|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1948 | 28/09/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/04/1949 | 14/04/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/05/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 16 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/10/1951 | 30/11/1951 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/03/1953 | 02/04/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/05/1954 | 02/07/1954 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1955 | 14/03/1955 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1955 | 02/02/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1957 | 20/12/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1959 | 28/04/1959 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 10590 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1960 | 29/09/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1962 | 05/05/1962 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/05/1948 | To Service | To service as British Railways Number 60535, name: HORNET'S BEAUTY Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2026 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Livery applied: Apple green with white lined black boiler bands, black frames and cylinders with red lining Diagram 118 boiler fitted |
||
15/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/09/1948. Dep: 28/09/1948. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 14/04/1949. | ||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY) | ||
04/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
19/05/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 30/11/1951. | ||
22/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. | ||
04/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29853 (Diagram 118) |
||
24/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954. | ||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 14/03/1955. | ||
29/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1955. Dep: 02/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10599 (Diagram 118) |
||
25/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
19/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1959. Dep: 28/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10590 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 29/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29871 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
27/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1962. Dep: 05/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60535 from Polmadie (66A) | ||
07/1965 | Scrapped | Scrapped |