|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gateshead Works | 06/11/1925 | 11/11/1925 | 6 days | Light Repair | For naming Named NEIL GOW |
||
Darlington Works | 05/10/1926 | 08/02/1927 | 127 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/05/1927 | 12/07/1927 | 48 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 09/01/1928 | 11/01/1928 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 11/10/1928 | 04/01/1929 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 27/05/1929 | 16/07/1929 | 51 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1930 | 05/03/1930 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/07/1931 | 08/08/1931 | 16 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/03/1932 | 07/05/1932 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1932 | 23/12/1932 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1933 | 23/02/1933 | 24 days | Heavy | New tyres |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 52 days | General | Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Darlington Works | 30/06/1933 | 14/07/1933 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1934 | 20/06/1934 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/05/1935 | 29/05/1935 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7780 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1936 | 26/06/1936 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1937 | 01/07/1937 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/09/1939 | 12/10/1939 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1940 | 16/02/1940 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/04/1941 | 22/04/1941 | 15 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/12/1942 | 15/01/1943 | 32 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9212 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1943 | 13/05/1943 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/09/1943 | 26/09/1943 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/11/1944 | 16/12/1944 | 36 days | General | Tender number 5226 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1945 | 17/04/1945 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 36 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 82 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1948 | 29/05/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to BR 60082 |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/09/1950 | 02/10/1950 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/10/1950 | 24/11/1950 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/02/1952 | 28/03/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1954 | 17/03/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1955 | 11/06/1955 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1955 | 29/11/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 59 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1958 | 21/03/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1959 | 18/09/1959 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1961 | 25/08/1961 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1962 | 22/11/1962 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Stripping) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/11/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2581 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23119 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
06/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1925. Dep: 11/11/1925. Work undertaken: For naming Named NEIL GOW |
||
05/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1926. Dep: 08/02/1927. | ||
26/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/05/1927. Dep: 12/07/1927. | ||
09/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1928. Dep: 11/01/1928. | ||
11/10/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1928. Dep: 04/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7804 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
27/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/05/1929. Dep: 16/07/1929. | ||
12/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
03/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1930. Dep: 05/03/1930. | ||
24/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931. | ||
08/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7796 (Diagram 94) |
||
23/11/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1932. Dep: 23/12/1932. | ||
31/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 31/01/1933. Dep: 23/02/1933. Work undertaken: New tyres |
||
27/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
30/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1933. Dep: 14/07/1933. | ||
12/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 20/06/1934. | ||
10/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/05/1935. Dep: 29/05/1935. | ||
01/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7780 (Diagram 94) |
||
18/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1936. Dep: 26/06/1936. | ||
28/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1937. Dep: 01/07/1937. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7786 (Diagram 94) |
||
14/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1939. Dep: 12/10/1939. | ||
03/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 16/02/1940. | ||
08/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1941. Dep: 22/04/1941. | ||
15/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/12/1942. Dep: 15/01/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 9212 (Diagram 94A) Tender number 5272 (GNR 5,000g) attached. Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
15/01/1943 | Livery | Change of livery to Wartime unlined black | ||
06/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/05/1943. Dep: 13/05/1943. | ||
13/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1943. Dep: 26/09/1943. | ||
11/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 16/12/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 5226 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
10/04/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1945. Dep: 17/04/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 550 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 82 |
||
05/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1948. Dep: 29/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8078 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Renumbered to BR 60082 |
||
13/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
08/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8226 (Diagram 94HP) Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. |
||
24/09/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
27/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1950. Dep: 02/10/1950. | ||
23/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1950. Dep: 24/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27014 (Diagram 94A) |
||
28/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1952. Dep: 28/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27074 (Diagram 94A) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
22/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
16/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1954. Dep: 17/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27000 (Diagram 94HP) Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive |
||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 11/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
10/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1955. Dep: 29/11/1955. | ||
06/05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
05/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/09/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. | ||
14/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1958. Dep: 21/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27015 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
07/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1959. Dep: 18/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27078 (Diagram 94A) Double Chimney fitted |
||
08/05/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A) | ||
16/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
19/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29310 (Diagram 107) Trough deflectors fitted |
||
25/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
09/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
13/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/11/1962. Dep: 22/11/1962. | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60082 from Gateshead (52A) |