|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 24/11/1924 | 01/12/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 21/10/1925 | 22/10/1925 | 2 days | Light Repair | For naming Named SHOTOVER |
||
Gateshead Works | 29/03/1926 | 09/04/1926 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 29/06/1926 | 23/07/1926 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 14/09/1926 | 19/01/1927 | 128 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1927 | 16/02/1928 | 97 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1928 | 20/04/1928 | 8 days | Unclassified | Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
Darlington Works | 25/10/1928 | 29/11/1928 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/02/1929 | 08/02/1929 | 3 days | Special | Valves |
||
Darlington Works | 27/02/1929 | 27/02/1929 | 1 day | Special | Tender change Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 94 days | General | ACFI fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1929 | 24/10/1929 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 25/11/1929 | 29/11/1929 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/04/1930 | 16/05/1930 | 36 days | Light Repair | Alteration to ACFI pump |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1931 | 27/03/1931 | 51 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 09/10/1931 | 26/10/1931 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1932 | 20/10/1932 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1933 | 31/03/1933 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/07/1933 | 02/08/1933 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 09/03/1934 | 16/03/1934 | 8 days | Unclassified | Alteration to ACFI pump Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1934 | 22/06/1934 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 18/09/1934 | 03/10/1934 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/10/1934 | 06/12/1934 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1935 | 25/01/1936 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1936 | 28/10/1936 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 8224 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1937 | 30/10/1937 | 30 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1938 | 13/05/1938 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1938 | 01/09/1938 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/12/1938 | 04/02/1939 | 46 days | General | ACFI removed Tender number 5280 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 23 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/06/1941 | 04/07/1941 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1942 | 07/02/1942 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1943 | 25/09/1943 | 26 days | General | Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/04/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 50 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1946 | 30/05/1946 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9514 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1947 | 31/05/1947 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1948 | 03/06/1948 | 52 days | General | Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60081 |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/08/1949 | 14/10/1949 | 51 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Darlington Works | 13/09/1950 | 13/09/1950 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/05/1951 | 06/07/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1952 | 25/04/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1953 | 12/02/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1954 | 08/06/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 27054 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1955 | 16/09/1955 | 60 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1956 | 02/08/1956 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/12/1956 | 01/02/1957 | 45 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1957 | 05/09/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1958 | 31/10/1958 | 73 days | General | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/03/1959 | 19/03/1959 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/09/1960 | 15/10/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2580 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23118 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
24/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1924. Dep: 01/12/1924. | ||
21/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/10/1925. Dep: 22/10/1925. Work undertaken: For naming Named SHOTOVER |
||
29/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1926. Dep: 09/04/1926. | ||
29/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/06/1926. Dep: 23/07/1926. | ||
14/09/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1926. Dep: 19/01/1927. | ||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 16/02/1928. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8029 (Diagram 94HP) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
13/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1928. Dep: 20/04/1928. Work undertaken: Tender number 5326 (LNER Corridor) attached. |
||
29/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
25/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928. | ||
06/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Special) - Arr: 06/02/1929. Dep: 08/02/1929. Work undertaken: Valves |
||
27/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Special) - Arr: 27/02/1929. Dep: 27/02/1929. Work undertaken: Tender change Tender number 5290 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
18/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. Work undertaken: ACFI fitted |
||
14/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/10/1929. Dep: 24/10/1929. | ||
25/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1929. Dep: 29/11/1929. | ||
05/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
11/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1930. Dep: 16/05/1930. Work undertaken: Alteration to ACFI pump |
||
05/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1931. Dep: 27/03/1931. | ||
09/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/10/1931. Dep: 26/10/1931. | ||
25/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1932. Dep: 20/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8079 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
17/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1933. Dep: 31/03/1933. | ||
11/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1933. Dep: 02/08/1933. | ||
09/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/03/1934. Dep: 16/03/1934. Work undertaken: Alteration to ACFI pump Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
13/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/06/1934. Dep: 22/06/1934. | ||
18/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1934. Dep: 03/10/1934. | ||
29/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1934. Dep: 06/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8080 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
06/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1935. Dep: 25/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8076 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
17/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1936. Dep: 28/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8224 (Diagram 94HP) Tender number 5286 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
01/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937. | ||
03/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1938. Dep: 13/05/1938. | ||
24/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/08/1938. Dep: 01/09/1938. | ||
21/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1938. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: ACFI removed Tender number 5280 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
02/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
28/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. | ||
03/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1941. Dep: 04/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8721 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
02/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942. | ||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
31/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1943. Dep: 25/09/1943. Work undertaken: Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
25/09/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
14/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. | ||
03/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 549 but not taken up | ||
30/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/05/1946. Dep: 30/05/1946. | ||
24/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9514 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
12/10/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 81 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. | ||
13/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1948. Dep: 03/06/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 5273 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Renumbered to BR 60081 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
25/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1949. Dep: 14/10/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
13/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 13/09/1950. Dep: 13/09/1950. | ||
30/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1951. Dep: 06/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27051 (Diagram 94A) |
||
22/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952. | ||
12/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1953. Dep: 12/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27086 (Diagram 94A) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
12/02/1953 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
30/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1954. Dep: 08/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27054 (Diagram 94A) |
||
19/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 16/09/1955. | ||
14/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/07/1956. Dep: 02/08/1956. | ||
19/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1956. Dep: 01/02/1957. | ||
23/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1957. Dep: 05/09/1957. | ||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 31/10/1958. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
17/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1959. Dep: 19/03/1959. | ||
10/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1960. Dep: 15/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29283 (Diagram 107) |
||
01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60081 from Neville Hill (55H) |