Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 1020 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7409 Week
» 27851 Month
» 364697 Year
» 1586262 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3697 on 30/06/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 508   20/07/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E508   06/02/1948
British Railways 60508   26/05/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1947 DUKE OF ROTHESAY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1933
To Service Mon 30/06/1944 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 20/02/1961 off New England (34E)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 16 yrs, 7 mths , 21 dys

Notes
Notes Cut-up Doncaster Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 30/06/1944
KX Kings Cross on 25/11/1944
GOR Gorton on 10/02/1945
KX Kings Cross on 28/03/1945
35A New England on 04/06/1950
   Withdrawn on 20/02/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 35A New England m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   on 20/02/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
30/06/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3480)
25/04/1952 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29406)
16/02/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29417)
12/02/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29406)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 01/08/1944 03/08/1944 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 08/08/1944 23/08/1944 16 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 25/08/1944 13/09/1944 20 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 20/09/1944 21/09/1944 2 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 13/11/1944 22/11/1944 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 03/02/1945 10/02/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 02/05/1945 23/05/1945 22 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 07/01/1946 02/03/1946 55 days Heavy  
Darlington Works 09/11/1946 17/01/1947 70 days Light Repair
Named DUKE OF ROTHESAY
 
Darlington Works 03/05/1947 12/07/1947 71 days General  
Darlington Works 17/11/1947 06/02/1948 82 days Heavy
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E508
 
Darlington Works 01/03/1948 26/05/1948 87 days Light Repair
Renumbered to BR 60508
 
Doncaster Works 27/07/1948 24/09/1948 60 days General
After derailment
 
Doncaster Works 01/06/1949 15/06/1949 15 days Light Casual
8 wheel tender
 
Doncaster Works 10/05/1950 23/06/1950 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 24/03/1952 25/04/1952 33 days General
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 17/03/1953 02/04/1953 17 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 25/08/1953 08/10/1953 45 days General  
Doncaster Works 05/08/1954 09/08/1954 5 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 08/03/1955 06/04/1955 30 days General  
Doncaster Works 03/10/1955 11/10/1955 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 07/03/1956 16/03/1956 10 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 11/01/1957 16/02/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 26/11/1957 04/12/1957 9 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 04/02/1958 14/02/1958 11 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 30/06/1958 09/07/1958 10 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 31/12/1958 12/02/1959 44 days General
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 20/02/1961 20/02/1961 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
04/01/1959 Doncaster Works (Yard) Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. SLS/195902
29/01/1961 New England 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. SLS/196103

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
30/06/1944 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3697
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1933
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
01/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1944. Dep: 03/08/1944.    
08/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/08/1944. Dep: 23/08/1944.    
25/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/08/1944. Dep: 13/09/1944.    
20/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1944. Dep: 21/09/1944.    
13/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1944. Dep: 22/11/1944.    
25/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
03/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 10/02/1945.    
10/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX)    
02/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1945. Dep: 23/05/1945.    
07/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946.    
20/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 508    
09/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/11/1946. Dep: 17/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Named DUKE OF ROTHESAY
   
03/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 12/07/1947.    
17/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/11/1947. Dep: 06/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E508
   
01/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 26/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60508
   
27/07/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1948. Dep: 24/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
After derailment
   
01/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/06/1949. Dep: 15/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
8 wheel tender
   
10/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 23/06/1950.    
04/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to New England (35A)    
24/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 25/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
   
17/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953.    
25/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1953. Dep: 08/10/1953.    
05/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954.    
08/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 06/04/1955.    
03/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 11/10/1955.    
07/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1956. Dep: 16/03/1956.    
11/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109)
   
26/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 04/12/1957.    
04/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 14/02/1958.    
30/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 09/07/1958.    
31/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1958. Dep: 12/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
   
20/02/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 60508 from New England (34E)    
20/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 20/02/1961. Dep: 20/02/1961.    

prev prev