|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 23/01/1945 | 07/02/1945 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 22/02/1945 | 24/02/1945 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1945 | 20/07/1945 | 18 days | Light Repair | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1946 | 07/06/1946 | 46 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number S10 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 05/09/1946 | 07/09/1946 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1946 | 21/09/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/11/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 29/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 21/02/1948 | 28/04/1948 | 68 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60510 Named ROBERT THE BRUCE |
||
Darlington Works | 31/12/1948 | 27/01/1949 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | 8 wheel tender |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1950 | 07/04/1950 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/05/1950 | 14/07/1950 | 54 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1951 | 17/11/1951 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/01/1952 | 29/02/1952 | 37 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1953 | 17/02/1953 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/06/1954 | 04/08/1954 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/07/1955 | 25/07/1955 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1956 | 31/07/1956 | 51 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1957 | 27/11/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1958 | 05/02/1958 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1958 | 07/07/1958 | 6 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1958 | 22/08/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1959 | 24/07/1959 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1960 | 17/10/1960 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1948 | Darlington Works | 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. | SLS/194806 |
31/12/1948 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. | SLS/194902 |
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/01/1945 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3699 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1950 Allocated to Darlington (DAR) Diagram 109 boiler fitted |
||
23/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/01/1945. Dep: 07/02/1945. | ||
22/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945. | ||
03/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/07/1945. Dep: 20/07/1945. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
23/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/04/1946. Dep: 07/06/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number S10 |
||
05/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/09/1946. Dep: 07/09/1946. | ||
20/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/09/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946. | ||
01/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. | ||
29/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
21/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1948. Dep: 28/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60510 Named ROBERT THE BRUCE |
||
31/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 27/01/1949. | ||
01/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
05/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. Work undertaken: 8 wheel tender |
||
04/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
25/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) | ||
02/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/04/1950. Dep: 07/04/1950. | ||
22/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1950. Dep: 14/07/1950. | ||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 17/11/1951. | ||
24/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 29/02/1952. | ||
06/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/02/1953. Dep: 17/02/1953. | ||
21/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29349 (Diagram 109) |
||
28/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/06/1954. Dep: 04/08/1954. | ||
12/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/07/1955. Dep: 25/07/1955. | ||
11/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1956. Dep: 31/07/1956. | ||
22/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1957. Dep: 27/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29371 (Diagram 109) |
||
31/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1958. Dep: 05/02/1958. | ||
02/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/07/1958. Dep: 07/07/1958. | ||
11/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1958. Dep: 22/08/1958. | ||
15/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1959. Dep: 24/07/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29417 (Diagram 109) |
||
13/07/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
17/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 17/10/1960. | ||
21/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60510 from St Margarets (64A) |