Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 723 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2838 Week
» 25344 Month
» 328534 Year
» 1550099 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 525 on 24/12/1947
British Railways 60525   25/08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
24/12/1947 A.H. PEPPERCORN

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 24/12/1947
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 25/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 2016
To Service Wed 24/12/1947 to Doncaster (DON)
Withdrawal Wed 27/03/1963 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Scrapping Sun 14/04/1963
Service Life 15 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Into St Rollox for cutting up 14/4/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DON Doncaster (New) on 24/12/1947
NWE New England on 12/12/1948
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 28/08/1949
   Withdrawn on 27/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW DON Doncaster on 24/12/1947
ALLOC NWE New England w/e 18/12/1948
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 03/09/1949
WDN   on 27/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/12/1947 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 9645)
20/03/1953 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29849)
02/11/1954 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29840)
11/04/1956 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29834)
25/03/1958 Diagram 117 boiler fitted (number 29777)
23/09/1959 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29816)
30/11/1961 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29826)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 13/07/1949 25/08/1949 44 days General
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
Renumbered to BR 60525
 
Doncaster Works 20/06/1951 27/07/1951 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 18/04/1952 19/04/1952 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 18/02/1953 20/03/1953 31 days General
Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 25/11/1953 05/12/1953 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 04/10/1954 02/11/1954 30 days General
Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 03/03/1956 11/04/1956 40 days General
Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 11/06/1956 21/06/1956 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 26/03/1957 24/04/1957 30 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/02/1958 25/03/1958 33 days General
Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117)
 
Inverurie Works 07/05/1959 14/05/1959 8 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/08/1959 23/09/1959 36 days General
Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 28/09/1959 30/09/1959 3 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 24/04/1961 07/06/1961 45 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 29/09/1961 30/11/1961 63 days General
Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 29/01/1963 27/02/1963 30 days Light Casual  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/05/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shops) New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196107
01/10/1961 Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. SLS/196111
29/10/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. SLS/196112
12/11/1961 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: 13166, D8239, E3069-75; Outside New Erecting Shop: D5583, 61042, 61317, 73000/165. Stripping Road: 60015, 63973/87, 70041. Crimpsal: D3646. 43151, 60108; Outside Crimpsall: 60003/29/149, 73024 (89A). Erecting Shop: D3153, D3447/8, D3476-8, D5520, D5609/37/66, D5802, 43160, 60023/65/127/525, 70000/8, 73054; Outside Erecting Shop: 60154, 76045. Weigh House: D366; Outside Weigh House: 61389. Paint Shop: E3068, D3254, D5050, D5360, D5606, D5822 (Brush 323/61), D9017 (EE2922, V574 of 1961), 60021/162, 62037, 63980, 70013. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. SLS/196112
10/01/1962 Doncaster MPD Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed: D3447, D5823 (new), 43160, 60525, 62007, 63969, 70000. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/12/1947 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 525, name: A.H. PEPPERCORN
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2016
Allocated to Doncaster (DON)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Diagram 118 boiler fitted
   
12/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
13/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1949. Dep: 25/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
Renumbered to BR 60525
   
28/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
20/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/06/1951. Dep: 27/07/1951.    
18/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952.    
18/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1953. Dep: 20/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29849 (Diagram 118)
   
25/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953.    
04/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 02/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29840 (Diagram 118)
   
03/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 11/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29834 (Diagram 118)
   
11/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1956. Dep: 21/06/1956.    
26/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1957. Dep: 24/04/1957.    
21/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 25/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117)
   
07/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/05/1959. Dep: 14/05/1959.    
19/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1959. Dep: 23/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29816 (Diagram 118)
   
28/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 30/09/1959.    
24/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1961. Dep: 07/06/1961.    
29/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118)
   
29/01/1963 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1963. Dep: 27/02/1963.    
27/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 60525 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev