|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1947 | 24/09/1947 | 62 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/02/1948 | 17/02/1948 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1948 | 03/11/1948 | 38 days | General | Renumbered to BR 60513 |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/07/1950 | 15/08/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/09/1950 | 19/10/1950 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 10 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1953 | 27/05/1953 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/03/1954 | 31/03/1954 | 30 days | General | Lipped chimney fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/08/1955 | 04/10/1955 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/09/1956 | 10/10/1956 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/12/1956 | 10/01/1957 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/12/1957 | 11/01/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1958 | 20/08/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/02/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/10/1959 | 13/11/1959 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1960 | 09/03/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1960 | 01/04/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1961 | 06/10/1961 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/11/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1962 | 11/12/1962 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
01/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2399, E3067-73. Outside New Erecting Shop: 13251. Stripping Road: 43159, 60055/64/71/89, 60162, 60525, 61207/27, 61808/88, 61920, 63973, 68894, 73000, 73170. Scrap Yard-intact: 68950, 69533/85/92. Scrap Yard-being cut up: 60035/79, 61833, 64779. Crimpsal: D3447, 43062, 60080, 61361. Outside Crimpsal: D3478, 60017, 60106, 63969, 70000. Erecting Shop: D3254, D4061, D5578, D5602, D5805, 13166, 13333, 43158, 60012/33, 60050/91/2, 60128/59, 60511/3/37, 61145, 61299, 61867, 62006, 63965/80, 70035/8. Outside Erecting Shop: 61897, 70030, 73169. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: 61075. Paint Shop: D5050, D5583, D9014, E3066, 60001, 61248. Outside Paint Shop: D5355, D5604, D5816. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196111 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
31/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 513, name: DANTE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2004 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
25/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1947. Dep: 24/09/1947. | ||
17/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 17/02/1948. Dep: 17/02/1948. | ||
27/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1948. Dep: 03/11/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60513 |
||
19/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
17/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/07/1950. Dep: 15/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
15/08/1950 | Livery | Change of livery to Green with orange and black lining. | ||
28/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/09/1950. Dep: 19/10/1950. | ||
11/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
20/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29833 (Diagram 118) |
||
12/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1953. Dep: 27/05/1953. | ||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 31/03/1954. Work undertaken: Lipped chimney fitted |
||
24/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1955. Dep: 04/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10635 (Diagram 118) |
||
06/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/09/1956. Dep: 10/10/1956. | ||
24/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/12/1956. Dep: 10/01/1957. | ||
11/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29826 (Diagram 118) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
12/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1958. Dep: 20/08/1958. | ||
23/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/02/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
07/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1959. Dep: 13/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29777 (Diagram 117) |
||
01/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1960. Dep: 09/03/1960. | ||
24/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/03/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960. | ||
18/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1961. Dep: 06/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29861 (Diagram 118) |
||
14/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. | ||
03/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1962. Dep: 11/12/1962. | ||
27/04/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60513 from New England (34E) |