|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 05/06/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1946 | 06/07/1946 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1946 | 22/07/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/08/1946 | 08/08/1946 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/08/1946 | 23/08/1946 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1946 | 24/09/1946 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1946 | 25/10/1946 | 24 days | Light Repair | Special overhaul and fittings for Dynamometer Car tests |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1947 | 30/04/1947 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1948 | 26/02/1948 | 41 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E500 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1948 | 10/03/1948 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1949 | 07/10/1949 | 67 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60500 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1950 | 31/03/1950 | 23 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1950 | 26/05/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1951 | 13/07/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1952 | 13/02/1952 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/11/1952 | 01/01/1953 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1953 | 18/06/1953 | 51 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1954 | 24/11/1954 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1956 | 05/07/1956 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1956 | 15/12/1956 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1958 | 10/04/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/08/1959 | 29/09/1959 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1960 | 18/03/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1960 | 06/05/1960 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1962 | 30/03/1962 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1963 | 16/05/1963 | 25 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | N.E. Area: During the five weeks from 29th October, Dynamometer Car tests were carried out on the 9.45 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool (Lime St.) E.P. between Newcastle and Leeds, the return to Newcastle being on the 1.50 p.m. ex. Leeds (the normal working). The locos. concerned were 'A.2' 500 Edward Thompson and 'V.2' 959. The latter loco. had presumably recently been through Darlington Works, as she worked the 1.57 p.m. Darlington-Leeds (running-in) turn on 4/10. The exact sequence as far as the 9.45 'Liverpool' was concerned was as follows:-No. 500, with 9 bogies, including the Dynamometer Car and Buffet Car and repainted Pullman Coach 477, worked the trip on 29/10, 30/10, 5/11, 6/11, and 7/11; the same engine hauled the train on the four days 12-15/11, when the load was augmented to 14 bogie coaches. No. 959 commenced running on 19/11 with the 14-coach train, and ran the four days to 22/11; on 26/11 and 27/11 959's load was reduced to the 9-coach level; and on 28/11 and 29/11 this was increased to ten coaches. This train has been worked frequently by new 'A.2' Nos. 511/2/5. The normal load is now 9 bogies, with increases up to 13 coaches at week-ends and holiday times. Before the introduction of the new time-tables on 7/10 the normal load was 12 coaches, with regular pilot assistance from Ripon to Leeds. Now any load is taken without assistance! | SLS/194702 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
26/02/1962 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) | Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. | SLS/196204 |
10/03/1963 | Goole MPD (Stored in Works Yards) | Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. | SLS/196304 |
23/04/1963 | Doncaster Works (Stored in Works Yards) | New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 500, name: EDWARD THOMPSON Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2000 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
05/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. | ||
07/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/06/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. | ||
05/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/07/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946. | ||
20/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
22/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1946. Dep: 22/07/1946. | ||
07/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1946. Dep: 08/08/1946. | ||
21/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/08/1946. Dep: 23/08/1946. | ||
12/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
21/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/09/1946. Dep: 24/09/1946. | ||
02/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1946. Dep: 25/10/1946. Work undertaken: Special overhaul and fittings for Dynamometer Car tests |
||
29/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 29/04/1947. Dep: 30/04/1947. | ||
17/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1948. Dep: 26/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E500 |
||
01/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 10/03/1948. | ||
02/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1949. Dep: 07/10/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. Renumbered to BR 60500 |
||
09/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1950. Dep: 31/03/1950. | ||
12/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1950. Dep: 26/05/1950. | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
29/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1951. Dep: 13/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29783 (Diagram 117) |
||
05/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1952. Dep: 13/02/1952. | ||
25/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1952. Dep: 01/01/1953. | ||
29/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/04/1953. Dep: 18/06/1953. | ||
21/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1954. Dep: 24/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29781 (Diagram 117) |
||
22/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 05/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
06/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1956. Dep: 15/12/1956. | ||
07/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1958. Dep: 10/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29788 (Diagram 117) |
||
23/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. | ||
26/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/08/1959. Dep: 29/09/1959. | ||
12/02/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1960. Dep: 18/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29790 (Diagram 117) |
||
23/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1960. Dep: 06/05/1960. | ||
15/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1962. Dep: 30/03/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29819 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. | ||
22/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1963. Dep: 16/05/1963. | ||
16/06/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60500 from New England (34E) |