|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 23/10/1925 | 27/10/1925 | 5 days | Light Repair | For naming Named DICK TURPIN |
||
Gateshead Works | 15/03/1926 | 29/03/1926 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 10/08/1926 | 15/12/1926 | 128 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 14/01/1927 | 02/02/1927 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/10/1927 | 23/11/1927 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1928 | 06/02/1928 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1928 | 14/04/1928 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/10/1928 | 16/01/1929 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 30/10/1929 | 04/12/1929 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1930 | 03/03/1930 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1931 | 23/04/1931 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1931 | 20/10/1931 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1932 | 24/03/1932 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1934 | 08/06/1934 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 7784 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5264 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1934 | 31/08/1934 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/01/1935 | 14/02/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1935 | 14/11/1935 | 53 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 21/11/1935 | 21/11/1935 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1937 | 13/02/1937 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1938 | 22/04/1938 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5288 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1939 | 22/07/1939 | 48 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1941 | 20/02/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1942 | 26/11/1942 | 37 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8778 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1943 | 14/09/1943 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1944 | 17/08/1944 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1944 | 14/11/1944 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1945 | 02/02/1946 | 36 days | General | To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/10/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 80 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/06/1947 | 09/08/1947 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9207 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1949 | 18/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60080 |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1950 | 20/10/1950 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1952 | 05/02/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1953 | 04/09/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/01/1955 | 01/03/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1955 | 11/11/1955 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1956 | 19/07/1956 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/04/1957 | 08/05/1957 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1957 | 07/06/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1957 | 31/07/1957 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1959 | 13/10/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/09/1961 | 03/11/1961 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 25/01/1964 | 14/02/1964 | 21 days | Light Repair |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
31/01/1954 | York MPD | J77 class 0-6-OT's, normally rare at York, were represented there in January by 68435 (53C) under repair at the north shed towards the end of the month, and 68401 (53B) shunting at Queen Street and later under repair at the south shed. On 1/1/54 65022 (Class J2) was noted 'dead' en route for breaking up at Darlington Works hauled by an 'Austerity' 2-8-0. By contrast new Diesel 13079 from Darlington came up light through York on 19/1/54. Other unusual visitors included 60519 (64B) ex-works on Doncaster turns into York on 16/1/54. One of the Westinghouse fitted Standard Class 5 4-6-0's from Derby, 73031, visited York on 6/1/54. The engine concerned in the derailment of the down 'Heart of Midlothian' at Thirsk on 20/1/54 was 60126 (52B) which was later noted 'dead' in York shed yard. On the evening of the derailment the down 'Aberdonian' and other expresses were diverted from York via Knaresborough, Bilton, and Ripon. 60080 (52B) failed at York on the 7.45 a.m. Newcastle-King's Cross express (non-stop from Darlington to Peterborough) on 25/1/54 and was replaced by the York south end pilot 60502 (50A) which went forward 34 minutes late. 60539 (52B) took over this working on the next day. |
SLS/195403 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Weigh House) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
10/03/1963 | Ardsley MPD (Stored) | Stored at Ardsley on 10th March-60036/69/70/7/80/92/125, 61068/310, 64719/49/54/6/60/96/859/79/86/911/8/69, 67742/63/5/6/77. | SLS/196304 |
01/04/1963 | Washingborough Junction (Stored) | The Washingborough Junc.- Pelham St. Junc, section of the Boston-Lincoln line has been taken out of use; trains now use the former avoiding line from Washingborough Junc. (s.b. now closed) to Greetwell Junc. and the GN/GE Joint line thence to Lincoln Central. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2579 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23117 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
23/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/10/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925. Work undertaken: For naming Named DICK TURPIN |
||
15/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1926. Dep: 29/03/1926. | ||
10/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1926. Dep: 15/12/1926. | ||
14/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/01/1927. Dep: 02/02/1927. | ||
04/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1927. Dep: 23/11/1927. | ||
27/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1928. Dep: 06/02/1928. | ||
04/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/04/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928. | ||
26/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1928. Dep: 16/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
30/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/10/1929. Dep: 04/12/1929. | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 03/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7794 (Diagram 94) |
||
17/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1931. Dep: 23/04/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7801 (Diagram 94) |
||
06/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1931. Dep: 20/10/1931. | ||
17/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1932. Dep: 24/03/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7697 (Diagram 94) |
||
02/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. | ||
25/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1934. Dep: 08/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7784 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5264 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
28/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1934. Dep: 31/08/1934. | ||
10/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1935. Dep: 14/02/1935. | ||
23/09/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1935. Dep: 14/11/1935. | ||
21/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/11/1935. Dep: 21/11/1935. | ||
26/07/1936 | Tender | Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g number 5263 | ||
07/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937. | ||
16/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1938. Dep: 22/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7800 (Diagram 94) Tender number 5288 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
05/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939. | ||
14/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1941. Dep: 20/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7768 (Diagram 94) |
||
21/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/10/1942. Dep: 26/11/1942. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8778 (Diagram 94A) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
02/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/09/1943. Dep: 14/09/1943. | ||
20/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1944. Dep: 17/08/1944. | ||
31/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
09/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/11/1944. Dep: 14/11/1944. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
29/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1945. Dep: 02/02/1946. Work undertaken: To 75% Cut-off |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 548 but not taken up | ||
26/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 80 |
||
23/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9207 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
07/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1949. Dep: 18/03/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60080 |
||
14/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1950. Dep: 20/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27003 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
07/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1952. Dep: 05/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
05/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 04/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27002 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5229 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
28/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1955. Dep: 01/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27069 (Diagram 94A) |
||
20/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1955. Dep: 11/11/1955. | ||
30/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1956. Dep: 19/07/1956. | ||
16/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/04/1957. Dep: 08/05/1957. | ||
30/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 07/06/1957. | ||
23/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/07/1957. Dep: 31/07/1957. | ||
04/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27082 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1959. Dep: 13/10/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27065 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
23/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1961. Dep: 03/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27079 (Diagram 94A) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H) | ||
08/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
25/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/01/1964. Dep: 14/02/1964. | ||
12/10/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60080 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |