Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 1027 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7416 Week
» 27858 Month
» 364704 Year
» 1586269 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 3699 on 13/01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) S10   07/06/1946
British Railways 60510   28/04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/1948 ROBERT THE BRUCE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer E. Thompson
Class A2
Company History LNER
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1950
To Service Mon 13/01/1945 to Darlington (DAR)
Withdrawal Mon 21/11/1960 off St Margarets (64A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Cut-up Doncaster Works

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DAR Darlington (New) on 13/01/1945
64B Haymarket on 01/03/1949
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill on 04/09/1949
64B Haymarket on 25/09/1949
64A St Margarets on 13/07/1960
   Withdrawn on 21/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC ABD Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC HAY Haymarket w/e 01/10/1949
WDN   on 21/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/01/1945 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 3494)
20/05/1953 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29349)
27/11/1957 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29371)
24/07/1959 Diagram 109 boiler fitted (number 29417)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Darlington Works 23/01/1945 07/02/1945 16 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 22/02/1945 24/02/1945 3 days Unclassified  
Darlington Works 03/07/1945 20/07/1945 18 days Light Repair
Electric lighting fitted
 
Darlington Works 23/04/1946 07/06/1946 46 days Heavy
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number S10
 
Cowlairs Works 05/09/1946 07/09/1946 3 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 20/09/1946 21/09/1946 2 days Light Repair  
Cowlairs Works 01/11/1946 02/11/1946 2 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 29/01/1947 08/03/1947 39 days Light Repair  
Darlington Works 21/02/1948 28/04/1948 68 days General
Renumbered to BR 60510
Named ROBERT THE BRUCE
 
Darlington Works 31/12/1948 27/01/1949 28 days Light Repair  
Doncaster Works 05/08/1949 02/09/1949 29 days Heavy Casual
8 wheel tender
 
Cowlairs Works 02/04/1950 07/04/1950 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 22/05/1950 14/07/1950 54 days General  
Cowlairs Works 12/11/1951 17/11/1951 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 24/01/1952 29/02/1952 37 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 06/02/1953 17/02/1953 12 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 21/04/1953 20/05/1953 30 days General
Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 28/06/1954 04/08/1954 38 days Heavy Intermediate  
Doncaster Works 12/07/1955 25/07/1955 14 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 11/06/1956 31/07/1956 51 days General  
Doncaster Works 22/10/1957 27/11/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 31/01/1958 05/02/1958 6 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 02/07/1958 07/07/1958 6 days Light Casual  
Doncaster Works 11/08/1958 22/08/1958 12 days Unclassified  
Doncaster Works 15/06/1959 24/07/1959 40 days General
Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109)
 
Doncaster Works 17/10/1960 17/10/1960 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/01/1945 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3699
Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1950
Allocated to Darlington (DAR)
Diagram 109 boiler fitted
   
23/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1945. Dep: 07/02/1945.    
22/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.    
03/07/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1945. Dep: 20/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Electric lighting fitted
   
23/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number S10
   
05/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946.    
20/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.    
01/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946.    
29/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.    
21/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 28/04/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 60510
Named ROBERT THE BRUCE
   
31/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 27/01/1949.    
01/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
05/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
8 wheel tender
   
04/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
25/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
02/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 07/04/1950.    
22/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 14/07/1950.    
12/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951.    
24/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952.    
06/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953.    
21/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109)
   
28/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 04/08/1954.    
12/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1955. Dep: 25/07/1955.    
11/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1956. Dep: 31/07/1956.    
22/10/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 27/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109)
   
31/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958.    
02/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1958. Dep: 07/07/1958.    
11/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958.    
15/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 24/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109)
   
13/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (64A)    
17/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 17/10/1960.    
21/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 60510 from St Margarets (64A)    

prev prev