|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/03/1926 | 05/08/1926 | 154 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1926 | 18/08/1926 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1926 | 23/09/1926 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 02/03/1927 | 04/03/1927 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/04/1927 | 27/04/1927 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 30/05/1927 | 07/06/1927 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 28/06/1927 | 04/07/1927 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/02/1928 | 27/04/1928 | 77 days | General | Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 04/05/1928 | 10/05/1928 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/06/1929 | 10/08/1929 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1929 | 19/12/1929 | 66 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1930 | 06/06/1930 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1930 | 26/11/1930 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 7766 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1931 | 16/01/1932 | 19 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 22/09/1932 | 03/10/1932 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1933 | 22/04/1933 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1934 | 11/04/1934 | 50 days | General | Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Darlington Works | 02/08/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/08/1934 | 17/08/1934 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1935 | 21/03/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1936 | 13/03/1936 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/11/1936 | 31/12/1936 | 36 days | General | 84,969 miles |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 34 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 08/08/1938 | 29/08/1938 | 22 days | Unclassified | After derailment |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 44 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1940 | 01/02/1940 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1942 | 28/02/1942 | 36 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1942 | 22/04/1942 | 6 days | Light Repair | Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 59 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1946 | 27/07/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/01/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 36 days | General | Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1948 | 06/11/1948 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9446 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 24/08/1949 | 26/08/1949 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 07/12/1949 | 09/12/1949 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1950 | 12/10/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1952 | 06/05/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1952 | 21/10/1952 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1953 | 28/08/1953 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1956 | 05/06/1956 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1957 | 16/03/1957 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1957 | 02/01/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1958 | 16/07/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1959 | 27/02/1959 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1960 | 14/11/1960 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1962 | 08/03/1962 | 52 days | Heavy Casual | Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (On shed, waiting Works) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
30/06/1962 | Trough deflector fitted A3\'s | Details of two further Class A3 Pacifics equipped with trough-pattern smoke deflectors at Doncaster Works are given below, bringing the total now fitted to thirty-seven : 60078 Night Hawk 3/62, 60085 Manna 4/62. | SLS/196207 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/10/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2577, name: NIGHT HAWK Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23115 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
05/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1926. Dep: 05/08/1926. | ||
10/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1926. Dep: 18/08/1926. | ||
08/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/09/1926. Dep: 23/09/1926. | ||
02/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/03/1927. Dep: 04/03/1927. | ||
25/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/04/1927. Dep: 27/04/1927. | ||
30/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/05/1927. Dep: 07/06/1927. | ||
28/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1927. Dep: 04/07/1927. | ||
11/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1928. Dep: 27/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7802 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
04/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1928. Dep: 10/05/1928. | ||
03/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1929. Dep: 10/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7793 (Diagram 94) |
||
15/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1929. Dep: 19/12/1929. | ||
21/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1930. Dep: 06/06/1930. | ||
16/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1930. Dep: 26/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7766 (Diagram 94) |
||
29/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1931. Dep: 16/01/1932. | ||
22/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/09/1932. Dep: 03/10/1932. | ||
23/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1933. Dep: 22/04/1933. | ||
21/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1934. Dep: 11/04/1934. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
02/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/08/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. | ||
06/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/08/1934. Dep: 17/08/1934. | ||
21/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1935. Dep: 21/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7775 (Diagram 94) |
||
03/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1936. Dep: 13/03/1936. | ||
26/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1936. Dep: 31/12/1936. Work undertaken: 84,969 miles |
||
07/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
17/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. | ||
08/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/08/1938. Dep: 29/08/1938. Work undertaken: After derailment |
||
10/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. | ||
17/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1940. Dep: 01/02/1940. | ||
21/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
24/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
28/02/1942 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
17/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/04/1942. Dep: 22/04/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 |
||
15/01/1944 | Modification | Diagram 94A number 8779 boiler fitted | ||
28/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
29/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 546 but not taken up | ||
06/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
13/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946. | ||
10/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 78 | ||
18/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
22/02/1947 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
10/04/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 60078 | ||
28/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9446 (Diagram 94A) |
||
24/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1949. Dep: 26/08/1949. | ||
07/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1949. Dep: 09/12/1949. | ||
24/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
07/10/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
10/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950. | ||
03/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1952. Dep: 06/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5275 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
06/05/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
25/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/09/1952. Dep: 21/10/1952. | ||
22/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1953. Dep: 28/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27001 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
27/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. | ||
13/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/08/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1956. Dep: 05/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27028 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
05/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/03/1957. Dep: 16/03/1957. | ||
25/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 02/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27017 (Diagram 94A) |
||
09/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 16/07/1958. | ||
05/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1959. Dep: 27/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27070 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
11/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1960. Dep: 14/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27007 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. | ||
16/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1962. Dep: 08/03/1962. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60078 from Heaton (52B) |