|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1949 | 07/12/1949 | 38 days | General | Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1950 | 25/05/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1950 | 14/06/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1950 | 26/07/1950 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1950 | 27/10/1950 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1951 | 19/11/1951 | 35 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 29857 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1953 | 08/10/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1954 | 31/12/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1956 | 04/05/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1956 | 15/05/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/01/1957 | 21/01/1957 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1957 | 07/03/1957 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1958 | 14/02/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29806 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1958 | 11/08/1958 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/10/1959 | 04/11/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1961 | 22/09/1961 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1961 | 19/10/1961 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1961 | 1 day | Weighing | ||||
Doncaster Works | 08/06/1962 | 10/08/1962 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 29848 (Diagram 118) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Doncaster Works | New 'A2' 4-6-2's ex Doncaster are as follows: Nos. 60533 Happy Knight, 60534 Irish Elegance and 60535 Hornets Beauty. | SLS/194806 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/04/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60533, name: HAPPY KNIGHT Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2024 Allocated to New England (NWE) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
19/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
09/1949 | Modification | Modification: Double Chimney fitted | ||
31/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 07/12/1949. Work undertaken: Multi-valve regulator & double chimney fitted Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
07/12/1949 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) | ||
30/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
23/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1950. Dep: 25/05/1950. | ||
12/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950. | ||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
09/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
19/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/07/1950. Dep: 26/07/1950. | ||
28/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1950. Dep: 27/10/1950. | ||
16/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1951. Dep: 19/11/1951. | ||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29857 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 08/10/1953. | ||
20/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
25/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1954. Dep: 31/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29815 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1956. Dep: 04/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29822 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 15/05/1956. | ||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
21/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/01/1957. Dep: 21/01/1957. | ||
22/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/02/1957. Dep: 07/03/1957. | ||
15/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
11/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1958. Dep: 14/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29806 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
18/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1958. Dep: 11/08/1958. | ||
19/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/08/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
01/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1959. Dep: 04/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29862 (Diagram 118) |
||
10/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/09/1961. Dep: 22/09/1961. | ||
04/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/10/1961. Dep: 19/10/1961. | ||
10/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 10/11/1961. | ||
08/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1962. Dep: 10/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29848 (Diagram 118) |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
15/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60533 from New England (34E) | ||
02/09/1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |