|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/06/1925 | 14/07/1925 | 42 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 03/08/1925 | 07/10/1925 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/05/1927 | 15/06/1927 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 30/03/1928 | 27/06/1928 | 90 days | General | Variable blast pipe fitted Boiler number 7798 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Gateshead Works | 28/11/1928 | 14/12/1928 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1929 | 20/02/1929 | 42 days | Heavy | |||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1929 | 21/11/1929 | 66 days | General | Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1930 | 26/04/1930 | 47 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1930 | 22/12/1930 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/04/1932 | 18/06/1932 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/10/1932 | 20/10/1932 | 10 days | Light Repair | Valves re-set |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1933 | 21/07/1933 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1934 | 31/05/1934 | 43 days | General | Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1935 | 20/03/1935 | 31 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/08/1935 | 30/08/1935 | 18 days | Light Repair | Right Trailiing box heating |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1936 | 23/04/1936 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 7694 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1937 | 04/03/1937 | 34 days | General | Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/10/1937 | 02/12/1937 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1938 | 19/11/1938 | 33 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1939 | 12/12/1939 | 18 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/05/1941 | 27/06/1941 | 50 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9120 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1942 | 07/10/1942 | 42 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1944 | 25/03/1944 | 33 days | General | Tender number 5232 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1944 | 01/11/1944 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1945 | 13/07/1945 | 75 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1945 | 03/10/1945 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1946 | 15/02/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1946 | 25/01/1947 | 40 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1947 | 09/03/1947 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1947 | 09/10/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/11/1947 | 17/12/1947 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1948 | 02/09/1948 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 9565 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60076 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/06/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1949 | 10/09/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/10/1949 | 25/10/1949 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1952 | 11/03/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27071 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/04/1953 | 20/04/1953 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1954 | 07/04/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1955 | 24/10/1955 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1957 | 27/09/1957 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1958 | 29/10/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1959 | 30/06/1959 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1959 | 08/07/1959 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1960 | 09/11/1960 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5262 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
07/08/1951 | Unusual K.X. arrivals | On 7/8/51 the 12.53 p.m. arrival (ex Hull) reached King's Cross at 2.8 behind B1 's 61331 an 61094, followed at 2.20 by the Newcastle due at 1.31. This was hauled by 61972 of 35A. The 1.41 and 1.51 Newcastle and Sunderland trains, the 2.2 Leeds and 2.12 T.T. Pullman then followed at intervals as circumstances permitted. The next day the 1.30 p.m. arrival ex Newcastle was booked 1 hr. 40 mins. late at 2.15 and the Grantham crew who work this turn would have to step lively to get to the end of No. 10 platform by 3.30 p.m., their booked return working. When this occurred on another recent occasion, they arrived after 3.20 and went straight round to No. 10 just in time to take over from the relief King's Cross crew who were preparing to take the train out. A day or two before the holiday, the T.T. Pullman, running very late, arrived at K.X. about 5 p.m. behind 60076 (still green). The turn round was made very slickly and the train left again within 25 mins. The 'Capitals' has run very well lately and Haymarket have kept 60027 going for an unbroken spell of two weeks. On the K.X. end 60022 has performed very well, and is now being rested while 60029 takes her turn. On Saturday 4/8/51 the 8.8 p.m. arrival from Peterboro' passed Potters Bar at 7.50 behind 43080 (35A), believed to be the first recorded visit of one of these on a passenger train in the London area. | SLS/195110 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2575, name: GALOPIN Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23113 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
03/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/06/1925. Dep: 14/07/1925. | ||
03/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1925. Dep: 07/10/1925. | ||
31/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/05/1927. Dep: 15/06/1927. | ||
30/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1928. Dep: 27/06/1928. Work undertaken: Variable blast pipe fitted Boiler number 7798 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
28/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1928. Dep: 14/12/1928. | ||
10/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 20/02/1929. | ||
17/09/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1929. Dep: 21/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) |
||
11/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930. | ||
12/11/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1930. Dep: 22/12/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) |
||
28/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1932. Dep: 18/06/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
11/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1932. Dep: 20/10/1932. Work undertaken: Valves re-set |
||
12/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1933. Dep: 21/07/1933. | ||
19/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1934. Dep: 31/05/1934. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
18/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1935. Dep: 20/03/1935. | ||
13/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1935. Dep: 30/08/1935. Work undertaken: Right Trailiing box heating |
||
02/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1936. Dep: 23/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7694 (Diagram 94) |
||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 04/03/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 5227 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
28/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1937. Dep: 02/12/1937. | ||
18/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. | ||
25/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 12/12/1939. | ||
09/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/05/1941. Dep: 27/06/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9120 (Diagram 94A) |
||
27/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1942. Dep: 07/10/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
22/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 5232 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
12/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/10/1944. Dep: 01/11/1944. | ||
30/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1945. Dep: 13/07/1945. | ||
17/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1945. Dep: 03/10/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 544 but not taken up | ||
01/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/02/1946. Dep: 15/02/1946. | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 76 | ||
17/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
25/01/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
05/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1947. Dep: 09/03/1947. | ||
02/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1947. Dep: 09/10/1947. | ||
28/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/11/1947. Dep: 17/12/1947. | ||
20/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1948. Dep: 02/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9565 (Diagram 94A) Renumbered to BR 60076 |
||
19/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
09/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/06/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. | ||
09/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/09/1949. Dep: 10/09/1949. | ||
18/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1949. Dep: 25/10/1949. | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 11/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27071 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
11/03/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
16/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
01/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/04/1953. Dep: 20/04/1953. | ||
04/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1954. Dep: 07/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
15/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1955. Dep: 24/10/1955. | ||
12/02/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/08/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
08/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1957. Dep: 27/09/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27068 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
01/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
20/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1958. Dep: 29/10/1958. | ||
12/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27046 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1959. Dep: 08/07/1959. | ||
21/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1960. Dep: 09/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27067 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5262 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
18/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
18/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
29/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60076 from Heaton (52B) |