|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1947 | 06/06/1947 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1947 | 09/01/1948 | 42 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/03/1948 | 23/03/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 60514 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/12/1948 | 28/01/1949 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1949 | 30/03/1949 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1950 | 03/11/1950 | 33 days | General | Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1952 | 22/05/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1953 | 24/12/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/07/1955 | 12/08/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1957 | 05/02/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/04/1957 | 09/04/1957 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/07/1958 | 29/08/1958 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1958 | 08/10/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1959 | 16/04/1959 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/01/1960 | 03/03/1960 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/05/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1961 | 23/02/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 29845 (Diagram 118) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1961 | 17/05/1961 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/03/1962 | 16/03/1962 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1962 | 26/11/1962 | 56 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | General | No. 514 was fitted with coal sprinkler on tender (1/47) and No. 5298 with - steam brake (2/47). No. 9522 has had the cylinders lined up to 15½' (1/47). | SLS/194705 |
30/06/1947 | General | The 'Pacifics' of Thompson's design, Nos. 500 and 511-520, which were formerly designated 'A.2' Class, were towards the end of April re-classified 'A.2/3': this series will end with No. 524. The Doncaster No. of 520 Owen Tudor is 2010, and of 521 (completed early in May) 2011. As No. 500 carries works No. 2000, and 3167 is presumably Doncaster No. 2001, Nos. 511-520 were expected to appear as Nos. 2002-2011; No. 515 Sun Stream is 2006/1946. | SLS/194708 |
31/03/1948 | Doncaster Works | Nos. 22, 23, 27, 34, 79, 91, 103, 504, 511/2/4 were all in Doncaster Plant about the beginning of March, but not all were in for general repair. Owing to a defective cylinder and piston, 'C.1' No. 2808 has been condemned, the boiler of which has now been placed on No. 2877. New 'A.2' No. 60532 Blue Peter was ready towards the end of March. The first re-numbered engines (green) ex Doncaster were: Nos. 60079, 60066 (after Goswick crash), 60512, 61070 an 60982, while others in hand included Nos. 60007/23 an 61828. No. 60534 will soon be ready, completing E.O. 380. Order 381 is for five 'A.2' following on. It is understood Orders 382-3 will be for 16 new 'A.1' 4-6-2's. | SLS/194805 |
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
08/06/1961 | Duke of Kent\'s wedding | The Royal Train conveying H.M. the Queen and H.R.H. the Duke of Edinburgh from Kings Cross to York for the Duke of Kent's wedding on 8th June, was hauled by Class A4 60028 Walter K. Whigham in immaculate condition; 60014 Silver Link acting stand-by loco. The two additional trains carrying guests were worked by 60003 Andrew K. McCosh and 60015 Quicksilver. Pilots at Hitchin in the morning were Class A2/3 60514 Chamossaire and Class A3 60067 Ladas, but only the latter was present in the evening. E.E./V.F. Type '4' 1Co-Col diesels took the empty stock from York to Malton, where the guests entrained for the return journey behind the A4's. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 514, name: CHAMOSSAIRE Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 2005 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 117 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/05/1947. Dep: 06/06/1947. | ||
29/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1947. Dep: 09/01/1948. | ||
09/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/03/1948. Dep: 23/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 60514 |
||
09/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 28/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29778 (Diagram 117) |
||
19/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
07/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/03/1949. Dep: 30/03/1949. | ||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950. Work undertaken: Painted Green with orange and black lining. |
||
22/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29789 (Diagram 117) |
||
23/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29780 (Diagram 117) |
||
11/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1955. Dep: 12/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29791 (Diagram 117) |
||
01/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1957. Dep: 05/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29784 (Diagram 117) |
||
03/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1957. Dep: 09/04/1957. | ||
23/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/07/1958. Dep: 29/08/1958. | ||
27/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1958. Dep: 08/10/1958. | ||
26/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. | ||
07/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/04/1959. Dep: 16/04/1959. | ||
29/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/01/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960. | ||
13/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. | ||
16/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1961. Dep: 23/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 29845 (Diagram 118) |
||
15/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1961. Dep: 17/05/1961. | ||
07/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1962. Dep: 16/03/1962. | ||
02/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1962. Dep: 26/11/1962. | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 60514 from New England (34E) |