|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 06/01/1925 | 12/01/1925 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/11/1925 | 19/11/1925 | 3 days | Light Repair | For naming Named SIR HUGO |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1927 | 30/06/1927 | 171 days | General | |||
Gateshead Works | 26/01/1928 | 01/02/1928 | 7 days | Light Repair | Valves re-set |
||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1928 | 20/06/1928 | 64 days | Heavy | Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
Gateshead Works | 26/11/1928 | 29/11/1928 | 4 days | Intermediate | Valves re-set |
||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1929 | 11/04/1929 | 92 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1929 | 19/02/1930 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1931 | 17/07/1931 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1932 | 20/08/1932 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1933 | 17/02/1933 | 8 days | Heavy | New tyres |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 45 days | General | Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1934 | 19/10/1934 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/10/1935 | 04/12/1935 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 7704 (Diagram 94) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1936 | 09/12/1936 | 34 days | General | Tender number 5282 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1937 | 06/03/1937 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/04/1937 | 01/05/1937 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1937 | 05/08/1937 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 21/10/1937 | 08/11/1937 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/01/1938 | 11/02/1938 | 40 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1938 | 12/05/1938 | 13 days | Unclassified | Right Driving box hot |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1939 | 27/01/1939 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1939 | 20/04/1939 | 46 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1940 | 10/05/1940 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1941 | 17/12/1941 | 44 days | Heavy | Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1943 | 01/10/1943 | 26 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 39 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 9513 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1947 | 25/10/1947 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 39 days | General | Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60083 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/02/1951 | 15/03/1951 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1952 | 02/09/1952 | 36 days | General | Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1954 | 12/03/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1955 | 08/07/1955 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1956 | 12/12/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1957 | 10/04/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1959 | 02/09/1959 | 16 days | Light Casual | Double Chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1960 | 12/02/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1961 | 11/05/1961 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1962 | 08/02/1962 | 35 days | General | Trough deflectors fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/05/1949 | Darlington Works | New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. | SLS/194907 |
23/04/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2390/1, D3452, E3056/61-5. Stripping Road: D2402, D3152, D3487, 60033/8/9/64/83/8/95/8, 61814/49, 62049, 68945/90, 70010/35. Scrap Road: 64208/23/36, 64804/74/82, 68903/16/27/70/81, Crimpsall: 43149, 61384, 70001. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60143, 70053, 73012. Erecting Shop: D3445/89, D5573, D8217, 13252, 13326, 43126/44, 60020/40/63/8/75/90, 60126, 60520/8, 61162, 61205/11, 61363, 61897, 62025/42/60, 63985. Outside Erecting Shop: 60015, 61927, 62011. Paint Shop: D341, D2389, D5695, E3059/60, 60047/67, 60141, 60536, 61094, 73065. Works Shunters: DEPT10, DEPT11. | SLS/196106 |
13/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. | SLS/196202 |
28/01/1962 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D5643, D8213, E3072-6. Stripping Road: D4055/63, 60129, 60853, 61285, 61315, 63630, 73036. Crimpsall: 60119, 63962. Outside Crimpsall: 60870, 60938, 61168, 62021/34. Scrap Road: 68900 intact, 61862, 61908 being cut up. Erecting Shop: D3482, D5525/95, D5642/57, 12126/33, 13288, 60043/61/78/83/97, 60107, 60817, 61252, 61374/5, 61899, 63571, 70003/7, 76021. Erecting Shop Yard: 60062, 60112. Boiler Park: 60014/47. Weigh House: D5547. Outside Weigh House: D3289, 61223, 63924, 68928, 70006. Paint Shop: D3336, D3487, D5371/2, D5822, E3070/1, 60087, 76046. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/12/1924 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2582 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 23120 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Tender fitted: GNR 5,000g Diagram 94 boiler fitted |
||
06/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/01/1925. Dep: 12/01/1925. | ||
17/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/11/1925. Dep: 19/11/1925. Work undertaken: For naming Named SIR HUGO |
||
11/01/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1927. Dep: 30/06/1927. | ||
26/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/01/1928. Dep: 01/02/1928. Work undertaken: Valves re-set |
||
18/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/04/1928. Dep: 20/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7799 (Diagram 94) |
||
26/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/11/1928. Dep: 29/11/1928. Work undertaken: Valves re-set |
||
10/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1929. Dep: 11/04/1929. | ||
30/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1929. Dep: 19/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7803 (Diagram 94) Long Travel Valves fitted |
||
06/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 17/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7696 (Diagram 94) |
||
11/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. | ||
10/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 10/02/1933. Dep: 17/02/1933. Work undertaken: New tyres |
||
20/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Pump removed |
||
21/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1934. Dep: 19/10/1934. | ||
10/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1935. Dep: 04/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7704 (Diagram 94) |
||
06/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1936. Dep: 09/12/1936. Work undertaken: Tender number 5282 (GNR 5,000g) attached. |
||
26/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. | ||
26/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/04/1937. Dep: 01/05/1937. | ||
05/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 05/08/1937. Dep: 05/08/1937. | ||
21/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1937. Dep: 08/11/1937. | ||
03/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1938. Dep: 11/02/1938. | ||
30/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/04/1938. Dep: 12/05/1938. Work undertaken: Right Driving box hot |
||
27/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 27/01/1939. Dep: 27/01/1939. | ||
06/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1939. Dep: 20/04/1939. | ||
05/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1940. Dep: 10/05/1940. | ||
17/06/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD) | ||
26/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
04/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 04/11/1941. Dep: 17/12/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class A3 Boiler number 8027 (Diagram 94HP) Painted Wartime unlined black |
||
06/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1943. Dep: 01/10/1943. | ||
07/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 551 but not taken up | ||
15/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9513 (Diagram 94A) Painted Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining |
||
17/08/1946 | Livery | Change of livery to Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 83 | ||
15/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947. | ||
20/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. Work undertaken: Painted BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. Renumbered to BR 60083 |
||
28/05/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue for steam locomotives, with broad black, inlaid with thin white lining. | ||
02/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1951. Dep: 15/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27034 (Diagram 94A) |
||
29/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1952. Dep: 02/09/1952. Work undertaken: Right Hand Drive to Left Hand Drive Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
02/09/1952 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
10/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1954. Dep: 12/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27016 (Diagram 94A) |
||
26/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27035 (Diagram 94A) |
||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 12/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27033 (Diagram 94A) To 75% Cut-off |
||
28/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/03/1957. Dep: 10/04/1957. | ||
07/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27062 (Diagram 94HP) |
||
18/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1959. Dep: 02/09/1959. Work undertaken: Double Chimney fitted |
||
05/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1960. Dep: 12/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 27030 (Diagram 94A) |
||
21/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/04/1961. Dep: 11/05/1961. | ||
05/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1962. Dep: 08/02/1962. Work undertaken: Trough deflectors fitted |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
18/05/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60083 from Gateshead (52A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |