Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3282 Week
» 13452 Month
» 291248 Year
» 1175629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 60532   25/03/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
25/03/1948 BLUE PETER

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
LNER Apple Green Black and White 25/03/1948
BR Brunswick Green Orange and Black 28/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Peppercorn
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 2023
To Service Sat 25/03/1948 to York (North) (YK)
Withdrawal Sat 31/12/1966 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for preservation 21/8/68

Allocations
Code Name From Date
YK York (North) (New) 25/03/1948
64B Haymarket 27/11/1949
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 07/01/1951
62B Dundee Tay Bridge 19/06/1961
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 04/12/1966
   Withdrawn 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW YK York (North) 25/03/1948
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 62B Dundee Tay Bridge 4w/e 01/07/1961
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/03/1948 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 9652)
28/09/1949 Double Chimney fitted
04/04/1951 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29830)
01/03/1957 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29801)
26/07/1962 Diagram 118 boiler fitted (number 29871)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Doncaster Works 11/08/1949 28/09/1949 49 days General
Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted
Double Chimney fitted
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
 
Doncaster Works 28/02/1951 04/04/1951 36 days General
Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 12/04/1951 17/04/1951 6 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/08/1951 06/09/1951 24 days Light Casual
After derailment
 
Doncaster Works 11/06/1952 23/07/1952 43 days Heavy Intermediate  
Cowlairs Works 28/01/1953 29/01/1953 2 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 19/11/1953 19/12/1953 31 days General  
Doncaster Works 16/03/1955 22/04/1955 38 days General  
Doncaster Works 19/07/1955 26/07/1955 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 08/02/1956 15/02/1956 8 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 21/03/1956 04/04/1956 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 28/01/1957 01/03/1957 33 days General
Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118)
 
Doncaster Works 24/07/1958 28/08/1958 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 29/12/1959 04/02/1960 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 10/08/1960 24/09/1960 46 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/12/1960 05/01/1961 23 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 10/03/1961 15/04/1961 37 days Light Casual  
Cowlairs Works 01/12/1961 14/12/1961 14 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/06/1962 26/07/1962 51 days General
Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118)
 
Inverurie Works 14/04/1964 15/04/1964 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 04/02/1965 18/05/1965 104 days Light Intermediate  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
25/03/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 60532, name: BLUE PETER
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2023
Allocated to York (North) (YK)
Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining
Diagram 118 boiler fitted
   
11/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1949. Dep: 28/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted
Double Chimney fitted
Painted Brunswick green with orange and black lining.
   
27/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
07/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 04/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29830 (Diagram 118)
   
12/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/04/1951. Dep: 17/04/1951.    
14/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1951. Dep: 06/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
11/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 23/07/1952.    
28/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 29/01/1953.    
19/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953.    
16/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1955. Dep: 22/04/1955.    
19/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1955. Dep: 26/07/1955.    
08/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/02/1956. Dep: 15/02/1956.    
21/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/03/1956. Dep: 04/04/1956.    
28/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1957. Dep: 01/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29801 (Diagram 118)
   
24/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/07/1958. Dep: 28/08/1958.    
29/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 04/02/1960.    
10/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/08/1960. Dep: 24/09/1960.    
14/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 05/01/1961.    
10/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/03/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961.    
19/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B)    
01/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/12/1961. Dep: 14/12/1961.    
06/06/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1962. Dep: 26/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118)
   
14/04/1964 Works Visit Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/04/1964. Dep: 15/04/1964.    
04/02/1965 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/02/1965. Dep: 18/05/1965.    
04/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 60532 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
14/04/1968 Sightings Thornton Junction: Stored at Thornton Jct. RCTS 6/1968 Link

prev prev