7 days | Light Repair | R. H. frame straightened |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 33 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/06/1942 | 25/07/1942 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1943 | 17/02/1943 | 27 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/12/1944 | 01/02/1945 | 52 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/06/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 44 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 72 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/01/1948 | 05/03/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 8780 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E72 |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/11/1948 | 01/12/1948 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1949 | 17/08/1949 | 45 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1949 | 25/08/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1951 | 25/04/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1952 | 05/06/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/11/1953 | 23/12/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1955 | 07/06/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1956 | 05/01/1957 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1958 | 06/06/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1958 | 27/08/1958 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1958 | 18/12/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/07/1959 | 18/07/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1959 | 28/11/1959 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1960 | 19/05/1960 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/09/1960 | 22/11/1960 | 83 days | General |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | L.N.E.R. Notes (March Area) | March Area.-'V.2's' appear quite often, the following having been noted in Oct./Nov.: 4772/96, 4813/7. 'J.17' 8195 has been fitted with carriage heating and vacuum brake. 2859 East Anglian was here 31/10/42 fresh from Plant. It has ordinary whistle. A 'Pacific' visits us regularly on Sundays, examples noted being 4472/4 an 2571. 'E.4's' 7408/16/66/92 an 7503 are stationed here for working on the Joint line to Spalding, &c.-the first ones shedded here for a long time. Our regular station pilot 8062 is often in shops and its place is taken by 'D.16' 8805 or by 'D.9' or 'J.15' classes. | SLS/194302 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/09/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2571, name: SUNSTAR Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23109 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
04/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1926. Dep: 14/04/1926. | ||
03/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1926. Dep: 11/06/1926. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
07/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/03/1927. Dep: 09/03/1927. | ||
07/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1927. Dep: 09/03/1928. Work undertaken: Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
04/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/06/1928. Dep: 12/06/1928. | ||
20/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1929. Dep: 12/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7790 (Diagram 94) |
||
28/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1929. Dep: 28/11/1929. | ||
10/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1930. Dep: 10/04/1930. | ||
03/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1931. Dep: 17/07/1931. | ||
15/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1931. Dep: 18/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7763 (Diagram 94) |
||
24/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. | ||
09/1933 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Pump removed | ||
28/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1934. Dep: 22/08/1934. | ||
17/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1935. Dep: 28/06/1935. | ||
02/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7787 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1936. Dep: 02/02/1937. | ||
16/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 16/02/1937. Dep: 16/02/1937. | ||
25/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1937. Dep: 19/12/1937. | ||
17/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
18/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. | ||
09/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/08/1940. Dep: 15/08/1940. Work undertaken: R. H. frame straightened |
||
14/10/1940 | Tender | Tender fitted: LNER Non-Corridor number 5476 | ||
10/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8249 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
24/06/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942. | ||
22/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1943. Dep: 17/02/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
17/02/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. | ||
12/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1944. Dep: 01/02/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 540 but not taken up | ||
14/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 72 |
||
22/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1948. Dep: 05/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8780 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E72 |
||
05/03/1948 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
19/08/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60072 | ||
16/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/11/1948. Dep: 01/12/1948. | ||
04/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1949. Dep: 17/08/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
22/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949. | ||
28/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 25/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27042 (Diagram 94A) |
||
30/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
24/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1953. Dep: 23/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27006 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
27/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1955. Dep: 07/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27009 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1956. Dep: 05/01/1957. | ||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 06/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27080 (Diagram 94A) |
||
13/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/08/1958. Dep: 27/08/1958. | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
01/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1958. Dep: 18/12/1958. | ||
07/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/07/1959. Dep: 18/07/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
28/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/10/1959. Dep: 28/11/1959. | ||
23/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1960. Dep: 19/05/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
01/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1960. Dep: 22/11/1960. | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60072 from Heaton (52B) |