Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 149 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4661 Week
» 27167 Month
» 330357 Year
» 1551922 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3698 on 15/11/1944
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 509   02/05/1946
British Railways 60509   06/08/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1946 WAVERLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1944
To Service Mon 15/11/1944 to Heaton (HTN)
Withdrawal Mon 15/08/1960 off Haymarket (64B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 15 yrs , 9 mths

Notes
Notes Cut-up Doncaster Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HTN Heaton (New) on 15/11/1944
DAR Darlington on 17/11/1944
HAY Haymarket on 14/03/1945
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 04/09/1949
64B Haymarket on 25/09/1949
   Withdrawn on 15/08/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 01/10/1949
WDN   on 15/08/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
15/11/1944 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3485)
27/12/1951 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29355)
20/06/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29406)
18/12/1958 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29349)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 28/12/1944 27/02/1945 62 days Light Repair
Electric lighting fitted
 
Darlington Works 02/03/1945 05/03/1945 4 days Unclassified  
Cowlairs Works 07/07/1945 14/07/1945 8 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 15/10/1945 24/01/1946 102 days Light Repair
Reverse indicator plate and brake gear alteration
 
Darlington Works 29/01/1946 02/02/1946 5 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 10/04/1946 02/05/1946 23 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 509
 
Darlington Works 04/06/1946 18/08/1946 76 days General  
Darlington Works 19/08/1946 26/10/1946 69 days Heavy
8 wheel tender
Named WAVERLEY
 
Darlington Works 16/01/1947 01/03/1947 45 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 11/10/1947 14/10/1947 4 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 14/12/1948 18/12/1948 5 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 22/01/1949 25/02/1949 35 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/05/1949 27/05/1949 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 14/04/1950 02/06/1950 50 days General  
Doncaster Works 08/06/1950 14/06/1950 7 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 14/03/1951 13/04/1951 31 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 27/11/1951 27/12/1951 31 days General
Boiler number 29355 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 10/07/1952 28/07/1952 19 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 31/12/1952 04/02/1953 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 08/12/1953 19/01/1954 43 days Heavy Casual
After derailment at Goswick 28/10/53
 
Doncaster Works 04/05/1954 19/05/1954 16 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 05/07/1954 09/08/1954 36 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 20/10/1954 03/11/1954 15 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 06/10/1955 25/10/1955 20 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 19/12/1955 26/01/1956 39 days General  
Doncaster Works 17/05/1957 20/06/1957 35 days General
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 26/03/1958 10/04/1958 16 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 04/11/1958 18/12/1958 45 days General
Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 16/12/1959 26/01/1960 42 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 12/07/1960 12/07/1960 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 67727 and the last three are almost finished. The paint dates of Nos. 67719-21 are May, Nos. 67722-26 June and No. 67727 July. The Works' Nos. are 2037-2045, in order.
Frames are laid down for the first two 'Pacifics' and it is understood that at least twelve are expected to be completed by the end of the year.
No. 7306 the first 'G.5' to be withdrawn is in the scrap yard, together with No. 5115. A start was made on cutting-up 'C.7's' Nos. 2973 an 2982 during W/E 3/7/48 and these will be followed by No. 2954. Further engines of this class have arrived in the Works' road at the shed, and it is expected they will all be scrapped, they are as follows:-Nos. 2975, 2981, 2983, 2988 an 2995. 'J.93' No. 8488 arrived on a truck and was cut-up W/E 29/5/48. Easingwold Rly. No. 2 is still in the Works' yard in a very forlorn condition. The North Sunderland Rly. diesel Lady Armstrong has also been there for a considerable time; No. 8089 is at present working on the N.S. Rly. The frames of two ex G.N.R. 'Atlantic's' (still complete with cylinders) have been shortened and are being used back to back as a boiler wagon. 'B.1' No. 61014 is ex works painted black and fully lined, but minus name plates-the name being chalked on one side of the smokebox. Other locomotives noted painted black and fully lined include Nos. 60834, 60942, 61019 an 62751.
Locomotives ex works to July 3rd, include:-Nos. 60919, 61410, 62724, 63282/90, 63345, 65024/64, 65575, 65673, 65708/54/62/75, 65816/41, 67613/29, 68245, 68307/58/91, 68706/61, 69771/98, 69833/37, 69854/66 an 69917. Locomotives for works during the same period include:-Nos. 509, 824/98, 920, 1012/19, 2375/79, 2706/61/68, 3250/64, 5099, 5670/92, 5774, 7246/95, 7305/06, 7603/05/10/16/30/35/61/78/90, 8262/91, 8358/60/93, 8434, 9781/82, 9832/52/57/82/85/93 an 61420.
SLS/194808
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
30/04/1954 York MPD During this period the South shed was temporarily reopened while repairs were being effected to the turntable in No. 4 roundhouse at the North shed. New Standard Class 3 2-6-0's from Swindon 77002 and 77003 called at York on 17/3/54 and 19/3/54 respectively en route for Darlington. The following Ll 2-6-4T's called at York en route from the south to Darlington Works for repair: 67792 (34E)-19/3/54, 67718 (34E)-29/3/54, 67756-9/4/54. On this latter date 67753 (34B) passed through York resplendent ex-Darlington Works, and likewise 67764 (53B) and 67795 (34E) on 20/4/54. J71 68296 (53A) and 68242 (53A) passed through York ex-Darlington Works on 19/3/54 and 12/4/54 respectively en route for Hull. On 9/4/54 J71 68238 (20D) was at York with rods 'down' while proceeding from Normanton to Darlington Works, and similarly 69104 (53A) from Hull to Darlington on 20/4/54. Another unusual visitor was 60509 (64B) en route from the Scottish Region to Doncaster Works on 28/4/54. 90439 (35A) was under repair at York shed on 29/3/54. SLS/195406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
15/11/1944 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3698
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1944
Allocated to Heaton (HTN)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
17/11/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
28/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1944. Dep: 27/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Electric lighting fitted
   
02/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1945. Dep: 05/03/1945.    
14/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HAY)    
07/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945.    
15/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1945. Dep: 24/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Reverse indicator plate and brake gear alteration
   
29/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946.    
10/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 02/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 509
   
04/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1946. Dep: 18/08/1946.    
19/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/08/1946. Dep: 26/10/1946.
Work undertaken:
8 wheel tender
Named WAVERLEY
   
16/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947.    
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 14/10/1947.    
06/08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 60509    
14/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.    
22/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/01/1949. Dep: 25/02/1949.    
12/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1949. Dep: 27/05/1949.    
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
14/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1950. Dep: 02/06/1950.    
08/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 14/06/1950.    
14/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951.    
27/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 27/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29355 (Diagram 109)
   
10/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/07/1952. Dep: 28/07/1952.    
31/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/12/1952. Dep: 04/02/1953.    
08/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1953. Dep: 19/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
After derailment at Goswick 28/10/53
   
04/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/05/1954. Dep: 19/05/1954.    
05/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/07/1954. Dep: 09/08/1954.    
20/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954.    
06/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 25/10/1955.    
19/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1955. Dep: 26/01/1956.    
17/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1957. Dep: 20/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29406 (Diagram 109)
   
26/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/03/1958. Dep: 10/04/1958.    
04/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 18/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109)
   
16/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1959. Dep: 26/01/1960.    
12/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/07/1960. Dep: 12/07/1960.    
15/08/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 60509 from Haymarket (64B)    

prev prev