|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 2 days | Light Repair | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1947 | 06/02/1947 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 07/08/1947 | 23/08/1947 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1948 | 16/04/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60511 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/11/1949 | 23/12/1949 | 33 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/07/1951 | 21/08/1951 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1952 | 16/12/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29835 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1954 | 12/04/1954 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1954 | 23/12/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/03/1956 | 14/04/1956 | 41 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/01/1958 | 07/02/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/08/1958 | 04/09/1958 | 8 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/07/1959 | 18/08/1959 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 29857 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/08/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | N.E. Area: During the five weeks from 29th October, Dynamometer Car tests were carried out on the 9.45 a.m. Newcastle-Liverpool (Lime St.) E.P. between Newcastle and Leeds, the return to Newcastle being on the 1.50 p.m. ex. Leeds (the normal working). The locos. concerned were 'A.2' 500 Edward Thompson and 'V.2' 959. The latter loco. had presumably recently been through Darlington Works, as she worked the 1.57 p.m. Darlington-Leeds (running-in) turn on 4/10. The exact sequence as far as the 9.45 'Liverpool' was concerned was as follows:-No. 500, with 9 bogies, including the Dynamometer Car and Buffet Car and repainted Pullman Coach 477, worked the trip on 29/10, 30/10, 5/11, 6/11, and 7/11; the same engine hauled the train on the four days 12-15/11, when the load was augmented to 14 bogie coaches. No. 959 commenced running on 19/11 with the 14-coach train, and ran the four days to 22/11; on 26/11 and 27/11 959's load was reduced to the 9-coach level; and on 28/11 and 29/11 this was increased to ten coaches. This train has been worked frequently by new 'A.2' Nos. 511/2/5. The normal load is now 9 bogies, with increases up to 13 coaches at week-ends and holiday times. Before the introduction of the new time-tables on 7/10 the normal load was 12 coaches, with regular pilot assistance from Ripon to Leeds. Now any load is taken without assistance! | SLS/194702 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
19/08/1947 | Darlington Works | The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. | SLS/194710 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
30/04/1948 | General | Amongst locomotives carrying cast smokebox numberplates, the following have been noted: Nos. 60007/33/54, 60107, 60511 an 60866. | SLS/194806 |
11/08/1959 | Doncaster Works (Paint shop) | Paint shop- D223, D2066, D2265, D3060, 60075/511, 61825, 73010/165; Weigh-house- D224, D2065, 60006, 61211, 62054, 63934; New Erecting shop- D2067/8/9, E5010-4, D3070, D3137/49, D3230/2/3I; Crimpsall shops-No. 2 Bay- 12113, 13254, D3072, 61185, 61809/62/73/903/27, 63930/48, 68904/65; Crimpsall shops-No. 4 Bay- 60016/20/77/90/4/129/50/536; 61210, 62057 an 63957 on south side with Service loco 4; Stripping-60038/82, 61813/39, 63965, 70000, 73163/6. Awaiting cut up- 61661, 64181/258, 68973, 69515/7/45/8/76/84; Being cut up-60700, 61627, 64246, 69536/9. For condition reports- 61623, 68974, 69526/41/91. In yard D3229 an 11160. | SLS/195909 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/07/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 511, name: AIRBORNE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2002 Allocated to Gateshead (GHD) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
23/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
06/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 06/02/1947. Dep: 06/02/1947. | ||
07/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/08/1947. Dep: 23/08/1947. | ||
01/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 16/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60511 |
||
21/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1949. Dep: 23/12/1949. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
18/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1951. Dep: 21/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29847 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1952. Dep: 16/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29835 (Diagram 118) |
||
16/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/03/1954. Dep: 12/04/1954. | ||
23/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1954. Dep: 23/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29851 (Diagram 118) |
||
05/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1956. Dep: 14/04/1956. | ||
09/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1958. Dep: 07/02/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29818 (Diagram 118) |
||
28/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1958. Dep: 04/09/1958. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
15/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1959. Dep: 18/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29857 (Diagram 118) |
||
22/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
01/10/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
12/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60511 from Tweedmouth (52D) |